North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:Terrence W Boyle
Referred: Robert T Numbers, II
Case #: 5:23-cv-00536
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Sep 29, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 27, 2024 6:18 AM EDT
Defendant
Farzana Investment Inc
Represented By
James Calvin Cunningham, III
Cunningham Law, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
William Ronnie Adams, II
Represented By
David J. Martin
David J. Martin PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Sunday, April 07, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Sun 04/07 8:58 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by William Ronnie Adams, II as to Farzana Investment Inc. (Martin, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
adr Notice to Counsel - Selection of Mediator Thu 02/29 8:54 AM
Second NOTICE TO COUNSEL - Pursuant to Local ADR Rule 101.1c(a), counsel is reminded that the parties must file a written statement identifying an agreed upon mediator within twenty one (21) days of the entry of the Scheduling Order. This statement was not timely filed. The court will allow fourteen (14) more days to file a written statement identifying an agreed upon mediator. If a statement is not timely filed, the Clerk of Court will appoint a mediator from the list of court certified mediators. The Selection of Mediator form must be electronically filed on or before 3/14/2024. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
13 13 order Scheduling Order Fri 01/26 10:45 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER : Discovery due by 5/31/2024. Motions due by 6/28/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 1/25/2024. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. (Stouch, L.)
Related: [-]
adr Notice to Counsel - Selection of Mediator Fri 01/26 10:47 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL - Pursuant to Local ADR Rule 101.1c(a), counsel is reminded that the parties must file a written statement identifying an agreed upon mediator within twenty one (21) days of the entry of the Scheduling Order. If a statement is not timely filed, the Clerk of Court will appoint a mediator from the list of court certified mediators. Selection of Mediator must be electronically filed on or before 2/16/2024. (Stouch, L.)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
utility Remark Mon 01/22 4:26 PM
Remark -12 Rule 26(f) Report referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II for the entry of a scheduling order. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
12 12 discov Rule 26(f) Report (joint) Thu 01/18 8:46 AM
Rule 26(f) Report (joint) filed by Farzana Investment Inc. (Cunningham, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
11 11 1 pgs discov Order for Discovery Plan Mon 12/11 12:36 PM
ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 12/11/2023. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
utility Case Selected for Mediation Mon 12/11 12:37 PM
Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 12/08 6:12 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Farzana Investment Inc. (Cunningham, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 11/09 8:54 AM
TEXT ORDER granting Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time9 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Defendant has up to and including December 8, 2023, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 11/9/2023. (Hockaday, A.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 11/08 4:02 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding1 Complaint, filed by Farzana Investment Inc. (Cunningham, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
utility Motion Referred to Clerk Wed 11/08 4:57 PM
Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding1 Complaint. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
8 8 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Tue 11/07 5:52 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Farzana Investment Inc (Cunningham, James)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/07 5:36 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by James Calvin Cunningham, III on behalf of All Defendants. (Cunningham, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
6 6 service Summons Issued Mon 10/16 8:53 AM
Summons Issued as to Farzana Investment Inc. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
5 5 notice Notice-other Thu 10/12 3:18 PM
Notice filed by William Ronnie Adams, II Proposed Summons . (Martin, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
notice Notice to Counsel Tue 10/10 11:50 AM
Notice to Counsel regarding:4 Notice- Proposed Summons. Counsel is reminded that the filing user must lock or flatten the PDF document. Failure to flatten documents may result in the clerks office issuing a notice of deficiency. Counsel should "flatten" the summons prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. Counsel is directed to refile flattened summons. (Stouch, L.)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 08, 2023
4 4 notice Notice-other Sun 10/08 9:25 PM
Notice filed by William Ronnie Adams, II . (Martin, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Sun 10/08 8:59 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement by William Ronnie Adams, II (Martin, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Sun 10/08 8:59 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by David J. Martin on behalf of William Ronnie Adams, II. (Martin, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
notice Notice of Deficiency Failure to File Financial Disclosure Mon 10/02 3:52 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to William Ronnie Adams, II. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Counsel Mon 10/02 3:52 PM
Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency Mon 10/02 3:55 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding [1-2] Proposed Summons. Counsel should complete the summons refile the proposed summons using the event "Notice-Other". (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Counsel Mon 10/02 3:56 PM
Notice to Counsel regarding: Counsel is reminded that the filing user must lock or flatten the PDF document. Failure to flatten documents may result in the clerks office issuing a notice of deficiency. Counsel should "flatten" ( the civil cover sheet ) prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No further action is needed. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/29 10:58 AM
COMPLAINT against Farzana Investment Inc ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCEDC-7290439.), filed by William Ronnie Adams, II. (Martin, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons