Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Benita Y Pearson
Case #: 4:23-cv-01902
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 29, 2023
Terminated:Mar 29, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 27, 2024 8:14 AM EDT
Defendant
Mahoning County Board of Commissioners
21 West Boardman Street
Youngstown, OH 44503
Represented By
Daniel T. Downey
Fishel Downey Albrecht & Riepenhoff
contact info
Matthew J. Young
Fishel Downey Albrecht & Riepenhoff
contact info
Defendant
Mahoning County Sheriff's Department
110 5th Avenue
Youngstown, OH 44503
Represented By
Daniel T. Downey
Fishel Downey Albrecht & Riepenhoff
contact info
Matthew J. Young
Fishel Downey Albrecht & Riepenhoff
contact info
Defendant
Edward J. Maloney
110 5th Avenue
Youngstown, OH 44503
Represented By
Amily A. Imbrogno
Meyers, Roman, Friedberg & Lewis
contact info
David M. Smith
Meyers, Roman, Friedberg & Lewis
contact info
Plaintiff
Vanessa White
416 East 7th Street
McDonald, OH 44437
Represented By
Bruce D. Taubman
Taubman Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, April 26, 2024
26 26 order Stipulation & Order Fri 04/26 11:22 AM
Stipulation and Order approving the parties'25 Proposed Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 4/26/2024. (JLG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
25 25 notice Stipulation (atty event) Thu 04/25 3:50 PM
Proposed Stipulation for Dismissal filed by Edward J. Maloney. (Imbrogno, Amily)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
24 24 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 03/29 11:24 AM
Order of Dismissal The Court was informed by the Non-document Minutes of Proceedings dated 3/21/2024 that the parties reached an agreement to settle this case at the mediation conference conducted by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. Plaintiff has since filed a Notice of Dismissal With Prejudice of Defendants Mahoning County Board of Commissioners and Mahoning County Sheriffs Department (ECF No.23 ). Therefore, the docket shall be marked "settled and dismissed without prejudice." On or before 4/25/2024, the parties shall submit a proposed and executed Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice, which, if approved, shall supersede this order. The Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/12/2024 is cancelled. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 3/29/2024. (JLG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
23 23 motion Dismiss Party Tue 03/26 2:52 PM
Motion to dismiss party Mahoning County Board of Commissioners and Mahoning County Sheriff Department filed by Plaintiff Vanessa White. (Taubman, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
minutes Mediation Conference ~Util - Terminate Referral Thu 03/21 3:45 PM
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. Mediation Conference held on 3/21/2024. Parties reached an agreement. Referral Terminated. (Court Reporter: ECRO - M. Gorby.) Time: 5 hours. (S,KL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
minutes Telephone Conference MJ Wed 03/20 12:05 PM
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. Pre-Mediation Telephone Conferences held on 3/20/2024. Attorneys Bruce D. Taubman, Matthew J. Young, and David M. Smith present on behalf of their respective parties. Parties discussed their upcoming mediation. Time: 1 hour. (S,KL)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
order Order on Motion to continue Order on Motion for order Fri 03/15 10:40 AM
Order [non-document] denying as moot Defendant's22 Motion to move Mediation start time or, in the alternative Motion to continue the Mediation to a later date. Counsel has notified the court that a continuance is no longer necessary. Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson on 3/15/2024.(S,KL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
22 22 2 pgs motion Continue Tue 03/05 12:23 PM
Motion to continue Move Mediation Start Time filed by Defendant Edward J. Maloney. (Smith, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
21 21 12 pgs notice Stipulation (atty event) Fri 02/23 8:18 AM
Proposed Stipulation for Protective Order filed by Edward J. Maloney. (Imbrogno, Amily)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
20 20 5 pgs order Order Thu 02/15 3:52 PM
Order setting mediation conference to be held on 3/21/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 242 before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. Additionally, a Telephone Conference with Plaintiff's Counsel is set for 3/20/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. A Telephone Conference with Defense Counsel is set for 3/20/2024 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. The court will host the conference calls and inform counsel by way of separate email of the telephone number for the call. Attorneys are cautioned not to rely on the docket entry only. Read the attached Order for additional information and requirements prior to the mediation conference. Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson on 2/15/2024. Related [+] (S,KL)
Related: [-] ument19
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order Wed 02/14 12:36 PM
Order of Reference Pursuant to LR 16.4, Alternative Dispute Resolution, of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio, this case is hereby referred to Mediation pursuant to LR 16.6(a), et seq. The Court refers this case to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson to conduct a mediation to be completed by not later than 4/12/2024, if possible. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 2/14/2024. (JLG)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Case Management Conference Plan/Order Wed 02/14 12:33 PM
Case Management Conference Plan/Order. Case is assigned to the standard track, and is referred to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson to conduct a mediation. No later than 3 weeks before the mediation conference, Defendants shall respond in a single writing to Plaintiff's verbal demand with an offer (even if the response is that they will not make an offer at this time). The parties do not consent to the jurisdiction of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Discovery, including expert discovery, shall be completed on or before 10/15/2024. On or before 8/14/2024, the party that has the burden of proof on an issue(s) shall identify its retained expert witness(es) and provide opposing counsel with a written expert report(s). The party that has no burden of proof on an issue(s) shall identify its retained expert(s), if any, and submit an opposing written report(s) to opposing counsel on or before 9/13/2024. The discovery deposition of an opponent's expert witness shall be completed on or before 10/15/2024. Counsel shall comply with LR 37.1, which outlines a process for resolution of discovery disputes. On or before 2/26/2024, the parties shall file either the attached Stipulation (Attachment No. 1) or a stipulation reached by the parties regarding the handling of trial-preparation material. The Complaint (ECF No.1 ) is hereby amended by interlineation to delete "He told her, 'I like black girls like you. You're pretty.' " from Paragraph 9 on PageID #: 2. The cutoff to amend pleadings and add parties is 4/15/2024. The cutoff for filing dispositive motions is 11/12/2024, with responses filed by 12/12/2024, and replies by 12/26/2024. Written stipulations as to all uncontested facts to be presented by the dispositive motion shall be filed with the Court on or before 11/12/2024. If there are no stipulations, a joint notice stating same shall be filed by the same date. These are mandatory requirements. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 6/12/2024 at 12:00 p.m. Noon. Attorney Imbrogno is to set up the conference call by joining the other participants and calling the Court at (330) 884-7435. Parties' attendance is welcome, but not mandatory. Counsel should notify the Court in advance of a Status Conference if the matter has settled. The parties shall file a proposed Stipulated Protective Order on or before 2/26/2024. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 2/14/2024. (JLG)
Related: [-]
17 17 minutes ~Util - Case Referred to Judicial Officer for Mediation or Settlement Order Wed 02/14 9:38 AM
Order This matter came before the Court on 2/13/2024. Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp was randomly assigned as the Magistrate Judge in this case. With the concurrence of Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson and the approval of Chief Judge Sara Lioi, the instant action shall be referred to Magistrate Judge Henderson to conduct a Mediation/Settlement. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 2/14/2024. (JLG)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
minutes Case Management Conference Mon 02/12 2:36 PM
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Benita Y. Pearson. Case Management Conference held on 2/12/2024. Present were Attorney Bruce D. Taubman as counsel for Plaintiff; Attorney Daniel T. Downey as counsel for Defendants Mahoning County Board of Commissioners and Mahoning County Sheriff's Department; Attorneys David M. Smith and Amily A. Imbrogno as counsel for Defendant Edward Maloney; Plaintiff Vanessa White; Audrey Tillis as party representative for Defendants Mahoning County Board of Commissioners and Mahoning County Sheriff's Department; Defendant Edward Maloney; Mahoning County Sheriff Jerry Greene; and, Katie Lininger and Jeff Knapp (Claims Representatives for the County Risk Sharing Authority ("CORSA"). (Court Reporter: None); Time: 1 Hour 49 Minutes. (JLG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
16 16 notice Report of Parties Planning Meeting (atty event) Wed 02/07 4:10 PM
Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Edward J. Maloney. (Imbrogno, Amily)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order Fri 02/02 2:34 PM
Order The Case Management Conference previously set to be held by telephone on 2/12/2024 at 11:00 a.m. before the undersigned, see Scheduling Order (ECF No.14 ), will now be conducted in the Chambers of the Honorable Benita Y. Pearson, Room 313, Thomas D. Lambros United States Court House, 125 Market Street, Youngstown, Ohio. The in-person attendance of both parties and lead counsel is required. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 2/2/2024. (JLG)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
14 14 order Case Management Conference Scheduling Order Fri 01/05 2:33 PM
Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with Telephonic Case Management Conference to be held on 2/12/2024 at 11:00 a.m. before Judge Benita Y. Pearson. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference call and contact Chambers directly at (330) 884-7435, with all participants on the line. The Court requires personal participation of parties at the Case Management Conference, even when the conference is telephonic. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 1/5/2024. (JLG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment No. 1,
Att: 2 Attachment No. 2,
Att: 3 Attachment No. 3,
Att: 4 Attachment No. 4,
Att: 5 Attachment No. 5
Thursday, January 04, 2024
13 13 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Thu 01/04 4:37 PM
Attorney Appearance by Matthew J. Young filed by on behalf of Mahoning County Sheriff's Department. (Young, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
12 12 6 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Tue 01/02 11:23 AM
Answer to1 Complaint filed by Edward J. Maloney. (Imbrogno, Amily)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
11 11 oth_evt Summons Issued Mon 12/11 12:28 PM
Alias Summons issued to counsel for service upon Edward J. Maloney. (D,Ju)
Related: [-]
10 10 oth_doc Praecipe Mon 12/11 10:56 AM
Praecipe for issuance of Alias Summons filed by Vanessa White.(Taubman, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons for Edward Maloney
Friday, November 17, 2023
9 9 notice Notice of Service (atty event) Fri 11/17 9:48 AM
Notice of Service of Discovery to Defendant filed by Vanessa White. (Taubman, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
8 8 1 pgs order Order Fri 10/27 6:29 PM
Order The Complaint (ECF No.1 ) in this action was filed on 9/29/2023. On 10/3/2023, the original summons were issued to counsel for Plaintiff for service upon Defendants. Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) requires the plaintiff to serve the summons and complaint upon the defendants within 90 days after the complaint is filed. If Plaintiff cannot show good cause why service of the summons and complaint was not made within 90 days after the filing of the complaint, pursuant to Rule 4(m), the action will be dismissed without prejudice on 12/29/2023, as to Defendant Edward J. Maloney only. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 10/27/2023. (JLG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
oth_evt Notice Regarding Attorney Admission Status Wed 10/25 11:04 AM
Notice to Attorney Matthew J. Young. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 10/24 4:41 PM
Answer to1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Mahoning County Board of Commissioners, Mahoning County Sheriff's Department. (Downey, Daniel)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Tue 10/24 4:27 PM
Attorney Appearance by Daniel T. Downey filed by on behalf of Mahoning County Board of Commissioners, Mahoning County Sheriff's Department. (Downey, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
5 5 oth_evt Summons Issued Tue 10/03 3:07 PM
Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Mahoning County Board of Commissioners, Mahoning County Sheriff's Department, and Edward J. Maloney. (D,Ju)
Related: [-]
4 4 oth_doc Praecipe Tue 10/03 2:29 PM
Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Vanessa White.(Taubman, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons for Edward Maloney,
Att: 2 Summons for Mahoning County Sheriff's Department,
Att: 3 Summons for Mahoning County Board of Commissioners
Friday, September 29, 2023
3 3 oth_evt Magistrate Consent Form Issued by Intake Fri 09/29 2:03 PM
Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons not provided, summons not issued. (R,AP)
Related: [-]
2 2 oth_doc Supplement (atty event) Fri 09/29 12:36 PM
Supplement to Complaint - Civil Cover Sheet for Vanessa White Complaint filed by Vanessa White. Related document(s)1 . (Taubman, Bruce)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/29 12:13 PM
Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid, $402.00. Receipt number AOHNDC-12204562. Filed by Vanessa White. (Taubman, Bruce)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judge Fri 09/29 1:27 PM
Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (R,AP)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Fri 09/29 1:27 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp. (R,AP)
Related: [-]