Louisiana Middle District Court
Judge:Brian A Jackson
Referred: Richard L Bourgeois, Jr
Case #: 3:23-cv-01395
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Sep 29, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 27, 2024 5:00 AM CDT
Defendant
Brandon Boudreaux
Represented By
Conner Joseph Graham
City/parish Of East Baton Rouge
contact info
Alan Gregory Rome
A Gregory Rome Attorney At Law
contact info
Defendant
Sharon Weston Broome
Mayor for the City of Baton Rouge 222 St Louis St # 301
Baton Rouge, LA 70802
Represented By
Conner Joseph Graham
City/parish Of East Baton Rouge
contact info
Alan Gregory Rome
A Gregory Rome Attorney At Law
contact info
Defendant
Nathaniel Drumm
Defendant
Christopher Fischer
Represented By
Conner Joseph Graham
City/parish Of East Baton Rouge
contact info
Alan Gregory Rome
A Gregory Rome Attorney At Law
contact info
Defendant
Murphy J. Paul, Jr.
Represented By
Conner Joseph Graham
City/parish Of East Baton Rouge
contact info
Alan Gregory Rome
A Gregory Rome Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Kim Powell
111068 David Wade Correctional Center 670 Bell Hill Road
Homer, LA 71040


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, January 17, 2025
11 11 order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Fri 01/17 11:08 AM
ORDER granting10 Motion to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel of Record. Attorney Kenneth Maurice Willis is substituted as counsel for defendants Brandon Boudreaux, Sharon Weston Broome, Christopher Fischer, and Murphy J. Paul, Jr. replacing Conner Joseph Graham. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 1/17/2025. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
Related: [-]
utility Motion(s) Referred Fri 01/17 8:40 AM
MOTION(S) REFERRED:10 MOTION to Withdraw And Substitute . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
10 10 motion Withdraw Tue 01/14 9:55 AM
MOTION to Withdraw And Substitute by Sharon Weston Broome, Murphy J. Paul, Jr, Brandon Boudreaux, Christopher Fischer(Willis, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Pleading; Order,
Att: 2 Affidavit Verification
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
9 9 notice Certificate of Interested Persons Wed 12/27 1:53 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons by Brandon Boudreaux, Sharon Weston Broome, Christopher Fischer, Murphy J. Paul, Jr. (Graham, Conner) (Main Document 9 replaced on 12/27/2023 to flatten document) (JEG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 26, 2023
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 12/26 2:54 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,, with Jury Demand by Brandon Boudreaux, Sharon Weston Broome, Christopher Fischer, Murphy J. Paul, Jr..(Graham, Conner)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency with LR 7.1 Tue 12/26 3:08 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY with LR 7.1 as to7 Answer to Complaint. Failure to file a Certificate of Interested Persons REQUIRED CORRECTION: Within one business day, the filer shall file a Certificate of Interested Persons and the interested persons shall be added to CM/ECF by the filer using the event Certificate of Interested Persons. (EDC)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 11/17 2:21 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christopher Fischer. Christopher Fischer waiver sent on 11/7/2023, answer due 1/8/2024. (Graham, Conner)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 11/17 2:19 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brandon Boudreaux. Brandon Boudreaux waiver sent on 11/7/2023, answer due 1/8/2024. (Graham, Conner)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 11/17 2:16 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Murphy J. Paul, Jr.. Murphy J. Paul, Jr. waiver sent on 10/31/2023, answer due 1/2/2024. (Graham, Conner)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 11/17 2:14 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sharon Weston Broome. Sharon Weston Broome waiver sent on 10/25/2023, answer due 12/26/2023. (Graham, Conner)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 10/25 11:02 AM
Summons Issued as to Brandon Boudreaux, Sharon Weston Broome, Nathaniel Drumm, Christopher Fischer, Murphy J. Paul, Jr.. (NOTICE: Handed over the Clerk's Counter for service ) (ELW) Modified on 10/25/2023 to correct service text (ELW)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint (Complete Case Opening First) Fri 09/29 11:56 AM
COMPLAINT against Brandon Boudreaux, Sharon Weston Broome, Nathaniel Drumm, Christopher Fischer, Murphy J. Paul, Jr. (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number 32638), filed by Kim Powell.(EDC) Modified on 9/29/2023 to add payment information. (EDC). (EDC). Modified on 9/29/2023 to add exhibits to complaint. (EDC)
Related: [-]
Att: 2 (9/29/2023) Exhibit 10/24/2022 letter,
Att: 3 (9/29/2023) Exhibit 11/3/2022 letter,
Att: 4 (9/29/2023) Exhibit 3/30/2021 transcript,
Att: 5 (9/29/2023) Exhibit additional pages of Brian Ballard,
Att: 6 (9/29/2023) Exhibit Arrestee Information Form,
Att: 7 (9/29/2023) Exhibit Additional Arrestee Information Form,
Att: 8 (9/29/2023) Exhibit Police Body Cam Video Footage,
Att: 9 (9/29/2023) Exhibit Search and Seizure Warrant,
Att: 10 (9/29/2023) Exhibit Police Body Cam Video Footage from Smiley Store,
Att: 11 (9/29/2023) Exhibit article
utility Set Prisoner Pro Se CASE REFERRED Flag Fri 09/29 1:03 PM
***Set CASE REFERRED Flag (PPS) (EDC)
Related: [-]