New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Brian M Cogan
Referred: Vera M Scanlon
Case #: 1:23-cv-07311
Nature of Suit195 Contract - Contract Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Sep 29, 2023
Terminated:Nov 12, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 27, 2024 6:09 AM EDT
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline LLC
Represented By
Jay P. Lefkowitz
Kirkland & Ellis
contact info
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.
Represented By
Amy J. Laurendeau
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Emilie W. Hamilton
O'Melveny & Myers
contact info
Hannah Y Shay Chanoine
O'Melvenhy & Myers LLP
contact info
Defendant
Kenvue, Inc
Defendant
Reckitt Benckiser LLC
Represented By
James Lawrence Bernard
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Lauren Schultz Colton
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
John Coyle
Represented By
Virginia E Anello
Douglas & London, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
23 23 order Judgment Tue 11/12 7:04 PM
JUDGMENT, All claims in the complaints transferred into the above-captioned master docket are dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk is instructed to enter JUDGMENT dismissing all claims in any complaint in this multidistrict litigation. This is a final, appealable judgment that resolves all of the claims in all of the cases in this multidistrict litigation. The in-person Status Conference currently scheduled for 1:00 p.m. ET on November 21, 2024, is hereby adjourned. So Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 11/12/2024. Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03089-BMC et al. (TLH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/04 3:44 PM
ORDER granting 190 in case 1:23-md-03089, Tyler Hudson's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance to ensure electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $200 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee . Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/4/2024. Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03089-BMC et al. (PW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/05 11:42 AM
ORDER granting15 16 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/5/2024. (PW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/20 4:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Emilie W. Hamilton on behalf of Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03089-BMC et al. (Hamilton, Emilie)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/16 12:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Schultz Colton on behalf of Reckitt Benckiser LLC, RB Health (US) LLC, RB Health (US) LLC, Reckitt Benckiser Pharmaceuticals Inc., RB Health LLC, Reckitt & Benckiser LLC, Reckitt Benckiser, LLC (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03089-BMC et al. (Colton, Lauren)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/16 11:14 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robyn E. Bladow on behalf of GlaxoSmithKline Consumer Healthcare Holdings (US) LLC, GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Haleon US Holdings LLC, Haleon Us Capital LLC, Pfizer Inc. (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03089-BMC et al. (Bladow, Robyn)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/09 7:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Rae on behalf of GlaxoSmithKline Consumer Healthcare Holdings (US) LLC, GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Haleon PLC, Haleon Us Capital LLC, Pfizer Inc. (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03089-BMC et al. (Rae, Jacob)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/09 7:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jay P. Lefkowitz on behalf of GlaxoSmithKline Consumer Healthcare Holdings (US) LLC, GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Haleon PLC, Haleon Us Capital LLC, Pfizer Inc. (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03089-BMC et al. (Lefkowitz, Jay)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
16 16 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 02/08 1:46 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Lauren S. Colton Filing fee $ 150, receipt number NYEDC-17551506 by Reckitt Benckiser LLC, Reckitt Benckiser Pharmaceuticals Inc., RB Health (US) LLC, RB Health (US) LLC, RB Health LLC, Reckitt Benckiser LLC, Reckitt & Benckiser LLC, Reckitt Benckiser, LLC. Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03089-BMC et al. (Colton, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Lauren S. Colton,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Cerificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
15 15 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 02/08 1:22 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re: Amy Laurendeau Filing fee $ 150, receipt number NYEDC-17551372 by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03089-BMC et al. (Laurendeau, Amy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Amy J. Laurendeau,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - COGS,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/06 8:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah Y Shay Chanoine on behalf of Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03089-BMC et al. (Chanoine, Hannah Y)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/01 11:29 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by James Lawrence Bernard on behalf of Reckitt Benckiser LLC, RB Health (US) LLC, RB Health (US) LLC, Reckitt Benckiser Pharmaceuticals Inc., RB Health LLC, Reckitt Benckiser LLC, Reckitt & Benckiser LLC, Reckitt Benckiser, LLC (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03089-BMC et al. (Bernard, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/16 4:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Flahive Wu on behalf of The Procter & Gamble Company (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03089-BMC et al. (Flahive Wu, Laura)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Mon 12/18 1:54 PM
ORDER granting10 . The parties are advised that this action is now before Judge Brian M. Cogan. Therefore the 1/23/2024 initial conference previously scheduled by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon is cancelled, all deadlines associated with the conference are terminated, and defendants' time to answer is stayed. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/18/2023. (PW)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
11 11 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 12/15 9:48 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by GlaxoSmithKline LLC identifying Other Affiliate GlaxoSmithKline Holdings (Americas) Inc., Other Affiliate GSK Finance (No 2) Limited, Other Affiliate GlaxoSmithKline Finance plc, Other Affiliate GlaxoSmithKline Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate GSK plc for GlaxoSmithKline LLC. (Lefkowitz, Jay)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Adjourn Conference Fri 12/15 9:36 PM
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference and an adjournment of all outstanding deadlines in this action (Joint Request) by GlaxoSmithKline LLC. (Lefkowitz, Jay)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/15 9:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jay P. Lefkowitz on behalf of GlaxoSmithKline LLC (aty to be noticed) (Lefkowitz, Jay)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
8 8 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 12/11 10:05 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: A Telephonic Initial Conference is set for 1/23/2024 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. The parties are to dial 877-336-1829 and enter the access code 3581283 for the AT&T conference bridge. The parties must complete the attached Joint Proposed Case Management Plan (CMP) and file it on ECF no later than 1/9/2024. In the event that any Defendant has not answered or otherwise appeared, Plaintiff must also mail a copy of this Order, its attachment and the full docket to the last known mailing address for such Defendant and file proof on ECF by the CMP filing date. As to any LLC, the Court further directs such party to file a disclosure statement under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 within 30 days of appearing in this action. The disclosure statement should identify all of the members and their respective citizenship. See Barnes v. Fort Hamilton Family Homes , 524 F. Supp. 3d 40, 42 (E.D.N.Y. 2021) ("For diversity purposes, LLCs have the imputed citizenship of each of their members."). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 12/11/2023. (GS)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 12/11 11:24 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis, Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (AM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2023
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 12/07 9:38 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Coyle. GlaxoSmithKline LLC served on 11/28/2023, answer due 12/19/2023; Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc served on 12/5/2023, answer due 12/26/2023; Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. served on 11/30/2023, answer due 12/21/2023; Kenvue, Inc served on 11/28/2023, answer due 12/19/2023; Reckitt Benckiser LLC served on 11/29/2023, answer due 12/20/2023. (London, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service Reckitt Benckiser LLC,
Att: 2 Affidavit of Service GlaxoSmithKline, LLC,
Att: 3 Affidavit of Service Kenvue Inc.,
Att: 4 Affidavit of Service 5.Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.
Thursday, October 05, 2023
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 10/05 12:30 PM
Summons Issued as to GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Kenvue, Inc, Reckitt Benckiser LLC. (TLH)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Thu 10/05 11:34 AM
Proposed Summons. by John Coyle (Anello, Virginia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons Rider
Monday, October 02, 2023
4 4 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Mon 10/02 1:55 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Mon 10/02 1:53 PM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (KD)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 10/02 1:50 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD)
Related: [-]
misc Quality Control Check - Summons Mon 10/02 1:57 PM
Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: If multiple defendants, there must me a rider attached to the one (1)Proposed summons with the name and addresses of all defendants included. Additionally, The full case caption(All Plaintiff and Defendant name) must appear on the summons. Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (KD)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
2 2 2 pgs misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Fri 09/29 5:29 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint by John Coyle (Anello, Virginia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons,
Att: 4 Proposed Summons
1 1 27 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 09/29 5:21 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-17136067 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by John Coyle. (Anello, Virginia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet