Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Jon E Deguilio
Referred: Joshua P Kolar
Case #: 2:23-cv-00332
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Case Filed:Sep 29, 2023
Terminated:Oct 25, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 27, 2024 6:06 AM EDT
Defendant
Asiamah Trucking, LLC
Defendant
Quian C. Stansil
Defendant
Total Quality Logistics, LLC
Represented By
Edward W Hearn
Johnson & Bell Ltd - Cp/in
contact info
Scott L Tyler
Waters Tyler Hofmann & Scott LLC
contact info
Kyle Joseph Farris
Johnson & Bell Ltd - Cp/in
contact info
Plaintiff
Carissa Little
Represented By
Todd S Schafer
Schafer And Schafer LLP
contact info
Timothy S Schafer
Schafer And Schafer LLP
contact info
Geoffrey G Giorgi
Giorgi & Bebekoski LLC
contact info
Izabela Bebekoski
Giorgi & Bebekoski LLC
contact info
Timothy S Schafer, II
Schafer And Schafer LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
18 18 1 pgs order Order Remanding Case to State Court Thu 10/26 3:14 PM
Order: This Matter is before the Court on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and Defendant's Verified Motion to Remand and Response to Plaintiff's Motion17 . The Court ORDERS this case to be REMANDED to Porter Superior Court, Indiana. The Clerk is DIRECTED to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 10/25/23. (nhc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
17 17 motion Remand Tue 10/24 2:36 PM
MOTION to Remand by Defendant Total Quality Logistics, LLC. (Hearn, Edward)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/24 9:56 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Scott L Tyler on behalf of Total Quality Logistics, LLC (Tyler, Scott)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
15 15 motion Objection to Notice of Removal Tue 10/10 3:11 PM
OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL re1 Notice of Removal, filed by Total Quality Logistics, LLC.(Schafer, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/10 1:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Izabela Bebekoski on behalf of Carissa Little (Bebekoski, Izabela)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/10 1:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey G Giorgi on behalf of Carissa Little (Giorgi, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/10 11:14 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Todd S Schafer on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Schafer, Todd)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/10 11:12 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy S Schafer, II on behalf of Carissa Little (Schafer, Timothy)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/10 11:07 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy S Schafer on behalf of Carissa Little (Schafer, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
9 9 order Order Tue 10/03 9:56 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 10/3/2023. (tc)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 10/02 9:01 AM
Judge Jon E DeGuilio and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. **NEW CASE** (ash)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/29 5:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Joseph Farris on behalf of TOTAL QUALITY LOGISTICS, LLC (Farris, Kyle)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 09/29 5:18 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by TOTAL QUALITY LOGISTICS, LLC identifying Other Affiliate KGBO Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate MJZ Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate KMB Holdings, LLC for TOTAL QUALITY LOGISTICS, LLC.. (Hearn, Edward)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/29 5:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Edward W Hearn on behalf of TOTAL QUALITY LOGISTICS, LLC (Hearn, Edward)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 09/29 5:10 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-5369438.) from Porter County Superior Court, Cause No. 64D01-2305-CT-004305, filed by TOTAL QUALITY LOGISTICS, LLC.(Hearn, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Amended Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit State Court Record
Monday, September 18, 2023
8 8 misc Jury Demand Mon 10/02 8:58 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury filed in Porter County Superior Court, 64D01-2305-CT-004305 by Total Quality Logistics, LLC.(ash)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 28, 2023
7 7 cmp State Court Complaint Mon 10/02 8:55 AM
AMENDED STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in Porter County Superior Court 64D01-2305-CT-004305 against Asiamah Trucking, LLC, Quian C. Stansil, Total Quality Logistics, LLC, filed by Carissa Little.(ash)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 10/02 8:42 AM
ANSWER to Complaint filed in Porter County Superior Court, 64D01-2305-CT-004305 by Asiamah Trucking, LLC.(ash)
Related: [-]