New Jersey District Court
Judge:Robert Kirsch
Referred: Rukhsanah L Singh
Case #: 3:23-cv-20776
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Case Filed:Sep 28, 2023
Terminated:Sep 17, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 26, 2024 4:44 AM EDT
Defendant
HARBOR FREIGHT TOOLS
Defendant
ERIC SMIDT
Plaintiff
JOHN LEE GORE
814 SOUTHARD STREET APT. 2A
TRENTON, NJ 08638

GPO Apr 25 2024
24/2024. (jdg)MEMORANDUM ORDER that Plaintiff's 1-4 IFP Application is GRANTED. The Clerk shall file the Complaint. The Clerk of the Court shall provide Plaintiff with a copy of the USM-285 form for each named Defendant. Signed by Judge Robert Kirsch on 4/

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, November 18, 2024
21 21 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 11/18 2:23 PM
TEXT ORDER : The Court is in receipt of the parties' briefing on pro se Plaintiff's motion to void the settlement agreement. (ECF Nos.19 and20 .) Plaintiff does not claim that Defendants failed to comply with the Settlement Agreement in any manner, but rather, Plaintiff regrets entering into the agreement, i.e., buyer's remorse, and simply claims he was in an "immoral state" and "under dire duress." (ECF No.19 ). Upon review of the briefing and the Settlement Agreement (ECF No. 20-9), the Court finds it is without jurisdiction to consider the Motion (ECF No.19 ). Issues pursuant to a settlement agreement are matters of contract law for state court. See Kokkonen v. Guardian Life Ins. Co. of Am. , 511 U.S. 375, 376 (1994). This is true even when a settlement agreement settles a federal claim. See Millar v. AmeriHealth Ins. Co. of N. J., No. 15-296, 2024 WL 1485867, at *2 (D.N.J. Apr. 5, 2024) (citing Nelson v. Pennsylvania, 125 F. App'x 380, 382 (3d Cir. 2005). For this Court to have jurisdiction, there must be "some independent basis for federal jurisdiction." E.O.H.C. v. Sec'y United States Dep't of Homeland Sec. , 950 F.3d 177, 193 (3d Cir. 2020) (quoting Kokkonen , 511 U.S. at 382) (internal quotation omitted). Here, there is no basis for ancillary jurisdiction because there is no Court order incorporating the terms of the Settlement Agreement nor any provision in the Settlement Agreement indicating any intent for this Court to retain jurisdiction. Millar , 2024 WL 1485867, at *2 (citing In re Phar-Mor, Inc. Sec. Litig. , 172 F.3d 270, 274 (3d Cir. 1999)). Therefore, the Motion is DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction. The Case is to remain CLOSED . So Ordered by Judge Robert Kirsch. (pdm)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
20 20 8 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition of Motion Mon 10/21 11:23 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Defendants re19 MOTION MOTION TO VOID SETTLEMENT REINSTATEMENT OF AMENDED COMPLAINT(FEGAN, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Jeffrey C. Fegan,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - plaintiff's Complaint, dated September 28, 2023,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - plaintiff's Amended Complaint, dated April 17, 2024,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - defendants' motion to dismiss plaintiff's Complaint and Amended Complaint, dated May 29, 2024,
Att: 5 Exhibit D - defendants' letter to the Court advising them of the parties' settlement and withdrawing their pre-answer motions to dismiss,
Att: 6 Exhibit E - Court's Order regarding the withdrawal of defendants' motion to dismiss plaintiff's Complaint,
Att: 7 Exhibit F - plaintiff's motion to dismiss his case, dated June 27, 2024,
Att: 8 Exhibit G - confirmation of delivery of the settlement check to plaintiff as regards this case,
Att: 9 Exhibit H - the settlement release signed by plaintiff John Lee Gore with respect to this case
Friday, October 04, 2024
19 19 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 10/04 4:17 PM
MOTION TO VOID SETTLEMENT REINSTATEMENT OF AMENDED COMPLAINT by JOHN LEE GORE. (jdg)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 10/04 4:17 PM
Set Deadlines as to19 MOTION TO VOID SETTLEMENT REINSTATEMENT OF AMENDED COMPLAINT. Motion set for 11/4/2024 before Judge Robert Kirsch. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
18 18 order Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Order on Motion to Withdraw Tue 09/17 4:17 PM
TEXT ORDER : The parties have settled this matter with respect to all claims (see ECF Nos.15 -17 ). The Court directs the clerk to TERMINATE the motions at ECF Nos.12 and17 and to CLOSE the matter. So Ordered by Judge Robert Kirsch on 09/17/2024. (pdm)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 09/17 4:27 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (pdm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
17 17 motion Withdraw Thu 06/27 2:40 PM
MOTION to Withdraw Complaint Pursuant to Settlement by JOHN LEE GORE.(kht)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 06/27 2:40 PM
Set Deadlines as to17 MOTION to Withdraw. Motion set for 8/5/2024 before Judge Robert Kirsch. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (kht)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order Mon 06/17 12:47 PM
LETTER ORDER granting request to withdraw13 Motion to Dismiss as moot. Signed by Judge Robert Kirsch on 6/17/2024. (mlh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
15 15 misc Letter Thu 06/13 11:34 AM
Letter from Jeffrey C. Fegan re13 MOTION to Dismiss ,14 Response in Opposition to Motion. (FEGAN, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
14 14 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 06/13 11:32 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition filed by JOHN LEE GORE re13 MOTION to Dismiss (kht)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 05/30 8:59 AM
Set Deadlines as to13 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 7/1/2024 before Judge Robert Kirsch. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (kht)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
13 13 motion Dismiss Wed 05/29 11:50 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by HARBOR FREIGHT TOOLS, ERIC SMIDT.(FEGAN, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Jeffrey C. Fegan,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's initial complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiff's amended complaint,
Att: 4 Brief,
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 6 Certificate of Service
Friday, May 17, 2024
12 12 motion Judgment on the Pleadings Fri 05/17 3:48 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by JOHN LEE GORE. (jal, )
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 05/17 3:49 PM
Set Deadlines as to12 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings. Motion set for 6/17/2024 before Judge Robert Kirsch. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jal, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 05/15 3:40 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS as to ERIC SMIDT served on 5/8/2024, answer due 5/29/2024. (kht)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 05/15 3:39 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS as to HARBOR FREIGHT TOOLS served on 5/8/2024, answer due 5/29/2024. (kht)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
9 9 service Summons Issued Mon 05/06 11:59 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to HARBOR FREIGHT TOOLS, ERIC SMIDT. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (kht)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Clerk Mon 05/06 11:49 AM
USM-285 forms received for HARBOR FREIGHT TOOLS and ERIC SMIDT (kht)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
8 8 3 pgs order Order Granting/Denying In Forma Pauperis Thu 04/25 2:14 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER that Plaintiff's1 -4 IFP Application is GRANTED. The Clerk shall file the Complaint. The Clerk of the Court shall provide Plaintiff with a copy of the USM-285 form for each named Defendant. Signed by Judge Robert Kirsch on 4/24/2024. (jdg)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation (public) Thu 04/25 2:15 PM
2 blank USM-285 Forms were sent to Plaintiff via regular mail on 4/25/2024. (jdg)
Related: [-]
cmp Complaint Thu 04/25 2:15 PM
COMPLAINT filed. See docket entry7 .(jdg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 04/17 4:03 PM
PROPOSED AMENDED COMPLAINT, filed by JOHN LEE GORE.(kht)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Application/Petition Wed 04/17 4:02 PM
PETITION for Writ of Mandamus for by JOHN LEE GORE.(kht)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Application IFP
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
5 5 appeal USCA Order (Does NOT Term Appeal) Tue 02/06 8:57 AM
CERTIFIED ORDER of USCA that the petition for writ of mandamus is DENIED. (jjc, )
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
4 4 misc Application/Petition Tue 12/05 2:21 PM
PETITION for Writ of Mandamus by JOHN LEE GORE.(mlh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Docket Sheet,
Att: 2 Envelope
Friday, September 29, 2023
3 3 notice Notice of Guidelines for Pro Se Filers Fri 09/29 11:10 AM
Notice of Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se (jjc, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
2 2 notice Notice (Other) Fri 09/29 11:09 AM
CONSENT & REGISTRATION to Receive Documents Electronically filed by JOHN LEE GORE (jjc, )
Related: [-]
1 1 service Complaint Received Fri 09/29 11:08 AM
Complaint Received.(jjc, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement of Case,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Application IFP,
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 6 Motion