New York Northern District Court
Judge:Brenda K Sannes
Referred: Paul J Evangelista
Case #: 1:23-cv-01218
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Sep 29, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 27, 2024 6:00 AM EDT
Defendant
Albany Med Health Partners
Represented By
Rebecca Jade LaPoint
Bond, Schoeneck & King PLLC
contact info
Michael D. Billok
Bond, Schoeneck & King, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Jonathan Braiman
Represented By
Michael J Murphy
Barclay Damon Llp - Albany Office
contact info
Defendant
Christine Calistri
Represented By
Karen A. Butler
Maynard O'Connor Smith & Catalinotto - Albany Office
contact info
Defendant
Donna Kirker
Represented By
Rebecca Jade LaPoint
Bond, Schoeneck & King PLLC
contact info
Michael D. Billok
Bond, Schoeneck & King, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Lisa West
Represented By
Karen A. Butler
Maynard O'Connor Smith & Catalinotto - Albany Office
contact info
Defendant
Glens Falls Hospital
Represented By
Rebecca Jade LaPoint
Bond, Schoeneck & King PLLC
contact info
Michael D. Billok
Bond, Schoeneck & King, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Malta Med Emergent Care
Represented By
Rebecca Jade LaPoint
Bond, Schoeneck & King PLLC
contact info
Michael D. Billok
Bond, Schoeneck & King, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Saratoga Hospital
Represented By
Rebecca Jade LaPoint
Bond, Schoeneck & King PLLC
contact info
Michael D. Billok
Bond, Schoeneck & King, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Tara Rule
PO Box 123
Round Lake, NY 12151

GPO Sep 04 2024
MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants' motions to dismiss (Dkt. Nos. 63, 66, 68) are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as noted herein. The following claims proceed: Plaintiff's Affordable Care Act claim (First Cause of Action) against the Hospital Defendants, Plaintiff's EMTALA claim (Eighth Cause of Action) against the Hospital Defendants, Plaintiff's negligence (medical malpractice) claim (Eleventh and Thirteenth Causes of Action) against Dr. Braiman, Calistri, and the Hospital Defendants, Plaintiff's negligence per se claim (Twelfth Cause of Action) against the Hospital Defendants, and Plaintiff's breach of confidence claims (Fifteenth Cause of Action) against the Hospital Defendants, Calistri, West, and Kirker. Signed by Chief Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 9/4/2024. (Attachments: # (1) Unpublished Case Law cited) (nmk)

Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
132 132 order Order on Letter Request Mon 04/28 11:48 AM
TEXT ORDER granting131 Letter Request from Michael D. Billok for Albany Med Health Partners, Glens Falls Hospital, Donna Kirker, Malta Med Emergent Care, Saratoga Hospital requesting Mediation Deadline Extension. The deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is extended to 10/31/2025. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Paul J. Evangelista on 4/28/2025. (tab)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
131 131 motion Letter Request/Motion Thu 04/24 2:01 PM
Letter Motion from Michael D. Billok for Albany Med Health Partners, Glens Falls Hospital, Donna Kirker, Malta Med Emergent Care, Saratoga Hospital requesting Mediation Deadline Extension submitted to Judge Paul J. Evangelista . (Billok, Michael)
Related: [-]