Heywood Healthcare, Inc.
Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Elizabeth D Katz |
Case #: | 4:23-bk-40817 |
Case Filed: | Oct 01, 2023 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $0 to $50,000 |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Heywood Healthcare, Inc.
242 Green St
Gardner, MA 01440-1336 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Assistant U.S. Trustee
Richard King
Office of US. Trustee 446 Main Street 14th Floor
Worcester, MA 01608 |
1. | Heywood Hospital files for bankruptcy (thegardnernews.com) |
Submitted Tue 10/03/2023 | |
Docket last updated: 50 minutes ago |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
701 | 701
notice
Notice
Mon 04/29 9:50 PM
Notice of Agenda for Hearing Scheduled for May 1, 2024 at 2:00 p.m. (ET) with certificate of service filed by Debtor Heywood Healthcare, Inc. (Green, Edward) |
|
700 | 700
notice
Notice
Mon 04/29 9:31 PM
Notice of Filing of Assented-To Sixth Interim Cash Collateral Order with certificate of service filed by Debtor Heywood Healthcare, Inc. (Green, Edward) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Sixth Interim Order | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Redline | ||
699 | 699
misc
Statement
Mon 04/29 5:22 PM
Statement - Certificate of No Objection for Docket No. 659 with certificate of service filed by Debtor Heywood Healthcare, Inc. (Green, Edward) |
|
698 | 698
crbatch
Claims Agent Certificate of Service
Mon 04/29 4:51 PM
Supplemental Certificate of Service . (Betance, Sheryl) |
|
697 | 697
order
Order on Motion Extend Time to Assume/Reject
Mon 04/29 8:45 AM
Order dated 4/29/2024 Re:685 Assented-To Emergency Omnibus Motion filed by Debtor Heywood Healthcare, Inc. for Further Extension of Time to Assume or Reject the Property Lease with Heywood Green Street LLC Regarding 242 Green Street, Gardner, MA. GRANTED. See Order for Full Text. (pf) |
|
696 | 696
order
Order on Motion Extend Time to Assume/Reject
Mon 04/29 8:42 AM
Order dated 4/29/2024 Re:680 Emergency Assented-to Motion filed by Debtor Heywood Healthcare, Inc. to Extend Time to Assume or Reject Real Property Leases re Pearson Lease with M-M2 LLC regarding 69 Pearson Blvd., Gardner, MA. GRANTED. See Order for Full Text. (pf) |
|
695 | 695
order
Order (Generic)
Mon 04/29 8:40 AM
Endorsed Order dated 4/29/2024 Re:675 Supplement to the Assented-To Emergency Omnibus Motion of Debtors for Further Extension of Time to Assume or Reject Real Property Leases filed by Debtor Heywood Healthcare, Inc. THE REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME TO ASSUME OR REJECT THE WALGREENS SUBLEASE (THE LEASE) WITH WALGREEN CO. REGARDING 266 MAIN STREET, GARDNER, MA IS GRANTED. THE DEADLINE FOR THE DEBTORS TO ASSUME OR REJECT THE LEASE IS EXTENDED TO MAY 31, 2024. (pf) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
694 | 694
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 04/26 6:04 PM
Certificate of Service filed by Health Care Ombudsman Joseph J. Tomaino (Hammel, Ian) |
|
693 | 693
notice
Notice
Fri 04/26 5:51 PM
Notice of no objection to first interim applications of PCO and Rimon, P.C. (docket nos. 615,616) filed by Health Care Ombudsman Joseph J. Tomaino (Hammel, Ian) |
|
692 | 692
crbatch
Claims Agent Certificate of Service
Fri 04/26 4:29 PM
Certificate of Service (Betance, Sheryl) |
|
691 | 691
misc
Statement
Fri 04/26 1:53 PM
Statement - Certificate of No Objection for Docket No. 593 with certificate of service filed by Debtor Heywood Healthcare, Inc. (Green, Edward) |
|
690 | 690
misc
Statement
Fri 04/26 12:49 PM
Statement - Certificate of No Objection for Docket No. 596 with certificate of service filed by Debtor Heywood Healthcare, Inc. (Green, Edward) |
|
689 | 689
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion Extend Time to Assume/Reject
Fri 04/26 9:24 AM
Order dated 4/26/2024 Re:669 Assented To Emergency Omnibus Motion filed by Debtor Heywood Healthcare, Inc. for Further Extension of Time to Assume or Reject Real Property Leases. APPROVED. See Order for Full Text. (pf) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
688 | 688
crbatch
Claims Agent Certificate of Service
Thu 04/25 7:29 PM
Certificate of Service (Betance, Sheryl) |
|
687 | 687
crbatch
Claims Agent Certificate of Service
Thu 04/25 2:18 PM
Certificate of Service (Betance, Sheryl) |
|
686 | 686
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion Extend Time to Assume/Reject
Thu 04/25 10:30 AM
Endorsed Order dated 4/25/2024 Re:685 Assented-To Emergency Omnibus Motion filed by Debtor Heywood Healthcare, Inc. for Further Extension of Time to Assume or Reject the Property Lease with Heywood Green Street LLC Regarding 242 Green Street, Gardner, MA. EMERGENCY DETERMINATION GRANTED. THIS MOTION WILL BE HELD FOR OBJECTIONS THROUGH APRIL 26, 2024. (pf) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
685 | 685
motion
Extend Time to Assume or Reject
Wed 04/24 5:46 PM
Emergency Motion filed by Debtor Heywood Healthcare, Inc. to Extend Time to Assume or Reject the Operating Lease with Heywood Green Street LLC regarding 242 Green Street, Gardner, MA (Assented-To) with certificate of service. (Green, Edward) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order | ||
684 | 684
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Extend
Wed 04/24 4:11 PM
Order dated 4/24/2024 Re:683 Emergency Motion filed by Debtor Heywood Healthcare, Inc. to Extend the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors' Deadlines Related to [Re:14 Motion for Cash Collateral]. GRANTED. See Order for Full Text. (ag) |
|
683 | 683
motion
Extend Time
Wed 04/24 2:31 PM
Emergency Motion filed by Debtor Heywood Healthcare, Inc. to Extend Time to Respond [Re:14 Motion for Cash Collateral] with certificate of service. (Green, Edward) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order | ||
682 | 682
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion Extend Time to Assume/Reject
Wed 04/24 2:17 PM
Endorsed Order dated 4/24/2024 Re:680 Emergency Motion filed by Debtor Heywood Healthcare, Inc. to Extend Time to Assume or Reject Real Propoerty Leases re Pearson Lease with M-M2 LLC regarding 69 Pearson Blvd., Gardner, MA. EMERGENCY DETERMINATION GRANTED. THIS MOTION WILL BE HELD FOR OBJECTIONS THROUGH APRIL 26, 2024. (ag) |
|
681 | 681
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
Wed 04/24 2:15 PM
Order dated 4/24/2024 Re:676 Motion filed by Jeremy R Fischer on behalf of Jay S. Geller to Appear pro hac vice for Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Heywood Healthcare, Inc. GRANTED. See Order for Full Text. (ag) |
|
680 | 680
motion
Extend Time to Assume or Reject
Wed 04/24 12:25 PM
Emergency Motion filed by Debtor Heywood Healthcare, Inc. to Extend Time to Assume or Reject Real Propoerty Leases re Pearson Lease with M-M2 LLC regarding 69 Pearson Blvd., Gardner, MA (Assented-To) with certificate of service. (Green, Edward) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order | ||
court
Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic
Wed 04/24 9:24 AM
Receipt Number phv-19005-1713895780, Fee Amount $100.00 Re:677 Notice of Fee Due (Pro Hac Vice) issued to Jay S. Geller representing Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors |
||
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
679 | 679
crbatch
Claims Agent Certificate of Service
Tue 04/23 4:51 PM
Supplemental Certificate of Service . (Betance, Sheryl) |
|
678 | 678
1
pgs
order
Order (Generic)
Tue 04/23 3:47 PM
Endorsed Order dated 4/23/2024 Re:675 Supplement to the Assented-To Emergency Omnibus Motion of Debtors for Further Extension of Time to Assume or Reject Real Property Leases filed by Debtor Heywood Healthcare, Inc. THE COURT WILL NOT TREAT THIS AS A SUPPLEMENT, BUT AS A SEPARATE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO ASSUME OR REJECT THE "WALGREENS SUBLEASE WITH WALGREEN CO. REGARDING 266 MAIN STREET, GARDNER, MA. THE DEADLINE TO OBJECT TO THIS REQUEST IS APRIL 26, 2024. (pf) |
|
677 | 677
notice
Notice of Fee Due (Pro Hac Vice)
Tue 04/23 3:19 PM
Notice of Fee Due (Pro Hac Vice) issued to Jay S. Geller representing Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors PHV Fee Due 5/3/2024. (pf) |
|
676 | 676
motion
Appear pro hac vice
Tue 04/23 1:53 PM
Motion filed by Jeremy R Fischer on behalf of Jay S. Geller to Appear pro hac vice for Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Heywood Healthcare, Inc.. (Fischer, Jeremy) |
|
Att: 1 Ex. A - Geller Declaration | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
675 | 675
misc
Supplemental Document
Tue 04/23 12:56 PM
Supplemental Document: Supplement to the Assented-To Emergency Omnibus Motion of Debtors for Further Extension of Time to Assume or Reject Real Property Leases with certificate of service filed by Debtor Heywood Healthcare, Inc. (Green, Edward) |
|
674 | 674
crbatch
Claims Agent Certificate of Service
Tue 04/23 12:47 PM
Supplemental Certificate of Service (Betance, Sheryl) |
|
673 | 673
notice
Notice
Tue 04/23 9:41 AM
Notice of Receipt of Draft Lien Challenge Complaint and Draft Non-Lien Challenge Complaint and Tolling of Committee Challenge Deadlines with certificate of service filed by Debtor Heywood Healthcare, Inc. (Green, Edward) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
672 | 672
crbatch
Claims Agent Certificate of Service
Mon 04/22 8:51 PM
Certificate of Service (Betance, Sheryl) |
|
671 | 671
crbatch
Claims Agent Certificate of Service
Mon 04/22 4:35 PM
Certificate of Service (Betance, Sheryl) |
|
670 | 670
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion Extend Time to Assume/Reject
Mon 04/22 12:04 PM
Endorsed Order dated 4/22/2024 Re:669 Assented To Emergency Omnibus Motion filed by Debtor Heywood Healthcare, Inc. to Extend Time to Assume or Reject Real Property Leases. EMERGENCY DETERMINATION GRANTED. THIS MOTION WILL BE HELD FOR OBJECTIONS THROUGH APRIL 25, 2024. (ag) |