New Jersey District Court
Judge:William H Walls
Referred: Cathy L Waldor
Case #: 2:14-cv-06856
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Oct 31, 2014
Terminated:Dec 19, 2014
Last checked: Thursday May 14, 2015 12:40 PM EDT
Defendant
HAMPTON CREEK, INC.
Represented By
MICHAEL M. MERLEY
Boies Schiller & Flexner LLP
contact info
Notice Only
PHV PARKER H. BAGLEY
Notice Only
DAVID H. BERNSTEIN
Notice Only
JARED I. KAGAN
Notice Only
PHV JOSHUA I. SCHILLER
Notice Only
DAVID SNYDER
Plaintiff
CONOPCO, INC.
Represented By
MICHAEL R. POTENZA
Debevoise & Plimpton, LLP
contact info


1. Mayonnaise giant Unilever drops lawsuit against Hampton Creek (blog.sfgate.com)
Submitted Fri 12/19/2014
2. 'Mayo' sold at Kroger, other stores hit with lawsuit (cincinnati.com)
Submitted Thu 11/13/2014
3. Lawsuit Could Force Upstart Condiment Brand to Hold the 'Mayo' (time.com)
Submitted Tue 11/11/2014
4. Hellmann's Seeks Justice vs. Just Mayo (online.wsj.com)
Submitted Tue 11/11/2014
5. Big Mayo Files Frivolous Lawsuit Against Eggless Competitor (eatdrinkpolitics.com)
Submitted Mon 11/10/2014
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Tuesday, June 23, 2015
order Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Tue 06/23 3:33 PM
terminating10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction per chambers (emc, )
Related: [-]
Monday, December 22, 2014
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The (Set/Reset hearing for Trial beginning on 4/28/2015 which was filed on (12/19/2014 ) appears to be filed in the incorrect case. This case is closed. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (emc ) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 19, 2014
utility Terminate Civil Case Fri 12/19 2:16 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. [per chmbrs.] (DD, )
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Fri 12/19 3:11 PM
SET HEARING FOR TRIAL: -------- Jury Selection and Jury trial has been set for 4/28/2015 @ 09:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 4D before Judge William H. Walls. Pre trial motions will be due by March 30, 2015. All other submissions are due as provided in the final pretrial order. (emc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 18, 2014
34 34 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 12/18 6:01 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by CONOPCO, INC. (KELLER, BRUCE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 17, 2014
33 33 order Stipulation and Order Wed 12/17 8:31 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER that Defendant Hampton Creek, Inc. shall file and serve its response to the complaint on or before January 9, 2015. Defendant Hampton Creek, Inc. shall file and serve its opposition to the pending motion for preliminary injunction on or before February 13, 2015. Plaintiff Unilever shall file its reply papers on or before March 6, 2015. Signed by Judge William H. Walls on 12/17/14. (DD, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 16, 2014
32 32 misc Stipulation Tue 12/16 2:51 PM
STIPULATION By Conopco, Inc. and by HAMPTON CREEK, INC.. (MERLEY, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 15, 2014
31 31 respm Certification in Support of Motion Mon 12/15 6:28 PM
CERTIFICATION in Support filed by CONOPCO, INC. re10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction / Notice of Motion for Preliminary Injunction /Declaration of E. Deborah Jay, PH.D.(POTENZA, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Survey Report
Tuesday, December 09, 2014
notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added Tue 12/09 8:58 AM
Pro Hac Vice counsel, JOSHUA I. SCHILLER, PARKER H. BAGLEY and DAVID SNYDER, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (sr, )
Related: [-]
Monday, December 08, 2014
30 30 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Mon 12/08 12:35 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice David Snyder to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-6088732.) (MERLEY, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
29 29 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Mon 12/08 12:31 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Parker H. Bagley to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-6088712.) (MERLEY, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
28 28 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Mon 12/08 12:27 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Joshua I. Schiller to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-6088680.) (MERLEY, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 03, 2014
27 27 minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 12/04 4:10 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Walls: Scheduling Conference held on 12/3/2014, Set Deadlines/Hearing as to10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction / Notice of Motion for Preliminary Injunction :( Motion set for 3/31/2015 09:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 4D before Judge William H. Walls.). (Court Reporter/Recorder Chuck McGuire.) (em, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 02, 2014
26 26 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 12/02 3:46 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David Snyder, Esq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 12/2/2014. (anr)
Related: [-]
25 25 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 12/02 3:45 PM
ORDER granting15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Joshua I. Schiller, Esq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 12/2/2014. (anr)
Related: [-]
24 24 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 12/02 3:43 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Parker H. Bagley, Esq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 12/2/2014. (anr)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 01, 2014
23 23 order Order Mon 12/01 11:52 AM
TEXT ORDER: Per docket entry #22, the time for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint is extended until December 19, 2014 at 5:00 pmSo ORDERED by Judge William H. Walls on 12/1/2014. (emc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 25, 2014
22 22 STIPULATION re1 Complaint Stipulation Re: Extension Of Time To Respond To Complaint To Be So Ordered by HAMPTON CREEK, INC.. (MERLEY, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
21 21 DECLARATION of Michael Mazis [SUPPLEMENTAL] re10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction / Notice of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by CONOPCO, INC..(POTENZA, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Wednesday, November 19, 2014
20 20 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jared I. Kagan to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (POTENZA, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
19 19 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice David H. Bernstein to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (POTENZA, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Set/Reset Hearings: ------- Scheduling Conference set for 12/3/2014 at 10:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 4D before Judge William H. Walls. (emc)
Related: [-]
Pro Hac Vice counsel, JARED I. KAGAN and DAVID H. BERNSTEIN, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jd, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 18, 2014
18 18 TEXT ORDER : Per docket entries #13 & #17, Defendant's response will be due on Jan. 12, 2015. Plaintiff's reply will be due Jan. 26, 2015. Oral argument scheduled for 12/17/14 is adjourned and parties will be notified when it is rescheduled. So ORDERED by Judge William H. Walls on 11/18/2014. (em, )
Related: [-]
Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number NEW021943 RE: Jared I. Kagan. (sr, )
Related: [-]
Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number NEW021944 RE: David H. Bernstein. (sr, )
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 16, 2014
14 ,15 ,16 MOTIONS TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE [chmbrs. will notify counsel if oral argument is necessary] (DD, )
Related: [-]
Friday, November 14, 2014
17 17 TEXT ORDER: Per docket entry #13, the Defendant's response is now due for 12/8/14 and Plaintiff's reply is due on 12/15/14. Oral argument is now reset for December 17, 2014, at 9:30 am. SO ORDERED by Judge William H. Walls on 12/14/2014. (emc)
Related: [-]
16 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by HAMPTON CREEK, INC..(MERLEY, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Michael M. Merley,
Att: 2 Declaration David Snyder,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
15 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by HAMPTON CREEK, INC..(MERLEY, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Michael M. Merley,
Att: 2 Declaration Joshua I. Schiller,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
14 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by HAMPTON CREEK, INC..(MERLEY, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Michael M. Merley,
Att: 2 Declaration Parker H. Bagley,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
13 13 Letter from Joshua I. Schiller. (MERLEY, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
12 12 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL M. MERLEY on behalf of HAMPTON CREEK, INC. (MERLEY, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 10, 2014
11 11 TEXT ORDER: briefing schedule on the motion for preliminary injunction (#10); Defendant's Response is due on November 17, 2014 and Plaintiff's Reply is due on November 24, 2014. Oral argument for December 2, 2014 at 11:00 AM. SO ORDERED by Judge William H. Walls on 11/10/14. (DD, )
Related: [-]
10 MOTION FOR PRELIMARY INJ. [chmbrs. will notify counsel if oral argument is necessary] (DD, )
Related: [-]
Friday, November 07, 2014
10 10 2 pgs MOTION for Preliminary Injunction / Notice of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by CONOPCO, INC..(POTENZA, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Michael Mazis in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Mazis Declaration,
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Mazis Declaration,
Att: 4 Exhibit C to Mazis Declaration,
Att: 5 Exhibit D to Mazis Declaration,
Att: 6 Exhibit E to Mazis Declaration,
Att: 7 Declaration of Ryu Yokoi in Support,
Att: 8 Exhibit A to Yokoi Declaration,
Att: 9 Exhibit B to Yokoi Declaration,
Att: 10 Exhibit C to Yokoi Declaration,
Att: 11 Exhibit D to Yokoi Declaration,
Att: 12 Exhibit E to Yokoi Declaration,
Att: 13 Exhibit F to Yokoi Declaration,
Att: 14 Exhibit G (Part 1 of 2) to Yokoi Declaration,
Att: 15 Exhibit G (Part 2 of 2) to Yokoi Declaration,
Att: 16 Exhibit H to Yokoi Declaration,
Att: 17 Exhibit I to Yokoi Declaration,
Att: 18 Exhibit J to Yokoi Declaration,
Att: 19 Exhibit K to Yokoi Declaration,
Att: 20 Exhibit L to Yokoi Declaration,
Att: 21 Exhibit M to Yokoi Declaration,
Att: 22 Exhibit N to Yokoi Declaration,
Att: 23 Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction,
Att: 24 [Proposed] Preliminary Injunction Order,
Att: 25 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, November 05, 2014
9 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CONOPCO, INC.. HAMPTON CREEK, INC. served on 11/5/2014, answer due 11/26/2014. (POTENZA, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER granting6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jared I. Kagan, Esq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 11/5/2014. (anr)
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER granting5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David H. Bernstein, Esq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 11/5/2014. (anr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 04, 2014
5 &6 MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE [chmbrs. will notify counsel if oral argument is necessary] (DD, )
Related: [-]
Monday, November 03, 2014
6 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice re: Jared I. Kagan by CONOPCO, INC..(POTENZA, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
5 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice re: David H. Bernstein by CONOPCO, INC..(POTENZA, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
4 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to HAMPTON CREEK, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Maria F. Garcia* (mfg)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 31, 2014
3 3 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (mfg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint
2 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CONOPCO, INC. identifying UNILEVER, PLC and UNILEVER NV as Corporate Parent. (mfg)
Related: [-]
1 1 17 pgs COMPLAINT against HAMPTON CREEK, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-6026183), filed by CONOPCO, INC..(mfg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet