North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:Terrence W Boyle
Case #: 4:23-cv-00156
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Case Filed:Sep 30, 2023
Terminated:Oct 11, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Mar 28, 2024 6:41 AM EDT
Petitioner
Erik Kertesz
Represented By
Sharika M. Robinson
The Law Offices Of Sharika M. Robinson
contact info
Respondent
Colony Tire Corporation
Respondent
Charles Creighton
Respondent
Scott Creighton


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
order Order Wed 10/11 9:24 AM
TEXT ORDER of Redesignation - At the direction of the Court, and for the continued efficient administration of justice, the above-captioned case is redesignated as a Eastern Division miscellaneous case. The Honorable Terrence W. Boyle, United States District Judge, is the presiding judge. All future filings should reflect the new case number of 4:23-MC-4-BO. No further filing shall be made in 4:23-CV-156. Petitioner is directed to pay the $49.00 miscellaneous filing fee on or before October 25, 2023. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/11/2023. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Counsel Wed 10/11 9:25 AM
Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 10/11 9:36 AM
Case Redesignated as a miscellaneous case as directed and reassigned to District Judge Terrence W. Boyle in text order by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 30, 2023
2 2 notice Notice-other Sat 09/30 11:00 AM
Notice filed by Erik Kertesz regarding1 Notice to Take Foreign Deposition Motion and Order Attached . (Robinson, Sharika)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Notice to Take Foreign Deposition Sat 09/30 10:07 AM
NOTICE to Take Foreign Deposition from Holli Quinn., filed by Erik Kertesz. (Robinson, Sharika)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Quinn Deposition Subpoena,
Att: 2 Exhibit Quinn Document Subpoena,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Document Subpoena