Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Jeremy D Kernodle
Case #: 6:23-cv-00489
Nature of Suit245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability
Cause15:2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Case Filed:Oct 01, 2023
Terminated:Mar 10, 2025
Last checked: Friday Mar 29, 2024 5:08 AM CDT
Defendant
William C Jacobs
Defendant
Matt Winters
Defendant
Christopher G Wheeler
Defendant
Nicholas Warrender
Defendant
Savage Enterprises
Defendant
Savage Eliquid Corporation
Defendant
Austin Ruple
Defendant
Pur ISO Labs, LLC
Defendant
Pharmlabs SD
Defendant
Packwoods
Defendant
Matthew Montesano
Defendant
Edgar A Mohammed
Defendant
Mellow Monkey
Defendant
Marin Analytics, LLC
Defendant
Lifted Made
Defendant
Gerard M Jacobs
Defendant
ISO Analytics
Defendant
Barry Hollingsworth
Defendant
Julia Hamieh
Defendant
Samuel Habib
Defendant
Feel Good Industry LLC
Defendant
Jon Dougherty
Defendant
Sig Distro
Defendant
Delta Extrax
Defendant
Crave
Defendant
Anthony Capone
Defendant
Sheikhani Group
Represented By
Michelle Donovan
Esperance Donovan PLLC
contact info
David Lee Ovard
Clark Hill, PLC
contact info
Jose Vela, Jr
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
Defendant
Ali Sheikhani
Represented By
Maliha Mian
contact info
Lekeaka Defang
contact info
Plaintiff
Loree Perry
Represented By
Luther Sutter
Sutter & Gillham P.L.L.C.
contact info
James Monroe Scurlock
Wallace, Martin, Duke & Russell PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, March 10, 2025
59 59 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 03/11 11:15 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 3/10/2025. (gsm)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 08, 2025
58 58 4 pgs motion Dismiss Sat 03/08 5:12 PM
MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice by Loree Perry.(Scurlock, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
57 57 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 03/05 12:57 PM
ORDER granting55 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re36 Amended Complaint . Answer due 3/17/2025. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 3/5/2025. (gsm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
56 56 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Tue 03/04 4:07 PM
PROPOSED Additional Attachments to Main Document:55 AGREED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re36 Amended Complaint . Proposed Order . (Workman, Zshona)
Related: [-]
55 55 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 03/04 4:04 PM
AGREED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re36 Amended Complaint by Alan Wadhwania, Cali Kulture. (Workman, Zshona)
Related: [-]
54 54 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 03/04 3:51 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Zshona Workman on behalf of Alan Wadhwania, Cali Kulture (Workman, Zshona)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
53 53 motion Dismiss Mon 03/03 3:42 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by ISO Analytics.(McElroy, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A