Original Case: 1:23-cv-00746

Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-02768
Typecivil / private / civil rights
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Case Filed:Sep 29, 2023
Terminated:Dec 15, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 20, 2023 5:17 AM EST
Defendant - Appellee
PETE J. CHRUSTOWSKI
Defendant - Appellee
SHELLY M. CHRUSTOWSKI
Plaintiff - Appellant
RENEE CHRUSTOWSKI
Represented By
Renee Chrustowski
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/20/2023 5:17 AM EST
Friday, September 29, 2023
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (PDB)
Related: [-]
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Renee Chrustowski in District Court No. 1-23-cv-00746. (PDB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Civil Case Docketed
Att: 2 1 pgs Case Caption
Att: 3 2 pgs Case Opening Letter
1 pgs NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (PDB)
Related: [-]