New Jersey District Court
Judge:Renee Marie Bumb
Referred: Matthew J Skahill
Case #: 1:23-cv-20791
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Sep 29, 2023
Terminated:Nov 21, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 27, 2024 6:17 AM EDT
Defendant
CEDARS BUSINESS SERVICES LLC.
Plaintiff
JUWAN TINLEY
P.O. BOX 126
GRENLOCH, NJ 08032


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 11/21 3:58 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by JUWAN TINLEY.(alb, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, October 02, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 10/02 10:59 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to CEDARS BUSINESS SERVICES LLC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jab,N.M.)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Guidelines for Pro Se Filers Mon 10/02 10:58 AM
Notice of Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se (jab,N.M.)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 10/02 10:57 AM
COMPLAINT against CEDARS BUSINESS SERVICES LLC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number CAM14722) with JURY DEMAND, filed by JUWAN TINLEY.(jab,N.M.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons