California Central District Court
Judge:Karen L Stevenson
Case #: 2:23-cv-08248
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Oct 02, 2023
Terminated:Dec 11, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Mar 30, 2024 1:49 AM PDT
Defendant
German Nathan Espitia
Defendant
Linda Dianne Maclean
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Maria Garcia
Represented By
Jason J Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason T. Yoon
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Kevin Hyunjong Hong
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason J. Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Friday, December 08, 2023
8 8 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Fri 12/08 4:55 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by PLAINTIFF Maria Garcia. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
7 7 misc Notice to Counsel (CV-14) Reminder re MJ Civil Consent Pilot Project-optional html form Fri 10/27 11:00 AM
REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (hr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
6 6 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 10/03 9:09 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants German Nathan Espitia, Linda Dianne Maclean. (sh)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form Tue 10/03 9:07 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (sh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CV-11C
Monday, October 02, 2023
4 4 notice Summons Request Mon 10/02 11:53 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Maria Garcia. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 10/02 11:52 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 10/02 11:50 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Maria Garcia. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 10/02 11:49 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36144071 - Fee: $402. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Maria Garcia(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]