Colorado District Court
Judge:S Kato Crews
Referred: James P O'Hara
Case #: 1:23-cv-02566
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Oct 02, 2023
Terminated:Sep 05, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Mar 30, 2024 3:08 AM MDT
Defendant
LexisNexis Risk Solutions, Inc.
Represented By
Nicole K. Serfoss
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
James Francis McCabe
Alston & Bird LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kaitlyn Rose Slaughter
Represented By
James P. Ristvedt
Consumer Attorneys PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Thursday, September 05, 2024
36 36 utility Terminate Civil Case - PUBLIC Thu 09/05 12:37 PM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to 35 Order. Text Only Entry. (jrobe, )
Related: [-]
35 35 order Order Thu 09/05 10:38 AM
ORDER: This matter is before the Court on the34 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice As to Defendant LexisNexis Risk Solutions Inc., which is a self-effectuating stipulation of dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiff's claims against LexisNexis were dismissed with prejudice as of the filing of the Stipulation. Each party shall bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. LexisNexis was the only defendant in this case and the Court directs the Clerk of Court to terminate this case accordingly. By Judge S. Kato Crews on 9/5/2024. Text Only Entry (skcja, )
Related: [-]
34 34 misc Stipulation of Dismissal of Party Thu 09/05 10:30 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party as to Defendant LexisNexis Risk Solutions Inc. by Plaintiff Kaitlyn Rose Slaughter.(Ristvedt, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only)
Friday, April 26, 2024
33 33 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Fri 04/26 11:36 AM
ORDER granting31 Motion for Extension of Time to File re31 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 4/26/2024. Discovery due by 10/22/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 11/21/2024. (msmot, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
32 32 order Order Referring Motion Thu 04/25 4:33 PM
MEMORANDUM: re31 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Kaitlyn Rose Slaughter. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. By U.S. District Judge S. Kato Crews on 4/25/2024. Text Only Entry (skcja, )
Related: [-]
31 31 motion Extension of Time Thu 04/25 4:05 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Plaintiff Kaitlyn Rose Slaughter.(Ristvedt, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only)
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
30 30 6 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Tue 03/12 2:44 PM
ORDER granting28 Motion for Protective Order by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 3/12/2024.(msmot)
Related: [-]
29 29 order Order Referring Motion Tue 03/12 7:00 AM
MEMORANDUM: re28 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Kaitlyn Rose Slaughter. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. By U.S. District Judge S. Kato Crews on 3/12/2024. Text Only Entry (skcja, )
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Protective Order Tue 03/12 6:36 AM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff Kaitlyn Rose Slaughter.(Ristvedt, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only)
Thursday, February 08, 2024
27 27 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Thu 02/08 10:49 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by James Francis McCabe on behalf of LexisNexis Risk Solutions, Inc.Attorney James Francis McCabe added to party LexisNexis Risk Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft) (McCabe, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
26 26 misc Reassigning Magistrate Judge Thu 01/25 2:37 PM
REASSIGNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Due to the recent appointment of Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews as a United States District Judge, this case is reassigned to visiting Magistrate Judge James P. OHara. All future pleadings should reference Magistrate Judge OHara at the end of the civil action number (such as 23-cv-2566-SKC-JPO). Unless otherwise ordered, the dates and times for all previously scheduled matters will be maintained. Judge OHaras chambers can be reached at 913-735- 2287 and ksd_ohara_chambers@ksd.uscourts.gov (Text only entry).(efoga, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
25 25 order Minute Order Tue 01/23 9:36 AM
MINUTE ORDER It is this Court's practice to hold a final pretrial conference after all dispositive motions have been ruled on. The final pretrial conference set for 1/21/2025 is VACATED and will be reset once all dispositive motions have been ruled on, if any, or after the dispositive motions have passed if no motions have been filed. SO ORDERED by U.S. District Judge S. Kato Crews on 1/23/2024. Text Only Entry (skcja, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
24 24 misc Reassigning Judge Fri 01/19 10:43 AM
REASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE. This action is reassigned to Judge S. Kato Crews upon his appointment as United States District Judge. Unless otherwise ordered, the dates and times for all previously scheduled matters will be maintained. Judge Crews is located in Courtroom C201 in the Byron G. Rogers United States Courthouse and his chambers is in C-250. His telephone number is (303) 335-2117. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-02566-SKC. (Text only entry) (norlin, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
23 23 order Minute Order Fri 01/05 1:39 PM
MINUTE ORDER: A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 1/21/2025 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom A 702 before Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney. The parties' Proposed Final Pretrial Order is due by 1/14/2025. By Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 1/5/2024. Text Only Entry (cnsja. )
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
22 22 utility Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings - PUBLIC Fri 01/05 6:53 AM
Discovery due by 8/23/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 9/22/2024. Deadlines entered pursuant to scheduling order21 . Text Only Entry (amont, )
Related: [-]
21 21 13 pgs order Order Thu 01/04 11:19 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The Scheduling Conference was set to occur on January 9, 2024, by telephone. The Court has reviewed the parties' proposed Scheduling Order and finds that holding the Scheduling Conference is unnecessary. The Court VACATES the Scheduling Conference and issues the attached Scheduling Order. The Parties should read the Scheduling Order in its entirety based on modifications or additions the Court made to their proposed order. Counsel shall further read and adhere to the civil practice standards of both the presiding district judge and the referral magistrate judge. It is ORDERED that, within 24 hours of the date of this Scheduling Order, the parties jointly email Judge Sweeney's chambers to obtain a date for the Final Pretrial Conference . By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 01/04/2024. (skc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
20 20 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Tue 01/02 3:22 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Kaitlyn Rose Slaughter. (Ristvedt, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
19 19 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 12/13 7:38 PM
ANSWER to18 Amended Complaint by LexisNexis Risk Solutions, Inc..(Serfoss, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
18 18 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 11/29 3:05 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT (First) against LexisNexis Risk Solutions, Inc., filed by Kaitlyn Rose Slaughter.(Ristvedt, James)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify Wed 11/29 9:35 AM
ORDER re15 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify. Having reviewed the Motion and in light of its unopposed nature, Plaintiff's request to amend the pleadings is GRANTED. On or before the close of business on November 30, 2023, Plaintiff shall file a clean copy of the Amended Complaint. Defendant may answer or otherwise respond in accordance with the Federal Rules. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 11/29/2023. Text Only Entry (skclc1)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
16 16 order Memorandum Tue 11/28 2:04 PM
MEMORANDUM regarding15 Unopposed Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify1 Complaint. Motion15 is referred to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews, by Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 11/28/2023. Text Only Entry (cnsja. )
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Amend/Correct/Modify Tue 11/28 1:41 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Kaitlyn Rose Slaughter.(Ristvedt, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: Redlined First Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2: First Amended Complaint,
Att: 3 Proposed Order (PDF Only)
Thursday, November 02, 2023
14 14 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond Thu 11/02 2:21 PM
ORDER re11 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond. LexisNexis Risk Solutions, Inc.'s answer or other response is due 11/27/2023. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 11/2/2023. Text Only Entry (skclc1)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 11/02 11:26 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent LexisNexis Risk Holdings Inc. for LexisNexis Risk Solutions, Inc.. (Serfoss, Nicole)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Memorandum Thu 11/02 8:24 AM
MEMORANDUM regarding11 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond. by Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 11/2/2023. Text Only Entry (cnsja.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond Wed 11/01 4:31 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendant LexisNexis Risk Solutions, Inc.. (Serfoss, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
10 10 order Minute Order Wed 10/25 8:17 AM
MINUTE ORDER Setting Telephone Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 1/9/2024 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, no later than seven calendar days before the conference. At the scheduled time, counsel shall call the Court provided conference line at (888) 251-2909 Access Code: 5662814#. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 10/25/2023. Text Only Entry (amont, )
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
9 9 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Mon 10/23 1:24 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kaitlyn Rose Slaughter. LexisNexis Risk Solutions, Inc. served on 10/16/2023, answer due 11/6/2023. (Ristvedt, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
8 8 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 10/11 9:49 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews for non-dispositive matters . Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. By Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 10/11/2023. Text Only Entry (jdyne)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
7 7 misc Letter Reassigning Case Wed 10/11 8:11 AM
CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to6 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-02566-CNS. (Text Only Entry) (sphil, )
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
6 6 misc Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge Mon 10/02 3:27 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Kaitlyn Rose Slaughter All parties do not consent.. (Ristvedt, James)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Magistrate Judge Consent Form Mon 10/02 3:11 PM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (schap, )
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs misc Memorandum Returning Case Mon 10/02 3:10 PM
MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Robert E. Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews for all further proceedings. (schap, )
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Summons Issued Mon 10/02 2:00 PM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (efoga, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form
2 2 misc Case Assigned to Judge Mon 10/02 1:59 PM
Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry (efoga, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 10/02 1:05 PM
COMPLAINT against LexisNexis Risk Solutions, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-9323544)Attorney James P. Ristvedt added to party Kaitlyn Rose Slaughter(pty:pla), filed by Kaitlyn Rose Slaughter.(Ristvedt, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons