California Central District Court
Judge:Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpo
Referred: Maria A Audero
Case #: 2:23-cv-08257
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Personal Injury
Case Filed:Oct 02, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Mar 30, 2024 1:51 AM PDT
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
Represented By
Christopher M McDonald
Murchison And Cumming LLP
contact info
Christopher A. Brown
Murchison And Cumming, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Nilda Colon
Represented By
Arsen Sarapinian
Law Offices Of Arsen Sarapinan PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, February 07, 2025
17 17 order For Order Fri 02/07 12:18 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR ORDER RE: INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATION16 by Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff NILDA COLON ("Plaintiff") will submit to an orthopedic medical examination WHEREAS, the Parties have agreed to the following terms for the examination: SEE DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS. (es)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
16 16 stip Discovery Tue 02/04 3:13 PM
STIPULATION for Discovery as to Independent Medical Examination filed by Defendant Walmart Inc..(Attorney Martin Moreno added to party Walmart Inc.(pty:dft))(Moreno, Martin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (Proposed) order granting stipulation for order re: independent medical examination
Friday, January 24, 2025
15 15 order Substitute Attorney Mon 01/27 3:15 PM
ORDER by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong: GRANTING14 Request to Substitute Attorney Grant D. Waterkotte. Attorney Nancy N Potter; Christopher A. Brown and Christopher M McDonald terminated. (yl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
14 14 motion Substitute Attorney (G-01) Thu 01/23 6:48 PM
REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Grant D. Waterkotte in place of attorney Christopher M McDonald filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Attorney Grant D Waterkotte added to party Walmart Inc.(pty:dft)) (Waterkotte, Grant)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PROPOSED) ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Wed 10/23 11:22 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Nancy N Potter counsel for Defendant Walmart Inc.. Adding Nancy N. Potter as counsel of record for Walmart, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Walmart, Inc.. (Attorney Nancy N Potter added to party Walmart Inc.(pty:dft))(Potter, Nancy)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
12 12 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 09/24 4:46 PM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND ALL TRIAL-RELATED DEADLINES [ECF NO.11 ] by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. Based upon the foregoing Stipulation and GOOD CAUSE having been shown therefore, It is so ORDERED that: The March 24, 2025, trial date in this matter is continued to August 25, 2025, at 9:00 am in Courtroom 8B. The March 5, 2025, trial readiness conference in this matter is continued to August 6, 2025, at 8:30 am in Courtroom 8B. All other dates and deadlines are set forth in the Amended Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Date Discovery which is attached to this Order as Exhibit A. (yl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
11 11 stip Continue Trial Tue 09/10 10:52 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue TRIAL DATE AND ALL TRIAL- RELATED DEADLINES from March 24, 2025 to August 25, 2025 Re: Order,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,,, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,,,10 , Joint STIPULATION for Jury Trial on August 25, 2025 filed by Defendant Walmart Inc..(McDonald, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
10 10 18 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Tue 08/06 9:25 AM
CIVIL TRIAL ORDER by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Scheduling Conference scheduled August 8, 2024 is hereby VACATED. The Scheduling Order governing this action is set forth in the Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates chart. The Jury trial is 3/24/2025, at 8:30 a.m. The final pretrial conference is set for 3/5/2025, at 9:00 am. The discovery cut-off is 9/18/2024. The last date to hear motions is 12/12/2024. The last date to conduct settlement conference is 12/25/2024. Stipulations extending dates set by the Court are not effective unless approved by the Court, and without compelling factual support and a showing of due diligence, stipulations continuing dates set by the Court will be denied. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See document for further details) (yl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
9 9 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Tue 07/30 2:58 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Defendant Walmart Inc... (McDonald, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
8 8 9 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Tue 05/07 10:47 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. This matter is set for a Scheduling Conference on the above date in Courtroom 8B of the First Street Courthouse, 350 West First Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012. If Plaintiff has not already served the operative complaint on all Defendants, Plaintiff shall do so promptly and shall file proofs of service within three (3) days thereafter. Scheduling Conference set for 8/8/2024 at 10:00 AM. Scheduling Conference set for August 8, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (yl)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
7 7 notice Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Fri 10/20 4:25 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver to Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:23-cv-08257 MEMF(MAAx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
6 6 misc Notice to Counsel (CV-14) Reminder re MJ Civil Consent Pilot Project-optional html form Tue 10/10 10:25 AM
REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (dml)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Fri 10/06 4:24 PM
ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Walmart Inc..(McDonald, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
4 4 misc Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form Tue 10/03 9:18 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (sh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CV-11C
Monday, October 02, 2023
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 10/02 1:54 PM
Certificate and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Walmart, Inc., identifying Walmart, Inc.. (McDonald, Christopher)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 10/02 1:52 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Walmart, Inc.. (McDonald, Christopher)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 10/02 1:51 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 23VECV03795 Receipt No: ACACDC-36145336 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Walmart, Inc.. (Attorney Christopher M McDonald added to party Walmart, Inc.(pty:dft))(McDonald, Christopher)
Related: [-]
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Tue 10/03 9:16 AM
CONFORMED EFILED COPY OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Walmart Inc., filed by Plaintiff Nilda Colon.[FILED IN STATE COURT 08/30/2023 SUBMITTED AS EXHIBIT A ATTACHED TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ] (sh)
Related: [-]