California Central District Court
Judge:David O Carter
Referred: Autumn D Spaeth
Case #: 8:23-cv-01854
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Oct 02, 2023
Terminated:Jul 12, 2024
Case in other court:Orange County Superior Court, 30-02022-01270531
Last checked: Saturday Mar 30, 2024 1:53 AM PDT
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Pacific Life Insurance Company
Represented By
Matthew E Lilly
Finlayson Toffer Roosevelt And Lilly LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Cherylyn C. Uy
Represented By
Bridget E. Hulburt
Dixon Firm
contact info
Tarina Mand
The Dixon Firm, Apc
contact info
Gerissa S Conforti
The Dixon Firm, Apc
contact info
Plaintiff
Dennis A. Uy
Represented By
Bridget E. Hulburt
Dixon Firm
contact info
Tarina Mand
The Dixon Firm, Apc
contact info
Gerissa S Conforti
The Dixon Firm, Apc
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Charles Monat Associates, LLC
Terminated: 12/12/2023
Represented By
Kevin J O'Connor
Clyde And Co LLP
contact info
Eliot L Cartwright
Clyde And Co Us LLP
contact info
Eliot L. Cartwright
Clyde And Co Us LLP
contact info
Mingmei Zhu
Clyde And Co Us LLP
contact info
Ralph A Guirgis
Clyde And Co Us LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
48 48 2 pgs order Order Wed 10/09 4:20 PM
ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation for Order of Dismissal of All Claims47 . (twdb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
47 47 stip Dismiss Case Tue 10/08 4:15 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by defendant Pacific Life Insurance Company.(Lilly, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, July 12, 2024
46 46 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Fri 07/12 8:26 AM
ORDER by District Judge David O. Carter: The Court, having been notified by the plaintiff that this action has been settled re Notice of Settlement45 , hereby orders this action DISMISSED without prejudice. The Court hereby orders all proceedings in the case VACATED and taken off calendar. The Court retains jurisdiction for 45 days to vacate this order and reopen the action upon showing of good cause that the settlement has not been consummated. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kdu)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
45 45 notice Settlement Thu 07/11 3:14 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiffs Cherylyn C. Uy, Dennis A. Uy. (Conforti, Gerissa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
44 44 notice Notice (Other) Wed 06/26 2:19 PM
Notice of Mediation filed by Plaintiffs Cherylyn C. Uy, Dennis A. Uy. Joint Notice of Mediation (Conforti, Gerissa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
43 43 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 06/18 2:39 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER RE: PRETRIAL AND TRIAL PROCEDURES by Judge David O. Carter. ( Fact Discovery cut-off 9/16/2024., Motions due by 11/18/2024., Trial set for 1/28/2025 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter., Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/13/2025 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter.) SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
42 42 minutes Status Conference - optional html form ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Tue 06/18 2:35 PM
MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge David O. Carter: The trial set for January 28, 2025, at 8:30 a.m. remains as previously set. The Courts scheduling order to issue. Trial set for 1/28/2025 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. Court Reporter: C/S - 6/17/24. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
41 41 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Mon 06/10 12:01 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter: The Court is in receipt of the parties' Joint Stipulation for Continuance40 and hereby CONTINUES the Status Conference set for 6/17/2024 to 05:00 PM before Judge David O. Carter. **TIME CHANGE ONLY**.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kdu)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
40 40 stip Continue Thu 06/06 4:29 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Status Conference from June 17, 2024 to June 24, 2024 or July 8, 2024 filed by Plaintiffs Cherylyn C. Uy, Dennis A. Uy.(Conforti, Gerissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
39 39 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Tue 06/04 1:02 PM
ORDER by District Judge David O. Carter re REQUEST for Remote Appearance37 : The Status Conference set for June 10, 2024 is CONTINUED to June 17, 2024 at 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. All parties are ordered to appear in-person. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kdu)
Related: [-]
38 38 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Tue 06/04 9:34 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Declaration37 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Request (for order). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
37 37 misc Declaration Mon 06/03 8:15 PM
DECLARATION of Matthew Lilly re Text Only Scheduling Notice 36 Request to attend status conference remotely filed by Defendant Pacific Life Insurance Company. (Lilly, Matthew)
Related: [-]
36 36 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Mon 06/03 12:05 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter Status Conference is set for 6/10/2024 08:30 AM in-person before Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kdu)
Related: [-]
35 35 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 06/03 9:00 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kdu)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
34 34 cs_rasgn Chief District Judge Transferring Case Fri 05/31 4:54 PM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#24-071) approved by Judge Dolly M. Gee. IT IS ORDERED, with the concurrence of the Case Management and Assignment Committee. This case is transferred from Judge Cormac J. Carney to the calendar of Judge David O. Carter for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:23-cv-01854-DOC (ADSx). (et)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
33 33 order Protective Order Wed 05/29 10:33 AM
AMENDED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth granting Amended Stipulation for Protective Order32 . (kh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
32 32 stip Protective Order Tue 05/28 1:27 PM
Amended STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiffs Cherylyn C. Uy, Dennis A. Uy.(Conforti, Gerissa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
31 31 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Wed 02/07 4:41 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance,30 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
30 30 notice Appearance Tue 02/06 10:44 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Bridget E. Hulburt on behalf of Plaintiffs Cherylyn C. Uy, Dennis A. Uy (Attorney Bridget E. Hulburt added to party Cherylyn C. Uy(pty:pla), Attorney Bridget E. Hulburt added to party Dennis A. Uy(pty:pla))(Hulburt, Bridget)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
29 29 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - form only -no proceeding held Fri 01/12 9:31 AM
ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT PROCEDURES, PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL by Judge Cormac J. Carney. (rrp)
Related: [-]
28 28 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Fri 01/12 9:30 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Discovery cut-off 9/19/2024. LAST DATE TO HEAR MOTIONS is 11/18/2024. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 10/3/2024. Pretrial Conference set for 1/13/2025 at 3:00 p.m. Jury Trial set for 1/28/2025 at 8:30 a.m. (rrp)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
27 27 attyseal Sealed Document Mon 01/08 4:14 PM
SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibits C and D to the Declaration of Stephanie Adams in Support of Defendant Charles Monat Associates, LLC's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint [Dkt. 7] - Filed Under Seal Pursuant to Order of the Court Dated January 5, 2024 re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss defendant Charles Monat Associates, LLC 7 , Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,23 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal25 filed by Defendant Charles Monat Associates, LLC.(Cartwright, Eliot)
Related: [-]
26 26 order Protective Order Mon 01/08 2:40 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth re Stipulation for Protective Order24 . (kh)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
25 25 order Leave to File Document Under Seal Fri 01/05 3:35 PM
ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting22 Joint APPLICATION for Leave to File Under Seal. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
Related: [-]
24 24 stip Protective Order Fri 01/05 3:35 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiffs Cherylyn C. Uy, Dennis A. Uy.(Conforti, Gerissa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
23 23 attyseal Sealed Declaration in Support Thu 01/04 6:47 PM
SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF Joint APPLICATION to file document Exhibits C and D to the Declaration of Stephanie Adams in Support of Defendant Charles Monat Associates, LLC's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint [Dkt. 7] und22 filed by Defendant Charles Monat Associates, LLC.(Cartwright, Eliot)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted Document Exhibit A to Declaration of Eliot L. Cartwright
22 22 motion Leave to File Document Under Seal Thu 01/04 6:42 PM
Joint APPLICATION to file document Exhibits C and D to the Declaration of Stephanie Adams in Support of Defendant Charles Monat Associates, LLC's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint [Dkt. 7] under seal filed by Defendant Charles Monat Associates, LLC.(Cartwright, Eliot)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order re Joint Application for Leave to File Under Seal,
Att: 2 Redacted Document Exhibit B to Declaration of Eliot L. Cartwright
Thursday, December 28, 2023
21 21 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Thu 12/28 1:41 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 8 days, filed by Plaintiffs Cherylyn C. Uy, Dennis A. Uy.. (Conforti, Gerissa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
20 20 order Dismiss Party Tue 12/12 4:36 PM
ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting7 Charles Monat Associates, LLC's MOTION to Dismiss [Dkt. 7]. Terminating Charles Monat Associates, LLC (a Massachusetts limited liability). SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
19 19 respm Reply (Motion related) Mon 12/04 6:41 PM
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss defendant Charles Monat Associates, LLC 7 filed by Defendant Charles Monat Associates, LLC. (Cartwright, Eliot)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
18 18 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Tue 11/28 1:06 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number incomplete; missing initials of Judge. Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
17 17 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 11/27 6:11 PM
OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss defendant Charles Monat Associates, LLC 7 filed by Plaintiffs Cherylyn C. Uy, Dennis A. Uy.(Conforti, Gerissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Gerissa S. Conforti,
Att: 2 Declaration of Plaintiff Dennis A. Uy,
Att: 3 Declaration of Plaintiff Cherylyn C. Uy,
Att: 4 Request for Judicial Notice
16 16 notice Appearance Mon 11/27 1:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Matthew E Lilly on behalf of Defendant Pacific Life Insurance Company (Attorney Matthew E Lilly added to party Pacific Life Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Lilly, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
15 15 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 11/22 3:50 PM
ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Cormac J. Carney: GRANTING12 Non-Resident Attorney Kevin J O'Connor APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Charles Monat Associates, LLC, designating Eliot L Cartwright as local counsel. (jp)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
14 14 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines Tue 11/21 11:00 AM
ORDER GRANTING Joint Stipulation for Continuance of Defendant Charles Monat Associates, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint13 by Judge Cormac J. Carney that Plaintiffs' opposition to CMA's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint is now due Monday, 11/27/2023. Defendant CMA's reply in support of the Motion is now due Monday, 12/4/2023. Finally, the hearing on the Motion is hereby continued to Monday, 12/18/2023, at 1:30 PM. (jp)
Related: [-]
13 13 respm Motion Related Document Mon 11/20 2:15 PM
JOINT STIPULATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF DEFENDANT CHARLES MONAT ASSOCIATES, LLCS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss defendant Charles Monat Associates, LLC 7 filed by Defendant Charles Monat Associates, LLC.(Cartwright, Eliot)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation for Continuance of Defendant Charles Monat Associates, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint
Friday, November 17, 2023
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Fri 11/17 3:05 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kevin J. O'Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Charles Monat Associates, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-36429816) filed by defendant Charles Monat Associates, LLC.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (Proposed} Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Cartwright, Eliot
Friday, November 03, 2023
11 11 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 11/03 12:55 PM
NOTICE OF INTENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on January 11, 2024. (rrp)
Related: [-]
10 10 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Fri 11/03 12:51 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Cormac J. Carney. On the Court's own motion, the MOTION to Dismiss defendant Charles Monat Associates, LLC7 previously scheduled for 12/5/2023 at 10:00 AM is CONTINUED to 12/11/2023 at 1:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
9 9 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 11/02 5:58 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Thu 11/02 4:15 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick to Judge Cormac J. Carney for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 8:23-cv-01854-CJC (ADSx). (et)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
7 7 motion Dismiss Party Wed 11/01 4:00 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss defendant Charles Monat Associates, LLC filed by defendant Charles Monat Associates, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 12/5/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (Guirgis, Ralph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Stephanie Adams in Support of Defendant Charles Monat Associates, LLC's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibits A-G to Declaration of Stephanie Adams in Support of Defendant Charles Monat Associates, LLC's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint,
Att: 3 Declaration Declaration of Eliot L. Cartwright in Support of Defendant Charles Monat Associates, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint,
Att: 4 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendant Charles Monat Associates, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint
Friday, October 06, 2023
6 6 order Extending Answer Due Deadline Fri 10/06 5:53 PM
ORDER RE STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT CHARLES MONAT ASSOCIATES, LLC TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT BY NOT MORE THAN 30 DAYS4 by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: CMA shall file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint on or before November 1, 2023. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form Fri 10/06 8:52 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CV-11C Statement of Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
4 4 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Tue 10/03 8:13 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to filed by defendant Charles Monat Associates, LLC, a Massachusetts limited liability.(Attorney Eliot L Cartwright added to party Charles Monat Associates, LLC, a Massachusetts limited liability(pty:dft))(Cartwright, Eliot)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order RE STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT CHARLES MONAT ASSOCIATES, LLC TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT BY NOT MORE THAN 30 DAYS
Monday, October 02, 2023
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 10/02 2:58 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Charles Monat Associates, LLC, a Massachusetts limited liability, identifying Charles Monat Limited; and Monat Global Wealth Pte., Ltd.. (Guirgis, Ralph)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 10/02 2:51 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Charles Monat Associates, LLC, a Massachusetts limited liability. (Guirgis, Ralph)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 10/02 2:39 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2022 01270531 Receipt No: ACACDC-36145734 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Charles Monat Associates, LLC Charles Monat Associates, LLC, a Massachusetts limited liability. (Attorney Ralph A Guirgis added to party Charles Monat Associates, LLC, a Massachusetts limited liability(pty:dft))(Guirgis, Ralph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Complaint filed 2022.07.18,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed 2023.06.30,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed 8-22-23,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - POS OF Summons Complaint as to Charles Monat Associates,
Att: 5 Declaration Declaration of Eliot Cartwright in Support of Defendant Charles Monat Associates, LLC's Notice of Removal to United States District Court
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Fri 10/06 8:56 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 25, inclusive, Pacific Life Insurance Company. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiffs Dennis A. Uy, Cherylyn C. Uy. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 7/18/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
Related: [-]
othcmp Amended Complaint Fri 10/06 9:01 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 25, inclusive, Pacific Life Insurance Company amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by plaintiffs Dennis A. Uy, Cherylyn C. Uy (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/30/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B)(ghap)
Related: [-]
othcmp Amended Complaint Fri 10/06 9:03 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Charles Monat Associates, LLC, Does 1 through 25, inclusive, Pacific Life Insurance Company amending Amended Complaint,, filed by plaintiffs Dennis A. Uy, Cherylyn C. Uy. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/22/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT C)(ghap)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 10/06 9:08 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Dennis A. Uy, Cherylyn C. Uy, upon Defendant Charles Monat Associates, LLC served on 8/31/2023, answer due 9/21/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Stephanie Adams, Registered Agent, 191 Union Street, Holden, MA 01520 in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 9/6/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT D) (ghap)
Related: [-]