North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:Louise Wood Flanagan
Case #: 5:23-cv-00540
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2023
Terminated:Nov 08, 2023
Case in other court:North Carolina Western, 3:23-cv-00014
Last checked: Monday Mar 25, 2024 4:42 AM EDT
Defendant
SYNEOS HEALTH, LLC
Represented By
Charlotte Claire Smith
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Robert A. Sar
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Anthony Sullivan
Represented By
K.E. Krispen Culbertson
Culbertson And Associates
contact info
Ke Krispen Culbertson
Culbertson & Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
order Text Order Wed 11/08 3:38 PM
TEXT ORDER: This matter comes before the court on plaintiffs' unopposed motion to consolidate this case with case No. 5:23-cv-540, which presents similar questions of law and fact. For good cause shown and pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42, the motion is granted and the court hereby CONSOLIDATES in all respects the above-captioned matters into one case, designating the case No. 5:23-cv-539 as the repository for filings in the consolidate case. The terms set forth in the July 17, 2023, case management order in case No. 5:23-CV-539-FL and extensions of time granted thereafter shall govern the consolidated case for all purposes. The clerk is DIRECTED to re-file in case no. 5:23-cv-539 all the filings made previously in case No. 5:23-cv-540, and then to CLOSE administratively the case file in case No. 5:23-cv-540. Thereafter, the parties shall make all filings only in this consolidated case No. 5:23-cv-540. Plaintiffs in the consolidated action are DIRECTED to file an operative amended complaint, reflecting those claims remaining, no later than November 22, 2023. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 11/8/2023. (Collins, S)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
28 28 notice Notice of Special Appearance Tue 10/31 9:51 AM
Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Ke Krispen Culbertson on behalf of Anthony Sullivan. (Krispen Culbertson, Ke)
Related: [-]
27 27 notice Notice of Special Appearance Tue 10/31 9:50 AM
Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Ke Krispen Culbertson on behalf of Anthony Sullivan. (Krispen Culbertson, Ke)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
26 26 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/27 11:10 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Ke Krispen Culbertson on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Krispen Culbertson, Ke)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
25 25 misc Mail Returned Mon 10/23 4:35 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to K.E. Krispen Culbertson (Collins, S)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
utility Case Selected for Mediation Thu 10/19 5:22 PM
Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Collins, S)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
24 24 misc Mail Returned Fri 10/13 10:19 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to K.E. Krispen Culbertson. - Mail sent back out to K. E. Krispen Culbertson at 315 Spring Garden St. Suite 300, Greensboro, NC 27401 (Collins, S)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
23 23 notice Notice-other Mon 10/02 10:45 AM
Notice to Parties regarding Transfer of Case to the Eastern District of North Carolina. Counsel should read the notice in its entirety for additional information. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
22 22 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Mon 10/02 10:38 AM
Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Western. Case Number 3:23-cv-00014. Transfer order and docket sheet obtained from transferring district.
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
21 21 ORDER directing that this case be transferred to the Eastern District of North Carolina pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a). Signed by District Judge Kenneth D. Bell on 9/27/2023. (mek) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/2/2023.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
20 20 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Anthony Sullivan. (Culbertson, K.E.) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/2/2023.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
19 19 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Court orders Plaintiffs to show cause as to why these cases should not be transferred to the Eastern District of North Carolina. Signed by District Judge Kenneth D. Bell on 9/21/2023. (brl) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/2/2023.]
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
18 18 Joint CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Smith, Charlotte) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/2/2023.]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
17 17 NOTICE of Filing of Motion for Consolidation of Cases re: Case Nos. 3:23-cv-00014 5:22-cv-00163 (Culbertson, K.E.) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/2/2023.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
16 16 NOTICE of Certificate of Settlement Conference Pursuant to Standing Order 5:19-mc-5. Result: Unable to resolve.(Smith, Charlotte) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/2/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Settlement Conference
Monday, August 28, 2023
15 15 ANSWER to1 Complaint by Syneos Health, LLC.(Smith, Charlotte) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/2/2023.]
Related: [-]
NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The[LINK:Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference] , and if applicable, the[LINK:Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge] , should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 9/18/2023. (mek) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/2/2023.]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2023
14 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Plaintiff's Claim for Fraud by Anthony Sullivan (Culbertson, K.E.) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/2/2023.]
Related: [-]
TEXT-ONLY ORDER finding as moot 5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff has voluntarily dismissed both claims that are the subject of the Motion to Dismiss. See 9 and 14 . Accordingly, the Motion to Dismiss is administratively denied as moot without prejudice. So Ordered. Entered by US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez on 8/14/2023. (DLG) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/2/2023.]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2023
13 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Syneos Health, LLC. (Smith, Charlotte) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/2/2023.]
Related: [-]
12 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Partial Motion to Dismiss) by Syneos Health, LLC. (Smith, Charlotte) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/2/2023.]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 10, 2023
11 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Partial Motion to Dismiss) by Anthony Sullivan. Replies due by 7/17/2023 (Culbertson, K.E.) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/2/2023.]
Related: [-]
Friday, June 16, 2023
10 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss by Anthony Sullivan. Responses due by 6/30/2023 (Culbertson, K.E.). Motions referred to Susan C. Rodriguez. [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/2/2023.]
Related: [-]
9 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Plaintiff's Claim for Unfair & Deceptive Practices Under Chapter 75 of the North Carolina Code by Anthony Sullivan (Culbertson, K.E.) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/2/2023.]
Related: [-]
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting unopposed 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response re 5 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 7/10/2023. So Ordered. Entered by US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez on 6/16/2023. (DLG) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/2/2023.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 06, 2023
8 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A Sar on behalf of Syneos Health, LLC (Sar, Robert) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/2/2023.]
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2023
7 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Charlotte Claire Smith on behalf of Syneos Health, LLC (Smith, Charlotte) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/2/2023.]
Related: [-]
6 6 11 pgs MEMORANDUM in Support re5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Partial Motion to Dismiss) by Syneos Health, LLC. (Smith, Charlotte) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/2/2023.]
Related: [-]
5 5 Partial MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Syneos Health, LLC. Responses due by 6/20/2023 (Smith, Charlotte). Motions referred to Susan C. Rodriguez. [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/2/2023.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 12, 2023
4 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Anthony Sullivan. Syneos Health, LLC waiver sent on 4/10/2023, answer due 6/9/2023. (Culbertson, K.E.) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/2/2023.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 06, 2023
3 3 MOTION for Extension of Time for Service of Process by Anthony Sullivan. (Culbertson, K.E.). Motions referred to Susan C. Rodriguez. [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/2/2023.]
Related: [-]
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 3 MOTION for Extension of Time for Service of Process. Deadline for service of process extended to 5/9/2023. So Ordered. Entered by US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez on 4/6/2023. (DLG) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/2/2023.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 04, 2023
Case Referral reassigned to Judge Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez. Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer no longer assigned to the case. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (ejb) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/2/2023.]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2023
2 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Syneos Health, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (tlj) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/2/2023.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 10, 2023
Case assigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the[LINK:Case Assignment Packet] . This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (tlj) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/2/2023.]
Related: [-]
Clerk's Entry and Service of[LINK:Standing Order Requiring an Initial Settlement Conference in Civil Cases] assigned to the Honorable Kenneth D. Bell (5:19-mc-5 (Doc. No. 1)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. The filing party is directed to serve a copy of the Order with service. (tlj) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/2/2023.]
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2023
1 1 COMPLAINT against Syneos Health, LLC with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5894875), filed by Anthony Sullivan.(Culbertson, K.E.) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/2/2023.]
Related: [-]