Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Michael H Watson
Referred: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Case #: 2:23-cv-03224
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1981 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Oct 02, 2023
Terminated:Dec 02, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Mar 30, 2024 5:38 AM EDT
Defendant
FedEx Supply Chain Logistics
Represented By
Daniel T. French
Federal Express Corporation
contact info
Phillip Theodore Glyptis
Burns White LLC
contact info
Gabriel Paul McGaha
Federal Express Corporation
contact info
Plaintiff
Jerrid Hall
5281 Sweet William Ct.
Columbus, OH 43230


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, December 02, 2024
33 33 3 pgs order Order Mon 12/02 9:29 AM
Agreed Stipulation and Order of Final Dismissal. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 12/2/2024. (jk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Mon 12/02 9:30 AM
***Civil Case Terminated. (jk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
32 32 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 11/26 2:27 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Defendant FedEx Supply Chain Logistics. (McGaha, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
31 31 order Status Report Order Fri 11/08 10:20 AM
ORDER: Case reported settled. Status Report due by 12/9/2024, unless dismissal filed prior. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 11/8/2024. (sln)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
30 30 notice Notice of Settlement Thu 11/07 4:14 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Defendant FedEx Supply Chain Logistics (McGaha, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
28 28 med Notice Setting Mediation Thu 08/08 9:11 PM
Notice of Mediation Conference: Mediator Jack R. Pigman to conduct mediation in Porter Wright, 41 South High St, Columbus Ohio43215. Mediation Hearing set for 9/13/2024 at 10:00 AM. (Pigman, Jack)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
27 27 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Wed 08/07 1:52 PM
ORDER granting26 Motion to Amend Certain Deadlines. Discovery due by 9/16/2024. Dispositive motions due by 11/8/2024. Mediation Deadline: 9/30/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on August 7, 2024. (jlk)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
26 26 motion Amend/Correct Tue 08/06 4:30 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Amend/Extend Certain Deadlines for the Limited Purpose of Deposing Plaintiff by Defendant FedEx Supply Chain Logistics. (McGaha, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order
Friday, August 02, 2024
med Notice Designating Mediator Fri 08/02 9:49 AM
NOTICE DESIGNATING MEDIATOR: Jack R Pigman assigned as mediator to this case. Within 14 days, the mediator and parties will confer to set a date, time, and location for mediation in September 2024, or within 60 days of this notice . The mediator will then file a Notice Setting Mediation. (kk2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
25 25 1 pgs order Order Tue 07/30 4:21 PM
ORDER STRIKING24 Notice (Admissions) filed by Jerrid Hall. The Court directs Plaintiff to cease filing such documents until they are used in a proceedingor the Court orders otherwise. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on July 30, 2024. (jlk)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
24 24 notice Notice (Other) Mon 07/29 9:42 AM
NOTICE of Plaintiff's Answers to First Set of Admissions from Defendant by Plaintiff Jerrid Hall. (mas)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
23 23 notice Notice Determining Readiness of Mediation (Columbus) Mon 07/22 9:51 AM
NOTICE: Counsel shall confer and notify the Court at[LINK:ADR@ohsd.uscourts.gov] within 10 days if this case should NOT proceed with mediation in September 2024 . If the case should not proceed, counsel shall indicate whether the case should be continued to another month and, if so, which one. Deadline for notifying the court is 4:00pm EST on 8/1/2024 . (kk2)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
22 22 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 04/26 10:03 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting21 Motion for Extension of Time To Extend Expert Disclosure Deadline. Defendant Rebuttal Expert due by 5/10/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 4/26/2024. (EPD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
21 21 motion Extension of Time Thu 04/25 2:06 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 5/10/2024. by Defendant FedEx Supply Chain Logistics. (McGaha, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order
Thursday, December 21, 2023
20 20 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 12/21 3:10 PM
Amended ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by FedEx Supply Chain Logistics. (McGaha, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
19 19 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 12/05 4:07 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant FedEx Supply Chain Logistics. (McGaha, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
18 18 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 11/30 9:03 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by FedEx Supply Chain Logistics. (McGaha, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
17 17 order Columbus Preliminary Pretrial Order Mon 11/27 2:53 PM
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: Initial Disclosures due by 12/14/2023. Joinder of Parties/Motions to Amend due by 12/21/2023. Discovery due by 8/9/2024. (If the parties are unable to reach an agreement on any matter related to discovery, they are directed to arrange a conference with the Court). Clawback Agreement Deadline due by 12/29/2023. Dispositive motions due by 9/20/2024. Primary Expert due by 3/22/2024. Rebuttal Expert due by 4/26/2024. Settlement Demand due by 8/16/2024. Response to Settlement Demand due by 8/23/2024. Mediation Deadline: 9/6/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 11/27/2023. (vb) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification)
Related: [-]
notice Notice Terminating Deadlines/Hearings Mon 11/27 8:16 AM
NOTICE : The Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/30/2023 is VACATED. (See ECF NO.16 .) (sln)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
16 16 misc Rule 26(f) Report Wed 11/22 11:35 PM
RULE 26(f) REPORT Parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Defendant FedEx Supply Chain Logistics. (McGaha, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
15 15 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 11/06 4:45 PM
NOTATION ORDER granting13 and14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Gabriel P. McGaha and Daniel T. French as co-counsel. PHV counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 11/6/2023. (mas)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Appear - Pro Hac Vice Mon 11/06 3:47 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9677971) of Daniel T. French by Defendant FedEx Supply Chain Logistics. (Glyptis, Phillip)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Appear - Pro Hac Vice Mon 11/06 3:42 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9677695) of Gabriel P. McGaha by Defendant FedEx Supply Chain Logistics. (Glyptis, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 11/01 3:16 PM
ORDER granting8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. FedEx Supply Chain Logistics answer due 11/30/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on November 1, 2023. (jlk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
11 11 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 10/30 11:32 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Plaintiff Jerrid Hall. (mas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
10 10 1 pgs order Order Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 10/25 4:39 PM
ORDER - The default briefing rules shall not apply to8 Motion for Extension. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file any response explaining his opposition to Defendants motion NO LATER THAN OCTOBER 30, 2023. No reply shall be filed unless ordered by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on October 25, 2023. (jlk)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 10/25 11:53 AM
NOTICE of Hearing:Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/30/2023 10:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 10/24 2:31 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 11/30/2023. by Defendant FedEx Supply Chain Logistics. (Glyptis, Phillip) Modified event on 10/24/2023 (mas)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/24 2:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip Theodore Glyptis for Defendant FedEx Supply Chain Logistics (Glyptis, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 10/17 1:44 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant FedEx Supply Chain Logistics. FedEx Supply Chain Logistics served on 10/10/2023, answer due 10/31/2023. (mas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
5 5 misc Certificate of Clerk Wed 10/04 3:43 PM
CERTIFICATE of Mailing by Clerk - A copy of the Complaint and issued Summons were sent to the Defendant via certified mail (7022 2410 0000 8279 3324). (mas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
4 4 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 10/03 4:44 PM
ORDER granting3 Motion to Obtain Electronic Case Filing Rights to the extent that he may participate in e-filing only as to this particular case and conditional on his compliance with all applicable e-filing requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 10/3/2023. (mas)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
3 3 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 10/02 2:53 PM
MOTION by Pro Se Litigant to Receive Service By Email Through the Electronic Case Filing System by Plaintiff Jerrid Hall. (mas)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 10/02 2:48 PM
Summons Issued as to FedEx Supply Chain Logistics. (mas)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 10/02 2:46 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against FedEx Supply Chain Logistics, filed by Jerrid Hall. (mas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Filing Fee Received Mon 10/02 2:47 PM
Civil Filing fee received: $402, receipt number 200004326. (mas)
Related: [-]