California Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:J Barrett Marum
Case #: 3:23-bk-03020
Case Filed:Oct 01, 2023
Creditor Meeting:Nov 08, 2023

Debtor
Ultimate Water, Inc.
1263 Greenfield Dr Ste A
El Cajon, CA 92021-3349
Represented By
Vincent Renda
Pinnacle Legal P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Christopher R. Barclay
P.O. Box 2819
La Mesa, CA 91943
United States Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee 880 Front Street Suite 3230
San Diego, CA 92101


Docket last updated: 10/18/2023 12:10 PM PDT
Sunday, October 01, 2023
crditcrd Auto-docket of credit card Sun 10/01 4:22 PM
Receipt of Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition([LINK 23-03020 7] ) [misc,1027] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Fee Amount 338.00 Receipt number A17833545 Related [+]; (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 45 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (fee) external Sun 10/01 4:07 PM
Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Schedules & Statements Fee Amount $ 338.00. Declaration re: Electronic Filing due by 10/16/2023, Filed by Vincent Renda of Pinnacle Legal P.C. on behalf of Ultimate Water, Inc.. Related [+]
Related: [-] nda, Vincent
2 2 misc Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (CSD 1801) Sun 10/01 4:23 PM
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing filed by Vincent Renda on behalf of Ultimate Water, Inc.. Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Chapter 7 Voluntary Petitionnda, Vincent
3 3 CASBApi CASB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (BUS) Sun 10/01 4:24 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of InterimTrustee Barclay, Christopher R. 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/8/2023 at 08:00 AM at via Zoom - Barclay Meeting ID 899 506 3782, and Passcode 3301391688, Phone (619) 367-5256. Related [+]
Related: [-] nda, Vincent