District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Case #: 1:23-cv-02937
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause05:552 Right to Privacy Act
Case Filed:Oct 03, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Mar 31, 2024 4:44 AM EDT
Defendant
WILLIAM J. BURNS
Represented By
R. Charlie Merritt
Doj-Civ
contact info
Juliana MacPherson Barrett
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Michael Joseph Gerardi
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Represented By
R. Charlie Merritt
Doj-Civ
contact info
Michael Joseph Gerardi
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
JOHN DOE
Defendant
RICHARD ROE
Defendant
DOUG VAN ZANDT
Represented By
R. Charlie Merritt
Doj-Civ
contact info
Juliana MacPherson Barrett
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Michael Joseph Gerardi
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
JANE DOE
Represented By
Hannah Alice Bogen
Hughes Hubbard & Reed LLP
contact info
Kevin T. Carroll
Hughes Hubbard & Reed LLP
contact info
Andrew R. Kopsidas
Hughes Hubbard & Reed
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, June 20, 2024
33 33 order .Order Thu 06/20 5:55 PM
ORDER dismissing case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 6/20/24. (lcckk3)
Related: [-]
32 32 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 06/20 2:20 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by WILLIAM J. BURNS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Gerardi, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 06/03 3:43 PM
MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of the31 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint, in which Defendants request additional time, as "the parties have continued their productive discussions regarding a settlement of Plaintiff's claims against the Defendants, and have made additional progress toward an agreed-upon resolution of this case." Additionally, Plaintiff has been travelling. This is Defendants' sixth request for an extension of time, and Plaintiff consents to the requested relief. The Court GRANTS the31 Motion and ORDERS Defendants to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by JUNE 20, 2024. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 6/3/24. (lcckk3)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 06/12 5:00 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 6/20/2024. (dot)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
31 31 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 05/31 5:15 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by WILLIAM J. BURNS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DOUG VAN ZANDT.(Gerardi, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 05/21 5:05 PM
MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of Defendants'30 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, in which Defendants indicate that "the parties have continued their productive discussions regarding a settlement of Plaintiff's claims against the Defendants, and have made additional progress towards an agreed-upon resolution of this case." This is Defendants' fifth request for an extension of this deadline, and Plaintiff consents. The Court GRANTS the30 Motion and ORDERS Defendants to respond to the1 Complaint by JUNE 5, 2024. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/21/24. (lcckk3)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 05/22 10:00 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 6/5/2024. (dot)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
30 30 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 05/20 5:01 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by WILLIAM J. BURNS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DOUG VAN ZANDT.(Gerardi, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 05/07 5:26 PM
MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of Defendants'29 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, in which Defendants indicate that " the parties have continued their productive discussions regarding a settlement of Plaintiff's claims against the Defendants, and have made substantial progress towards an agreed-upon resolution." This is Defendants' fourth request for an extension of this deadline, and Plaintiff consents. The Court GRANTS the29 Motion and ORDERS Defendants to respond to the1 Complaint by MAY 23, 2024. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/7/24. (lcckk3)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 05/08 10:18 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 5/23/2024. (dot)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
29 29 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 05/06 10:25 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by WILLIAM J. BURNS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DOUG VAN ZANDT.(Gerardi, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, April 05, 2024
28 28 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 04/05 1:19 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by WILLIAM J. BURNS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DOUG VAN ZANDT.(Gerardi, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 04/05 5:22 PM
MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of Defendants'28 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, in which Defendants indicate that "the parties have continued their productive discussions regarding a settlement of Plaintiff's claims against the Defendants," but that Defendants' counsel experienced a family emergency, which required significant time away from work. This is Defendants' third request for an extension of this deadline, and Plaintiff consents. The Court GRANTS the28 Motion and ORDERS Defendants to respond to the1 Complaint by MAY 9, 2024. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/5/24. (lcckk3)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 04/09 3:04 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 5/9/2024. (dot)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 02/06 3:55 PM
MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of Defendants'27 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, in which Defendants indicate that "the parties have been engaged in productive discussions regarding a settlement of Plaintiff's claims against the Defendants" and that Defendants' counsel needs time to familiarize himself with the case, as he was on detail to another office at the U.S. Department of Justice. This is Defendants' second request for an extension of this deadline, and Plaintiff consents. The Court GRANTS the27 Motion and ORDERS Defendants to respond to the1 Complaint by APRIL 9, 2024. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/6/24. (lcckk3)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 02/12 12:35 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to Complaint1 due by 4/9/2024. (dot)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
27 27 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 02/05 3:16 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by WILLIAM J. BURNS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DOUG VAN ZANDT.(Gerardi, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
26 26 notice Notice of Substitution of Counsel Mon 02/05 3:13 PM
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Michael Joseph Gerardi on behalf of WILLIAM J. BURNS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DOUG VAN ZANDT Substituting for attorney R. Charlie Merritt (Gerardi, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
25 25 misc Declaration Wed 01/10 2:03 PM
DECLARATION OF HANNAH A. BOGEN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF HANNAH A. BOGEN by JANE DOE. (Bogen, Hannah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
24 24 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 01/04 3:46 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- HANNAH A. BOGEN, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number BDCDC-10597078. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JANE DOE.(Carroll, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 01/04 5:10 PM
MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of the24 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Attorney Hannah A. Bogen, to appear as counsel for Plaintiff. The Court GRANTS the24 Motion CONTINGENT on said attorney filing a declaration certifying familiarity with this Court's Local Rules by no later than JANUARY 12, 2024. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). [LINK:Click for instructions] . Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 1/4/24. (lcckk3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 12/21 10:33 AM
MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of Defendants'23 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to1 Complaint, in which Defendants ask for additional time due to the length of Plaintiff's complaint and extensive factual allegations and legal claims. This is Defendants' first request for an extension and Plaintiff does not oppose the requested relief. The Court GRANTS the23 Motion and ORDERS Defendants to respond to the Complaint by FEBRUARY 9, 2024. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 12/21/23. (lcckk3)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 12/22 12:55 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 2/9/2024. (dot)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
23 23 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 12/20 11:11 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by WILLIAM J. BURNS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DOUG VAN ZANDT.(Merritt, R.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/19 11:48 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Juliana MacPherson Barrett on behalf of WILLIAM J. BURNS, DOUG VAN ZANDT (Barrett, Juliana)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
21 21 service Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Tue 12/12 4:37 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JOHN DOE served on 11/17/2023; RICHARD ROE served on 11/17/2023 (Carroll, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
20 20 service Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Fri 12/01 10:54 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY served on 11/17/2023 (Carroll, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
19 19 service Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney Thu 11/30 12:32 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/16/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/15/2024. (Carroll, Kevin)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General Thu 11/30 12:29 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/20/2023. (Carroll, Kevin)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Thu 11/30 12:25 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY served on 11/29/2023 (Carroll, Kevin)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Waiver of Service Thu 11/30 12:17 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE. DOUG VAN ZANDT waiver sent on 10/17/2023, answer due 12/16/2023. (Carroll, Kevin)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Waiver of Service Thu 11/30 12:15 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE. WILLIAM J. BURNS waiver sent on 10/17/2023, answer due 12/16/2023. (Carroll, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/28 4:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by R. Charlie Merritt on behalf of WILLIAM J. BURNS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DOUG VAN ZANDT (Merritt, R.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
13 13 misc Sealed Document Thu 10/19 2:17 PM
SEALED DOCUMENT filed by JANE DOE(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Kopsidas, Andrew)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 10/19 2:09 PM
MOTION TO PROCEED PSEUDONYMOUSLY by JANE DOE.(Kopsidas, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/19 1:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew R. Kopsidas on behalf of JANE DOE (Kopsidas, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
notice Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status Wed 10/18 10:20 AM
NOTICE of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status re10 NOTICE for Issuance of Summons to Defendants John Doe and Richard Roe by JANE DOE (Carroll, Kevin). Your attorney renewal/government certification has not been received. As a result, your membership with the U.S. District & Bankruptcy Courts for the District of Columbia is not in good standing, and you are not permitted to file. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.9, you must immediately correct your membership status by following the appropriate instructions on this page of our website: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-renewal. Please be advised that the presiding judge in this case has been notified that you are currently not in good standing to file in this court. Renewal Due by 10/25/2023. (zmrl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Tue 10/17 4:19 PM
NOTICE for Issuance of Summons to Defendants John Doe and Richard Roe by JANE DOE (Carroll, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
9 9 order .Order Fri 10/06 4:43 PM
ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/6/23. (DM)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Fri 10/06 11:45 AM
SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to WILLIAM J. BURNS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, RICHARD ROE, DOUG VAN ZANDT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(zljn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 10/06 11:18 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zljn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
7 7 8 pgs order Order on Sealed Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym Thu 10/05 6:09 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: (1) Plaintiff's2 Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym is GRANTED, subject to any further consideration by the United States District Judge to whom this case is randomly assigned; (2) All parties shall use the pseudonym listed in the Complaint in all documents filed in this action; and (3) Within fourteen days of this Order, Plaintiff shall file on the public docket: (i) a pseudonymous version of her2 Motion and any attachments; and (ii) a sealed declaration containing her real name and residential address. Signed by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/5/2023. (lcjeb4)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
6 6 misc Errata Tue 10/03 7:13 PM
ERRATA by JANE DOE. (Carroll, Kevin)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 10/03 6:10 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Eda Stark, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10396694. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JANE DOE.(Carroll, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Admission and Good Standing
4 4 cmp Request for Summons to Issue Tue 10/03 5:55 PM
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE Attorney General of the United States filed by JANE DOE. Related document: Notice of QC- New Case,,,1 Complaint, filed by JANE DOE.(Carroll, Kevin)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Request for Summons to Issue Tue 10/03 5:53 PM
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia filed by JANE DOE. Related document: Notice of QC- New Case,,,1 Complaint, filed by JANE DOE.(Carroll, Kevin)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Sealed Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym Tue 10/03 5:39 PM
SEALED MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym filed by JANE DOE(Carroll, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
1 1 28 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 10/03 11:44 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BDCDC-10394628) filed by JANE DOE.(Carroll, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons William J. Burns,
Att: 3 Summons Doug Van Zandt,
Att: 4 Summons John Doe,
Att: 5 Summons Richard Roe,
Att: 6 Summons Central Intelligence Agency
notice Notice of QC- New Case Tue 10/03 2:58 PM
NOTICE OF ERROR re1 Complaint; emailed to kevin.carroll@hugheshubbard.com, cc'd 3 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. Pseudonym Request e-filed without leave of court. Please submit motion using the event Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym. In the future, do not file these kinds of cases electronically., 3. Missing summonses-government. When naming a government agent or agency as a defendant, you must supply a summons for each defendant & two additional summonses for the U.S. Attorney & U.S. Attorney General. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to Issue., 4. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zljn, )
Related: [-]