New York Southern District Court
Judge:Gregory H Woods
Referred: Valerie Figueredo
Case #: 1:23-cv-08677
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Oct 03, 2023
Terminated:Feb 21, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 31, 2024 5:05 AM EDT
Defendant
Google LLC
Represented By
Zachary P Hutton
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Emily R. Pidot
Paul Hastings Llp (ny)
contact info
Daniel Richards
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Elliot Adler
Represented By
Bennitta Lisa Joseph
Joseph & Norinsberg, LLC
contact info
Michael R. Minkoff
Joseph & Norinsberg, LLC
contact info
Jon L. Norinsberg
Jon L. Norinsberg, Esq., PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
23 23 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 02/21 1:10 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Google LLC pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Elliot Adler. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Minkoff, Michael)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Voluntary Dismissal Wed 02/21 10:53 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Michael Minkoff. RE-FILE Document No. 22 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the stipulation of voluntary dismissal was not signed (ink/wet signatures) by all parties who have appeared;. Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed (scanned signature image) PDF. (nd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
22 22 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 02/20 6:45 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Google LLC pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Elliot Adler. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Minkoff, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 02/08 12:24 PM
ORDER granting20 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re20 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint addressed to Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo from Emily R. Pidot dated February 7, 2024.,1 Complaint. Application Granted. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 20. Google LLC answer due 2/28/2024. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo on 2/8/2024) (rro)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
20 20 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 02/07 10:07 AM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint addressed to Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo from Emily R. Pidot dated February 7, 2024. Document filed by Google LLC..(Pidot, Emily)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 01/11 2:35 PM
ORDER granting18 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re18 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint addressed to Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo from Emily R. Pidot dated January 10, 2024.,1 Complaint. Application Granted. Defendant's counsel is directed to file their response to the Complaint by February 7, 2024. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 18. Google LLC answer due 2/7/2024. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo on 1/11/2024) (rro)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 01/10 3:48 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint addressed to Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo from Emily R. Pidot dated January 10, 2024. Document filed by Google LLC..(Pidot, Emily)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 12/19 12:47 PM
ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting16 Motion for Zachary P. Hutton to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo on 12/19/2023) (rro)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
16 16 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 12/15 9:22 AM
MOTION for Zachary P. Hutton to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28697625. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Google LLC..(Hutton, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support of Motion,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Proposed Order for admission Pro Hac Vice
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Fri 12/15 9:44 AM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 16 MOTION for Zachary P. Hutton to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28697625. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (rju)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
15 15 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 12/08 2:46 PM
ORDER granting14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re14 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint addressed to Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo from Emily R. Pidot dated December 7, 2023.,1 Complaint. Application Granted. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motionat ECF No. 14. Google LLC answer due 1/16/2024. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo on 12/8/2023) (rro)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2023
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 12/07 5:10 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint addressed to Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo from Emily R. Pidot dated December 7, 2023. Document filed by Google LLC..(Pidot, Emily)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
13 13 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 10/23 4:18 PM
ORDER granting11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re11 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint addressed to Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo from Emily Pidot dated October 20, 2023.,12 Summons Returned Executed. Application Granted. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminatethe motion at ECF No. 11 Google LLC answer due 12/17/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo on 10/23/2023) (rro)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 10/20 10:10 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Google LLC served on 10/17/2023, answer due 11/7/2023. Document filed by Elliot Adler..(Minkoff, Michael)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 10/20 9:57 AM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint addressed to Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo from Emily Pidot dated October 20, 2023. Document filed by Google LLC..(Pidot, Emily)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/20 9:51 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Richards on behalf of Google LLC..(Richards, Daniel)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/20 9:37 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Emily R. Pidot on behalf of Google LLC..(Pidot, Emily)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
8 8 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 10/04 3:45 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation) and All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 10/4/2023) (rro)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued Wed 10/04 12:24 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Google LLC. (vf)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 10/04 11:55 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Minkoff, Michael)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Wed 10/04 9:29 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michael R. Minkoff. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Elliot Adler. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet Wed 10/04 9:32 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Michael R. Minkoff to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Nature of Suit Error. Place an [X] in One Box Only on Form. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (vf)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 10/04 12:07 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 10/04 12:08 PM
Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 10/04 12:08 PM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/03 3:06 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bennitta Lisa Joseph on behalf of Elliot Adler..(Joseph, Bennitta)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/03 3:02 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jon L. Norinsberg on behalf of Elliot Adler..(Norinsberg, Jon)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 10/03 2:53 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Google LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Elliot Adler..(Minkoff, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 10/03 2:49 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Minkoff, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 23 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 10/03 2:40 PM
COMPLAINT against Google LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28374514)Document filed by Elliot Adler..(Minkoff, Michael)
Related: [-]