Arizona District Court
Judge:Rosemary Marquez
Case #: 4:23-cv-00453
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Oct 03, 2023
Terminated:Jun 17, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 31, 2024 2:34 AM MST
Defendant
Dur Saleh
Defendant
Saleh Property Investment
Defendant
Tucson Auto Center
Defendant
Tucson Used Auto Sales LLC
Plaintiff
Ahmad Naeem Wakili
600 N Pantano Rd. Apt. 128
Tucson, AZ 85710

GPO May 14 2024
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED, Plaintiff's 2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is GRANTED. Plaintiffs 1 Complaint is dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim. Within 30 days, Plaintiff may file a first amended complaint that cures the deficiencies addressed in this Order. Failure to comply will result in, without further notice, a judgment of dismissal of this action with prejudice. Plaintiff's 6 Request for Hearing is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 5/13/24. (BAC)

Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM MST
Monday, June 17, 2024
8 8 order Clerks Judgment Mon 06/17 1:44 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's order filed 8/14/24, judgment is entered against plaintiff. Plaintiff to take nothing, and complaint and action are dismissed with prejudice for failure to comply with the Court's order. (BAC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
7 7 6 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 05/14 12:54 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED, Plaintiff's2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is GRANTED. Plaintiffs1 Complaint is dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim. Within 30 days, Plaintiff may file a first amended complaint that cures the deficiencies addressed in this Order. Failure to comply will result in, without further notice, a judgment of dismissal of this action with prejudice. Plaintiff's6 Request for Hearing is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 5/13/24. (BAC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
6 6 motion Hearing Thu 10/19 10:46 AM
MOTIO Related [+] for Hearing by Ahmad Naeem Wakili. (BAC)
Related: [-] quest
Friday, October 06, 2023
5 5 misc Request by Non-Prisoner Pro Se Party for Electronic Noticing Tue 10/10 10:22 AM
REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING filed by Ahmad Naeem Wakili. Pro se parties must promptly notify the Clerks Office, in writing, if there is a change in designated e-mail address or mailing address. (JAM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
4 4 misc Notice to Self-Represented Litigant Tue 10/03 1:58 PM
NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (MCO)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc New Case Opened Tue 10/03 1:57 PM
This case has been assigned to the Honorable Rosemary Marquez. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-23-453-TUC-RM. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 10/03 1:56 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Ahmad Naeem Wakili. (MCO)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 10/03 1:55 PM
COMPLAINT FOR EMPLOYMENT DISCRIMINATION filed by Ahmad Naeem Wakili.(MCO)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment