South Carolina District Court
Judge:Bruce Howe Hendricks
Referred: Molly H Cherry
Case #: 2:23-cv-04935
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Oct 02, 2023
Terminated:Apr 10, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Mar 30, 2024 5:25 AM EDT
Defendant
Greg Gomes
Chief of Police North Charleston Department 2500 City Hall Lane
North Charleston, SC 29419
Defendant
Matthew Little John
Chief Director of Medical University of South Carolina 10 Mcclennan Banks Drive
North Charleston, SC 29425
Defendant
Michael Leach
State Director of DSS Suite 101 3685 Rivers Avenue
North Charleston, SC 29405
Defendant
Henry McMaster
Governor of South Carolina 1100 Gervais Street
Columbia, SC 29208
Plaintiff
Richard Corley
Foreign private trust 289 Orangeburg Road
Summerville, SC 29483
Plaintiff
Naomi Daniels
Foreign private trust 289 Orangeburg Road
Summerville, SC 29483
Plaintiff
LDC
289 Orangeburg Road
Summerville, SC 29483


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
13 13 misc Mail Returned Wed 07/03 8:31 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Addressee: Naomi Daniels. Document Returned:7 Order to Notify of Address Change, Terminate Motions, and8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Richard Corley. (agaz, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
12 12 misc Document Mailed Wed 04/10 3:36 PM
***DOCUMENT MAILED11 Judgment,10 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Report and Recommendation, placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Richard Corley, Naomi D aniels, and LDC at 289 Orangeburg Road Summerville, SC 29483 (hcor, )
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Judgment Wed 04/10 3:35 PM
JUDGMENT : Plaintiffs, Richard Corley, Naomi Daniels, LDC, shall take nothing of Defendants, as to the complaint filed pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1983 and this action is dismissed without prejudice. (hcor, )
Related: [-]
10 10 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Report and Recommendation Wed 04/10 3:28 PM
ORDER The Court adopts the Magistrate Judge's 8 Report and Recommendation and grants in part and denies in part Plaintiff's 6 Motion to Dismiss. The Court dismisses this action without prejudice and without issuance and service of process. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 4/10/2024.(hcor, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
9 9 misc Document Mailed Tue 03/19 9:12 AM
***DOCUMENT MAILED8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Richard Corley,7 Order to Notify of Address Change, Terminate Motions, placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerk' s Office to Richard Corley, Naomi Daniels, and LDC at 289 Orangeburg Road Summerville, SC 29483. (agaz, )
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Report and Recommendation Tue 03/19 9:09 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: It is recommended that Plaintiff Corley's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 6) be GRANTED, in part, as to his request to dismiss his own claims without prejudice, and that the Motion be DENIED, in part, as to any request to dismiss the claims of Plaintiff Daniels, Plaintiff LDC, and any trust. It is also recommended that this action be DISMISSED without prejudice and without issuance and service of process for the reasons discussed. Objections to R&R due by 4/2/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Molly H Cherry on 3/19/2024. (agaz, )
Related: [-]
7 7 3 pgs order Order to Notify of Address Change ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 03/19 9:05 AM
ORDER directing plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any address changes, Motion GRANTED: 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Related [+] filed by LDC, Naomi Daniels, Richard Corley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Molly H Cherry on 3/19/2024. (agaz, )
Related: [-] stricted Access
Thursday, March 07, 2024
6 6 motion Dismiss Thu 03/07 4:17 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Richard Corley. Response to Motion due by 3/21/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Motions referred to Molly H Cherry.(dgar)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
3 3 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Tue 10/03 10:13 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Richard Corley, Naomi Daniels, Levin Daniels-Corley. (agaz)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 10/03 10:11 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Related [+] by Richard Corley, Naomi Daniels, Levin Daniels-Corley. Response to Motion due by 10/17/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Motions referred to Molly H Cherry. (agaz)
Related: [-] stricted Access
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 10/03 10:09 AM
COMPLAINT against Greg Gomes, Matthew Little John, Michael Leach, Henry McMaster, filed by Richard Corley, Levin Daniels-Corley, Naomi Daniels. (agaz)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-D