Nolan et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Bruce Howe Hendricks |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-04953 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Oct 03, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Georgetown County Court of Common Pleas, 2023CP2200698 |
Last checked: Sunday Mar 31, 2024 5:11 AM EDT |
Defendant
Ford Motor Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SpeeDee Worldwide LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jimmy Nolan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Taran Nolan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Monday, November 04, 2024 | ||
38 | 38
![]() REPLY to Response to Motion re29 MOTION for Summary Judgment Response filed by Ford Motor Company. (Sammataro, Carmelo) |
|
Tuesday, October 29, 2024 | ||
37 | 37
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Tue 10/29 3:08 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 30 Motion to Stay re 28 Amended Scheduling Order deadlines. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 10/29/2024.(rhei, ) |
|
Monday, October 28, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
![]() RESPONSE in Opposition re29 MOTION for Summary Judgment ,31 MOTION for Summary Judgment Response filed by Jimmy Nolan(individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of M.N.).Reply to Response to Motion due by 11/4/2024 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Burgess, Matthew) |
|
Monday, October 21, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Mon 10/21 10:45 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 34 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Plaintiffs to respond to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 29) is 10/25/2024. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 10/21/2024.(rhei, ) |
|
Friday, October 18, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
![]() First MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Memo in Opposition to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion for Summary Judgment by Jimmy Nolan(individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of M.N.), Jimmy Nolan(as the parent and natural guardian of J.N., a minor), Jimmy Nolan(as the parent and natural guardian of D.N., a minor), Taran Nolan. Response to Motion due by 11/1/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Burgess, Matthew) |
|
33 | 33
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Joseph Burgess on behalf of Jimmy Nolan(individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of M.N.), Jimmy Nolan(as the parent and natural guardian of J.N., a minor), Jimmy Nolan(as the parent and natural guardian of D.N., a minor), Taran Nolan (Burgess, Matthew) |
|
Thursday, October 10, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
![]() Additional Attachments to Main Document31 MOTION for Summary Judgment . First attachment description: Exhibit A Franchise Agreement . (Highfield, Duke) |
|
31 | 31
![]() MOTION for Summary Judgment by SpeeDee Worldwide LLC. Response to Motion due by 10/24/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Highfield, Duke) |
|
Wednesday, October 02, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
![]() MOTION to Stay re28 Scheduling Order,,, Terminate Motions,, by Ford Motor Company. Response to Motion due by 10/16/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Sammataro, Carmelo) |
|
Tuesday, September 24, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
![]() MOTION for Summary Judgment by Ford Motor Company. Response to Motion due by 10/8/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(Sammataro, Carmelo) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
![]() AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 9/16/2024, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 11/14/2024, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 12/2/2024, Discovery due by 12/30/2024, Motions due by 5/17/2025, Jury Selection Deadline 6/30/2025, Mediation Due by 2/5/2025. (Motions terminated: 27 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct Conference And Scheduling Order filed by Taran Nolan, Jimmy Nolan). Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 07/26/2024. (rhei, ) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
![]() Second MOTION to Amend/Correct Conference And Scheduling Order by Jimmy Nolan(individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of M.N.), Jimmy Nolan(as the parent and natural guardian of J.N., a minor), Jimmy Nolan(as the parent and natural guardian of D.N., a minor), Taran Nolan. Response to Motion due by 8/8/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Jefferies, Lane) |
|
26 | 26
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 07/25 4:18 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Jonathan Tuck Tan for Ford Motor Company. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 07/25/2024.(rhei, ) |
|
25 | 25
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 07/25 4:16 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Perry W Miles for Ford Motor Company. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 07/25/2024.(rhei, ) |
|
24 | 24
![]() MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan T. Tan ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ASCDC-11897393) by Ford Motor Company. Response to Motion due by 8/8/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(Sammataro, Carmelo) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
23 | 23
![]() MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Perry W. Miles ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ASCDC-11897331) by Ford Motor Company. Response to Motion due by 8/8/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(Sammataro, Carmelo) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
![]() AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witnesses due by 8/16/2024, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses due by 10/15/2024, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/1/2024, Discovery due by 11/29/2024, Motions due by 4/17/2025, Jury Selection Deadline 3/31/2025, Mediation Due by 1/6/2025. Motions terminated: 21 First MOTION to Amend/Correct 11 Scheduling Order filed by Taran Nolan, Jimmy Nolan. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 07/01/2024. (rhei, ) |
|
Thursday, June 27, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
![]() First MOTION to Amend/Correct11 Scheduling Order,, by Jimmy Nolan(individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of M.N.), Jimmy Nolan(as the parent and natural guardian of J.N., a minor), Jimmy Nolan(as the parent and natural guardian of D.N., a minor), Taran Nolan. Response to Motion due by 7/11/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Pizarro, Margie) |
|
Tuesday, June 25, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Tue 06/25 11:35 AM
TEXT ORDER denying motion 19 without prejudice for failure to email to chambers a proposed order in the proper format. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 06/25/2024.(rhei, ) |
|
Wednesday, June 12, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
![]() First MOTION to Amend/Correct11 Scheduling Order,, by Jimmy Nolan(individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of M.N.), Jimmy Nolan(as the parent and natural guardian of J.N., a minor), Jimmy Nolan(as the parent and natural guardian of D.N., a minor), Taran Nolan. Response to Motion due by 6/26/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(Pizarro, Margie) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, May 28, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
![]() NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Joseph Kenneth Carter, Jr for 9/2/2024 - 9/18/2024 (Carter, Joseph) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Margie Pizarro on behalf of Jimmy Nolan(individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of M.N.), Jimmy Nolan(as the parent and natural guardian of J.N., a minor), Jimmy Nolan(as the parent and natural guardian of D.N., a minor), Taran Nolan (Pizarro, Margie) |
|
Friday, November 17, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
![]() FIRST AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/7/2024, Plaintiff's ID of Expert Witness due by 4/8/2024, Defendant's ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 8/6/2024, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 8/6/2024, Discovery due by 10/7/2024, Motions due by 11/7/2024, Jury Selection Deadline 2/5/2025, Mediation Due by 10/7/2024. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 11/17/2023. (gray) |
|
15 | 15
![]() Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Ford Motor Company.(Sammataro, Carmelo) |
|
14 | 14
![]() Joint Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Ford Motor Company.(Sammataro, Carmelo) |
|
13 | 13
![]() Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Ford Motor Company.(Sammataro, Carmelo) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, October 13, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
![]() MEDIATION ORDER: Mediation Due by 4/8/2024. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 10/13/2023. (gray) |
|
11 | 11
![]() SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 11/3/2023, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 11/17/2023, Rule 26 Report due by 11/17/2023, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/8/2023, Plaintiff's ID of Expert Witness due by 1/8/2024, Defendant's ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/7/2024, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/7/2024, Discovery due by 4/8/2024, Motions due by 5/8/2024, Jury Selection Deadline 8/6/2024, Mediation Due by 4/8/2024. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 10/13/2023. (gray) |
|
Thursday, October 12, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
![]() NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Georgetown County.(Sammataro, Carmelo) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, October 11, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Catherine Harbin on behalf of Jimmy Nolan(individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of M.N.), Jimmy Nolan(as the parent and natural guardian of J.N., a minor), Jimmy Nolan(as the parent and natural guardian of D.N., a minor), Taran Nolan (Harbin, Mary) |
|
8 | 8
![]() Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Jimmy Nolan(individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of M.N.), Jimmy Nolan(as the parent and natural guardian of J.N., a minor), Jimmy Nolan(as the parent and natural guardian of D.N., a minor), Taran Nolan.(Harbin, Mary) |
|
Thursday, October 05, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
![]() ANSWER to Complaint by Ford Motor Company.(Sammataro, Carmelo) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by SpeeDee Worldwide LLC.(Highfield, Duke) |
|
5 | 5
![]() ANSWER to Complaint by SpeeDee Worldwide LLC.(Highfield, Duke) |
|
Tuesday, October 03, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
![]() CONSENT TO REMOVAL FROM STATE COURT by Ford Motor Company, SpeeDee Worldwide LLC. (gray) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Ford Motor Company, SpeeDee Worldwide LLC. (gray) |
|
1 | 1
![]() NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Georgetown Court of Common Pleas, case number 2023CP2200698. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-11352364), filed by SpeeDee Worldwide LLC, Ford Motor Company. (gray) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |