Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Rodney Gilstrap
Case #: 2:23-cv-00462
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause15:1126 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Oct 03, 2023
Terminated:Mar 27, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 31, 2024 3:50 AM CDT
Consol Defendant
T-Mobile USA, Inc.
Represented By
Melissa Richards Smith
Gillam & Smith, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Pay As You Go, LLC
Represented By
Donald R McPhail
Oblon, Mcclelland, Maier, & Neustadt LLP
contact info
Randall T Garteiser
Garteiser Honea PLLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Consol Defendant
Verizon Communications Inc
Terminated: 01/05/2024
Represented By
Deron R Dacus
The Dacus Firm, PC
contact info
Defendant
AT&T Inc
Terminated: 01/22/2024
Represented By
Deron R Dacus
The Dacus Firm, PC
contact info
Matthew Sean Yungwirth
Duane Morris Llp - Atlanta
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
29 29 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Wed 03/27 8:46 AM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (NKL)
Related: [-]
28 28 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 03/27 8:19 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/26/2024. (NKL)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
27 27 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 03/18 4:10 PM
JOINT STIPULATION of Dismissal by Pay As You Go, LLC.(McPhail, Donald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
26 26 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Wed 02/07 8:49 AM
ORDER granting25 Motion to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Resolution between Pay As You Go LLC and T-Mobile USA, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/6/2024. (nkl, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
25 25 motion Stay Thu 02/01 2:33 PM
JOINT MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Resolution between Pay As You Go LLC and T-Mobile USA, Inc. by Pay As You Go, LLC.(McPhail, Donald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, January 22, 2024
24 24 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Mon 01/22 8:52 AM
ORDER re22 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Pay As You Go, LLC, AT&T Inc terminated., Attorney Deron R Dacus and Matthew Sean Yungwirth terminated.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/19/2024. (nkl, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
minutes Scheduling Conference/Case Management Conference Mon 01/22 1:50 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap (Lead 2:23-cv-462 and Member 2:23-cv-501): Scheduling Conference/Case Management Conference held on 1/18/2024. Counsel for the parties appeared. Court asked whether they consented to trial before the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Court then gave counsel Claim Construction and Jury Selection/Trial dates. (Court Reporter Shawn McRoberts) (aeb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
23 23 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 01/17 5:54 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Randall T Garteiser on behalf of Pay As You Go, LLC (Garteiser, Randall)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 01/17 10:25 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Between Pay As You Go, LLC and AT&T Inc. by Pay As You Go, LLC.(McPhail, Donald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
notice Notice of Magistrate Availability Tue 01/09 7:48 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (nkl, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
21 21 misc Jury Demand Mon 01/08 5:24 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Mon 01/08 5:23 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Smith, Melissa)
Related: [-]
19 19 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 01/08 5:21 PM
ANSWER to Complaint AND DEFENSES by T-Mobile USA, Inc..(Smith, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
18 18 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Fri 01/05 10:45 AM
ORDER re15 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Pay As You Go, LLC, Verizon Communications Inc (Consolidated Civil Action 2:23cv463 terminated., Attorney Deron R Dacus terminated.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/5/2024. (nkl, )
Related: [-]
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 01/05 10:08 AM
ORDER granting16 Motion to Extend Time for Service of P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 Contentions. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/5/2024. (nkl, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
16 16 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 01/04 6:35 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend Time for Service of P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 Contentions by Pay As You Go, LLC.(McPhail, Donald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, December 29, 2023
15 15 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 12/29 1:21 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Pay As You Go, LLC(McPhail, Donald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 12/29 10:03 AM
ORDER granting13 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint. Verizon Communications Inc answer due 12/29/2023. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/28/2023. (nkl, )
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2023
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 12/22 8:25 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,9 Order,, Set/Clear Flags, Complaint against Verizon filed in 2:23-cv-463 by Verizon Communications Inc.(Dacus, Deron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, December 15, 2023
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Fri 12/15 3:30 PM
ORDER granting11 Motion to Stay Deadlines. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/15/2023. (ch, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
11 11 motion Stay Thu 12/14 4:08 PM
JOINT MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Resolution by AT&T Inc.(Yungwirth, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
10 10 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 12/14 1:04 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Sean Yungwirth on behalf of AT&T Inc (Yungwirth, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
9 9 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Wed 12/13 11:28 AM
ORDER - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues with the LEAD CASE, Case No. 2:23-cv-00462. All parties are instructed to file any future filings in the LEAD CASE. Individual cases remain active for trial.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/13/2023. (nkl, )
Related: [-]
8 8 order Scheduling Order/Docket Control Order Wed 12/13 9:00 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Scheduling/Case Management Conference set for 1/18/2024 at 01:30 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/13/2023. (ch, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
text Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Tue 10/24 7:44 AM
Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for AT&T Inc to 12/14/2023. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
7 7 text Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Mon 10/23 4:51 PM
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re AT&T Inc.( Dacus, Deron)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 10/17 12:55 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pay As You Go, LLC. AT&T Inc served on 10/9/2023. (McPhail, Donald)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 10/06 2:00 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to AT&T Inc. (nkl, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 10/04 7:36 AM
Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Availability Wed 10/04 7:38 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (ch, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
4 4 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Tue 10/03 8:01 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Pay As You Go, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Patent Asset Management, LLC for Pay As You Go, LLC. (McPhail, Donald)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Tue 10/03 7:56 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (McPhail, Donald)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 10/03 7:55 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Donald R McPhail on behalf of Pay As You Go, LLC (McPhail, Donald)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 10/03 7:54 PM
COMPLAINT against AT&T Inc ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9738071.), filed by Pay As You Go, LLC.(McPhail, Donald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet