Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Sam A Lindsay
Case #: 3:23-cv-02198
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Oct 03, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Mar 31, 2024 4:15 AM CDT
Defendant
Duncanville Texas Department of Community Services Code Enforcement Department
Represented By
James T Jeffrey, Jr
Law Offices Of Jim Jeffrey
contact info
Defendant
Duncanville Texas Police Department
203 E. WHEATLAND RD
DUNCANVILLE, TX 75115
Represented By
James T Jeffrey, Jr
Law Offices Of Jim Jeffrey
contact info
Defendant
Jose Lanas
Defendant
Pineda
Represented By
James T Jeffrey, Jr
Law Offices Of Jim Jeffrey
contact info
Defendant
NFN Rawls
Defendant
Surety Bond of Officer Pineda
Defendant
Surety Bond of Officer Rawls
Defendant
Surety Bond of Sergeant D Younts
Defendant
D Younts
Represented By
James T Jeffrey, Jr
Law Offices Of Jim Jeffrey
contact info
Plaintiff
Kevin Lee Caldwell
Represented By
Mark J Lieberman, I
Lieberman Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Larry Michael Hook
Represented By
Mark J Lieberman, I
Lieberman Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Ajua Yvette Mason
Represented By
Mark J Lieberman, I
Lieberman Attorney At Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, February 14, 2025
33 33 respm Reply Fri 02/14 4:03 PM
REPLY filed by City of Duncanville Texas, Duncanville Texas Department of Community Services Code Enforcement Department, Duncanville Texas Police Department, Pineda, D Younts re:31 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint (Jeffrey, James)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 02, 2025
32 32 respm Response/Objection Sun 02/02 2:05 AM
RESPONSE filed by Kevin Lee Caldwell, Larry Michael Hook, Ajua Yvette Mason re:31 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint (Grisham, CJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
31 31 motion Dismiss Thu 01/16 3:45 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint filed by City of Duncanville Texas, D Younts, Pineda with Brief/Memorandum in Support.Attorney James T Jeffrey, Jr added to party City of Duncanville Texas(pty:dft) (Jeffrey, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Appendix Supporting Defendants Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Granting MTD Third Amended Complaint
Thursday, January 02, 2025
30 30 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 01/02 6:40 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND THIRD against All Defendants filed by Larry Michael Hook, Kevin Lee Caldwell, Ajua Yvette Mason. Summons(es) not requested at this time. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Grisham, CJ)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
29 29 4 pgs order Order Accepting/Adopting Findings and Recommendations Mon 12/23 4:45 PM
ORDER: The court denies as moot Plaintiffs'16 Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion; accepts the19 Report in part and rejects it in part; overrules Plaintiffs24 objections; grants Defendants'12 Motion; denies as moot Plaintiffs' First22 Motion for Leave; and denies as moot Plaintiffs' Second23 Motion for Leave. The court accepts the19 Report insofar as it relates to the factual and legal analysis regarding Plaintiffs' claims. The court, however, rejects the Report insofar as it recommends that the case be dismissed with prejudice and Plaintiffs be denied leave to amend. Further, the court directs Plaintiffs to amend and file their pleadings to correct the deficiencies identified by the court during the hearing by 5:00 p.m. on 1/10/2025. Failure to do so will result in dismissal with prejudice pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 12/23/2024) (agc)
Related: [-]
28 28 minutes Telephone Conference Mon 12/23 2:25 PM
ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sam A. Lindsay: Telephone Conference held on 12/23/2024. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - CJ Grisham; Defense - James Jeffrey, Jr.. (Court Reporter: Charyse Crawford) (No exhibits) Time in Court - 0:55. (chmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
27 27 1 pgs order Order Setting Deadline/Hearing Thu 12/19 3:38 PM
ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 12/23/2024 01:00 PM before Judge Sam A. Lindsay, to discuss pending motions and other related matters. Counsel for each party are to e-mail their telephone numbers for the conference to the court's court coordinator, Mrs. Tannica Stewart, by 12:00 noon, Friday, December 20, 2024. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 12/19/2024) (ndt)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
26 26 respm Response/Objection Mon 06/24 4:47 PM
RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Duncanville Texas Department of Community Services Code Enforcement Department, Duncanville Texas Police Department, Pineda, D Younts re:23 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct3 Amended Complaint,, (Jeffrey, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
25 25 respm Response/Objection Thu 06/20 11:10 AM
RESPONSE filed by Duncanville Texas Department of Community Services Code Enforcement Department, Duncanville Texas Police Department, Pineda, D Younts re:24 Response/Objection, (Jeffrey, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
24 24 respm Response/Objection Wed 06/05 6:17 PM
OBJECTION filed by Kevin Lee Caldwell, Larry Michael Hook, Ajua Yvette Mason re:19 Findings and Recommendations on Motion re:12 Motion to Dismiss filed by Duncanville Texas Police Department, D Younts, Pineda, Duncanville Texas Department of Community Services Code Enforcement Department. (Grisham, CJ)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Amend/Correct Wed 06/05 11:46 AM
Second MOTION to Amend/Correct3 Amended Complaint,, filed by Kevin Lee Caldwell, Larry Michael Hook, Ajua Yvette Mason (Grisham, CJ)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Proposed Amendment
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
22 22 motion Amend/Correct Tue 06/04 5:12 PM
First MOTION to Amend/Correct Amended Complaint filed by Kevin Lee Caldwell, Larry Michael Hook, Ajua Yvette Mason. Party City of Duncanville added. (Grisham, CJ)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
21 21 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Wed 05/08 9:36 AM
ORDER granting20 Motion to Substitute Attorney. The court therefore orders that Mr. CJ Grisham of the law firm Law Offices of CJ Grisham, PLLC is hereby substituted as counsel of record for Plaintiffs. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 5/7/2024) (ndt)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
20 20 motion Substitute Attorney Fri 05/03 9:32 AM
First MOTION to Substitute Attorney, and Request for Extension added attorney CJ Grisham,CJ Grisham for Larry Michael Hook,CJ Grisham for Kevin Lee Caldwell,CJ Grisham for Ajua Yvette Mason. Motion filed by Larry Michael Hook, Kevin Lee Caldwell, Ajua Yvette MasonAttorney CJ Grisham added to party Kevin Lee Caldwell(pty:pla), Attorney CJ Grisham added to party Larry Michael Hook(pty:pla), Attorney CJ Grisham added to party Ajua Yvette Mason(pty:pla) (Grisham, CJ)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, April 22, 2024
19 19 motion Findings and Recommendations Mon 04/22 10:25 AM
FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The Court should grant Defendants'12 motion to dismiss the amended complaint. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 4/22/2024) (cfk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
18 18 respm Reply Tue 03/12 3:41 PM
REPLY filed by Duncanville Texas Department of Community Services Code Enforcement Department, Duncanville Texas Police Department, Pineda, D Younts re:12 MOTION to Dismiss (Jeffrey, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
17 17 respm Response/Objection Tue 03/05 12:40 AM
RESPONSE filed by Kevin Lee Caldwell re:12 MOTION to Dismiss (Lieberman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
16 16 motion Extension of Time Mon 02/05 12:04 PM
MOTION to Extend Time 30 Day Extension filed by Kevin Lee Caldwell, Larry Michael Hook, Ajua Yvette Mason (Lieberman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
15 15 5 pgs order Order Staying Case Mon 01/29 9:20 AM
ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY PENDING RESOLUTION OF MOTION TO DISMISS BASED IN PART ON QUALIFIED IMMUNITY AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE:Responses due by 2/26/2024. Replies due by 3/12/2024. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 1/26/2024) (agc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
14 14 2 pgs order Order Referring Motion Tue 01/23 4:58 PM
Order Referring12 Motion to Dismiss to Magistrate Judge David L. Horan. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 1/23/2024) (sxf)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
13 13 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 01/22 3:18 PM
ANSWER to3 Amended Complaint,, filed by Pineda, D Younts. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Jeffrey, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Appendix Supporting Ds Younts & Pineda's Answer
12 12 motion Dismiss Mon 01/22 2:57 PM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by Duncanville Texas Department of Community Services Code Enforcement Department, Duncanville Texas Police Department, Pineda, D Younts with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Jeffrey, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 12/29 9:26 AM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Duncanville Texas Department of Community Services Code Enforcement Department answer due 1/22/2024; Duncanville Texas Police Department answer due 1/22/2024; Pineda answer due 1/22/2024; D Younts answer due 1/22/2024. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 12/28/2023) (sxf)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
10 10 notice Certificate of Conference Mon 12/18 1:02 PM
CERTIFICATE of Conference re9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Amended by James T Jeffrey, Jr on behalf of Duncanville Texas Department of Community Services Code Enforcement Department, Duncanville Texas Police Department, Pineda, D Younts (Jeffrey, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 12/15 2:38 PM
Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Duncanville Texas Department of Community Services Code Enforcement Department, Duncanville Texas Police Department, Pineda, D Younts (Jeffrey, James)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Fri 12/15 2:37 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Duncanville Texas Department of Community Services Code Enforcement Department, Duncanville Texas Police Department, Pineda, D Younts. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Jeffrey, James)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 12/15 2:36 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James T Jeffrey, Jr on behalf of Duncanville Texas Department of Community Services Code Enforcement Department, Duncanville Texas Police Department, Pineda, D Younts. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Jeffrey, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2023
6 6 10 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Thu 12/07 3:11 PM
Special Order 3-351: Effective December 7, 2023, active cases assigned or referred to Magistrate Judge Irma C. Ramirez will be transferred to the dockets of other magistrate judges in the Dallas Division as outlined on Exhibit A to this order. This case has been reassigned pursuant to Special Order No. 3-351. (The clerk has mailed a copy to all non-ECF users.) (Ordered by Chief District Judge David C Godbey on 12/7/2023) (twd)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 11/07 3:26 PM
Summons Issued as to Duncanville Texas Department of Community Services Code Enforcement Department, Duncanville Texas Police Department, Jose Lanas, Pineda, NFN Rawls, Surety Bond of Officer Pineda, Surety Bond of Officer Rawls, Surety Bond of Sergeant D Younts, D Younts. (kaf)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Request for Clerk to Issue Document Tue 11/07 3:12 PM
Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Kevin Lee Caldwell. (kaf)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 14, 2023
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Sat 10/14 5:46 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND Caldwell et al against All Defendants filed by Larry Michael Hook, Kevin Lee Caldwell, Ajua Yvette Mason. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Lieberman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
2 2 qcref Lindsay Wed 10/04 11:30 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 10/03 8:19 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by KEVIN LEE CALDWELL. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number ATXNDC-14078026) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Lieberman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet