California Central District Court
Judge:Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr
Referred: Autumn D Spaeth
Case #: 8:23-cv-01807
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2023
Terminated:Aug 30, 2024
Last checked: Monday Mar 25, 2024 1:29 AM PDT
Defendant
Luis A. Romero
Represented By
Stanley C Morris
Corrigan And Morris LLP
contact info
Brian Thomas Corrigan
Corrigan And Morris LLP
contact info
Defendant
Zera Financial LLC
Plaintiff
Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By
Michael Joseph Simeone
Us Securities And Exchange Commission
contact info
Charles E. Canter
Us Securities And Exchange Commission
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, August 30, 2024
71 71 judgmentCV Judgment - Default by Judge Permanent Injunction Tue 09/03 1:49 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO ZERA FINANCIAL LLC by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Motion for Default Judgment against Defendant Zera Financial LLC56 is GRANTED. Defendant violated and is permanently restrained and enjoined from violating Section 17(a) of the Securities Act of 1933, 15 U.S.C. Section 77q(a), in the offer or sale of any security by the use of any means or instruments of transportation or communication in interstate commerce or by use of the mails, etc. Defendant is liable for disgorgement of $1,667,826.45, representing net profits gained as a result of the conduct alleged in the Complaint, together with prejudgment interest thereon in the amount of $113,982.44, and a civil penalty in the amount of $2,264,901.40. Defendant shall satisfy this obligation by paying $4,046,710.29 to the Securities and Exchange Commission within 30 days after entry of this Final Judgment. See document for further details. ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (gk)
Related: [-]
70 70 order Default Judgment Tue 09/03 1:32 PM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's motion for default judgment against Defendant Zera Financial LLC56 is granted. A final judgment will be entered separately. (gk)
Related: [-]
69 69 minutes Motion Hearing ~Util - Link Motions to Minutes Tue 09/03 10:55 AM
MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. RE: Motion for Default Judgment56 . Counsel for Plaintiff submits on the Court's tentative ruling on Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment. A separate order will issue. Upon entry of final judgment against Zera Financial LLC, the Clerk shall close this case for administrative purposes without prejudice to reopening upon the filing by Plaintiff of a motion for disgorgement and civil penalties. Court Smart 8/30/2024. (gk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
68 68 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Thu 08/29 10:57 AM
(In Chambers) Order by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The Court has posted a tentative ruling on its webpage. The parties are ordered to review the tentative ruling and be prepared to address it at the hearing. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kac)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
67 67 adr Mediation Report (ADR-3) Completely Settled Wed 08/28 12:48 PM
MEDIATION REPORT Filed by Mediator (ADR Panel) Steven Kramer: and the case has been completely settled. With the filing of this Report, the parties are advised that they must notify the trial judge's deputy courtroom clerk of the fact of settlement and to promptly file documents regarding the final disposition of the case. Counsel: Please evaluate the effectiveness of the ADR Program by completing a survey on your mediation experience. To access the survey, click on the following link:[LINK:MediationParticipantSurvey] (Kramer, Steven)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
66 66 notice Notice (Other) Tue 08/27 3:09 PM
Notice of Decision filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Canter, Charles)
Related: [-]