Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 2:23-mj-00737
Case Filed:Oct 02, 2023
Last checked: Friday Oct 13, 2023 3:19 AM CDT
Defendant
Hunter Donald Hanley (1)
Represented By
Christopher Atkinson Jenkins
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Elizabeth Ann O'Connell
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Federal Public Defender - Corpus Christi
contact info
Material Witness
Cristian Geovanni Santos-Turcios
Represented By
Alfred H Montelongo
Alfred Montelongo
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
John Robert Lamont
United States Attorney
contact info
Corpus Christi MagDuty
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/13/2023 6:36 AM CDT
Sunday, October 01, 2023
Arrest of Hunter Donald Hanley. (KendraPearson, 2)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. John Robert Lamont appearing for USA, filed.(Lamont, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 3 pgs COMPLAINT as to Hunter Donald Hanley (1), filed. (Brooks) Initial Appearance set for 10/3/2023 at 09:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby (KendraPearson, 2)
Related: [-]
2 2 Affidavit for Material Witness(es) Cristian Geovanni Santos-Turcios as to Hunter Donald Hanley. Initial Appearance for Material Witness set for 10/3/2023 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby, filed. (KendraPearson, 2)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for Material Witness(es): Cristian Geovanni Santos-Turcios. Alfred H Montelongo appointed. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby) Parties notified. (MariaJasso, 2)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby) Parties notified. (MariaJasso, 2)
Related: [-]