Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:George Caram Steeh
Referred: Curtis Ivy, Jr
Case #: 2:23-cv-12498
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2003 Job Discrimination
Case Filed:Oct 04, 2023
Terminated:Aug 27, 2024
Last checked: Monday Apr 01, 2024 4:35 AM EDT
Defendant
Corevisor, Inc
Represented By
Caryn J. Devaney
The Hanover Law Group
contact info
Plaintiff
James Williamson, Jr
615 Griswold St 615 Griswold St
Detroit, MI 48226
Represented By
Carla D. Aikens
Carla D. Aikens, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
11 11 order Dismissing Case - Stipulated Order Tue 08/27 1:53 PM
STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
10 10 trial Witness List Wed 03/20 10:03 PM
WITNESS LIST by James Williamson, Jr (Aikens, Carla)
Related: [-]
9 9 trial Witness List Wed 03/20 1:52 PM
Expert WITNESS LIST by Corevisor, Inc (Devaney, Caryn)
Related: [-]
8 8 trial Witness List Wed 03/20 1:51 PM
WITNESS LIST by Corevisor, Inc (Devaney, Caryn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
7 7 order Scheduling Order Thu 02/08 12:20 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/14/2024 Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 8/2/2024 Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. Related [+] (DPer)
Related: [-] fer to image for additional dates
Thursday, February 01, 2024
6 6 misc Discovery Plan - Rule 26f Thu 02/01 5:28 PM
DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Devaney, Caryn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
order Text-Only Order Tue 12/19 10:57 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Parties are to submit a Joint Discovery Plan by January 26, 2024. The Court will determine at that time if a Scheduling Conference will need to be set or will enter a Scheduling Order based off the Joint Discovery Plan. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MLan)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
5 5 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Fri 12/15 10:13 AM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Corevisor, Inc (Devaney, Caryn)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 12/15 10:05 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Reliance on Jury Demand by All Defendants. (Devaney, Caryn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed - 60 Day Tue 10/17 10:48 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. COREVISOR, INC. waiver sent on 10/17/2023, answer due 12/18/2023. (Aikens, Carla)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued* Wed 10/04 3:31 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *COREVISOR, INC.* (LGra)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Complaint Wed 10/04 1:56 PM
COMPLAINT filed by JAMES WILLIAMSON, JR against COREVISOR, INC. with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9513578 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Aikens, Carla)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Wed 10/04 3:31 PM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (LGra)
Related: [-]