North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:Terrence W Boyle
Referred: Robert B Jones, Jr
Case #: 4:23-cv-00157
Nature of Suit863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause42:206 Social Security Benefits
Case Filed:Oct 04, 2023
Terminated:Apr 16, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Monday, May 13, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Mon 05/13 12:51 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 5/10/2024. (Stouch, L.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
18 18 misc Stipulation Wed 05/08 7:24 AM
STIPULATION regarding16 Consent MOTION for Attorney Fees under EAJA by Martin O'Malley (Parson, Cassia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/08 7:23 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Cassia W. Parson on behalf of Martin O'Malley. (Parson, Cassia)
Related: [-]
utility Motion Submitted Wed 05/08 12:23 PM
Motion Submitted to District Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding16 Consent MOTION for Attorney Fees under EAJA . (Stouch, L.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
16 16 motion Attorney Fees Tue 05/07 4:22 PM
Consent MOTION for Attorney Fees under EAJA filed by Christy Owens. (Hall, Charlotte)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Time Log,
Att: 2 Exhibit Fee Contract,
Att: 3 Exhibit CPI Calculation,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
15 15 order Judgment Tue 04/16 4:12 PM
JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED the Court hereby reverses the Commissioner's decision under sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) and remands the case to the Commissioner for further proceedings. Signed by deputy clerk for Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/16/2024. (Stouch, L.)
Related: [-]
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand Tue 04/16 4:08 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion to Remand. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 4/15/2024. (Stouch, L.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
utility Motion Submitted Wed 04/10 2:02 PM
Motion Submitted to District Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding13 Consent MOTION to Remand to Social Security Administration . (Stouch, L.)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
13 13 motion Remand Fri 03/08 10:03 AM
Consent MOTION to Remand to Social Security Administration filed by Martin O'Malley. (Dorval, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order For Remand Under Sentence Four
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/08 9:01 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Mark J Dorval on behalf of Martin O'Malley. (Dorval, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
11 11 motion Social Security Plaintiff Brief Fri 02/09 2:36 PM
Social Security Plaintiff's Brief (Hall, Charlotte)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
utility Motion Referred to Clerk Thu 01/11 2:54 PM
Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to brief for 30 days (first) . (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other Thu 01/11 3:50 PM
TEXT ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time10 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Plaintiff has up to and including February 9, 2024, within which to file Plaintiff's Social Security Brief. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/11/2024. (Hockaday, A.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
10 10 motion Extension of Time-Other Wed 01/10 11:10 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to brief for 30 days (first) filed by Christy Owens. (Hall, Charlotte)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, December 14, 2023
9 9 notice Notice-other Thu 12/14 11:22 AM
Notice to Parties Regarding Briefing Under the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
8 8 answer Transcripts - Social Security Case Mon 12/11 3:55 PM
Transcripts - Social Security Case (Mason, Wanda)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Transcripts - Social Security Case Mon 12/11 3:44 PM
Transcripts - Social Security Case (Mason, Wanda)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/13 8:41 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Wanda D. Mason on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi. (Mason, Wanda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 10/10 3:32 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr on 10/10/2023. (Stouch, L.)
Related: [-]
utility Motion Referred Tue 10/10 9:16 AM
Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr regarding2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Stouch, L.)
Related: [-]
service Notice of Social Security Case Service Tue 10/10 3:33 PM
NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY CASE SERVICE - This action is governed by the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g). Pursuant to Supplemental Rule 3, the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system, notifying the appropriate office within the Social Security of the General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of this case and Plaintiff's complaint. No summons will issue. Defendant's deadline to serve an answer or motion under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 is governed by Supplemental Rule 4. (Stouch, L.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
4 4 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Wed 10/04 10:35 AM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Christy Owens (Hall, Charlotte)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/04 10:33 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Charlotte Williams Hall on behalf of Christy Owens. (Hall, Charlotte)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 10/04 10:32 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Christy Owens. (Hall, Charlotte)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 10/04 10:30 AM
COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi, filed by Christy Owens. (Hall, Charlotte)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet