North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:Louise Wood Flanagan
Case #: 7:23-cv-01373
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
CauseCamp Lejeune Justice Act of 2022
Case Filed:Oct 04, 2023
Last checked: Monday Apr 01, 2024 4:41 AM EDT
Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
Ross McNeill Slaughter
Doj-Civ
contact info
Jacob A Bashyrov
Doj-Civ
contact info
Nicholas S. Crown
Doj-Civ
contact info
Nathan Jisu Bu
Doj-Civ
contact info
Nancy Tinch
Doj-Civ
contact info
Interested Party
Torts Branch USDOJ
Plaintiff
Cherie Gallaspy Bond
Represented By
Brian H. Barr
Levin Papantonio Rafferty Proctor Buchanan O'Brien Barr
contact info
Mike Saltaformaggio
'Maggio Law
contact info
Joshua Hill
Healy Law Group, LLC
contact info
Merrida P. Coxwell
Coxwell & Associates, PLLC
contact info
Gerald R. Healy
Healy Law Group, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Monday, November 25, 2024
19 19 notice Notice-other Mon 11/25 1:41 PM
Notice filed by United States of America . (Tinch, Nancy)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 05, 2024
18 18 notice Notice-other Fri 07/05 12:28 PM
Notice filed by United States of America Notice of Withdrawal of a Governmental Attorney . (Crown, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/06 6:30 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Nicholas S. Crown on behalf of United States of America. (Crown, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/05 9:45 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Ross McNeill Slaughter on behalf of United States of America. (Slaughter, Ross)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
15 15 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Fri 02/02 10:04 AM
TRACK 1 ORDER - IN RE: CAMP LEJEUNE WATER LITIGATION. Counsel is directed to read this Order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by Chief Judge Richard E. Myers II, District Judge Terrence W. Boyle, District Judge Louise W. Flanagan, and District Judge James C. Dever III on 2/1/2024. (Carter, Alexus)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/29 1:08 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Jacob A Bashyrov on behalf of United States of America. (Bashyrov, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Special Appearance Fri 01/12 1:09 PM
Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Brian H. Barr on behalf of Cherie Gallaspy Bond. (Barr, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/11 4:13 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Merrida P. Coxwell on behalf of Cherie Gallaspy Bond. (Coxwell, Merrida)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission and Affidavit Thu 01/11 2:29 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission and Affidavit filed by Cherie Gallaspy Bond. (Saltaformaggio, Mike)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Receipt
notice Notice to Counsel Thu 01/11 3:13 PM
Notice to Counsel regarding:11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission and Affidavit. Counsel is reminded that the filing user must lock or flatten the PDF document. Failure to flatten documents may result in the clerks office issuing a notice of deficiency. Counsel should "flatten" the document prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. (Carter, Alexus)
Related: [-]
order Text Order Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 01/11 3:15 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission. Attorney Brian H. Barr must file a notice of special appearance within ten days, unless one has already been filed. Local Counsel is DIRECTED to serve this order on out-of-state counsel. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/11/2024. (Carter, Alexus)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Counsel Thu 01/11 4:22 PM
SECOND Notice to Counsel regarding:12 Notice of Appearance. Counsel is reminded that the filing user must lock or flatten the PDF document. Failure to flatten documents may result in the clerks office issuing a notice of deficiency. Counsel should "flatten" the document prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. (Carter, Alexus)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
10 10 notice Notice of Special Appearance Thu 12/21 5:35 PM
Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Joshua Hill on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Hill, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
9 9 notice Notice of Special Appearance Mon 12/18 3:18 PM
Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Gerald R. Healy on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Healy, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/15 11:14 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Nancy Tinch on behalf of United States of America. (Tinch, Nancy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
order Text Order Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 12/14 9:37 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 6 and 7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission. Attorneys Joshua Hill and Gerald R. Healy must file a notice of special appearance within ten days, unless one has already been filed. Local Counsel is DIRECTED to serve this order on out-of-state counsel. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 12/14/2023. (Carter, Alexus)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
7 7 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission and Affidavit Wed 12/13 7:40 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission and Affidavit filed by Cherie Gallaspy Bond. (Saltaformaggio, Mike)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Receipt
6 6 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission and Affidavit Wed 12/13 7:27 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission and Affidavit filed by Cherie Gallaspy Bond. (Saltaformaggio, Mike)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Receipt
Monday, December 04, 2023
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/04 8:51 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Nathan Jisu Bu on behalf of United States of America. (Bu, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 11/06 2:44 PM
SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Cherie Gallaspy Bond. (Saltaformaggio, Mike)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/04 11:46 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Mike Saltaformaggio on behalf of Cherie Gallaspy Bond. (Saltaformaggio, Mike)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Wed 10/04 11:45 AM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Cherie Gallaspy Bond (Saltaformaggio, Mike)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 10/04 11:44 AM
COMPLAINT against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCEDC-7297177.), filed by Cherie Gallaspy Bond. (Saltaformaggio, Mike)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet for Complaint
service Notice of Camp Lejeune Justice Act Case Wed 10/04 1:30 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE. This action is governed by Standing Order 23-SO-1. Pursuant to that Order, the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Filing using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing System, notifying the United States Attorney for the Eastern District of North Carolina and the Civil Division, Torts Branch, Environmental Torts Litigation Office, United States Department of Justice of the case. Plaintiff need not serve a summons and complaint under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. No summons will issue. Service of the Complaint and any attachments thereto will be completed by a regenerated Notice of Electronic Filing to follow immediately. (Carter, Alexus)
Related: [-]