Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Leonie M Brinkema
Referred: William E Fitzpatrick
Case #: 1:23-cv-01358
Nature of Suit448 Civil Rights - Education
Cause20:1681 Civil Rights Education Amendments Act 1972
Case Filed:Oct 04, 2023
Terminated:May 02, 2024
Last checked: Monday Apr 01, 2024 4:59 AM EDT
Defendant
Loudon County School Board
Represented By
David P. Corrigan
Harman Claytor Corrigan & Wellman
contact info
Melissa Yvonne York
Harman Claytor Corrigan & Wellman
contact info
Plaintiff
Jane Doe
By her parents and next friends, Jane Roe and John Doe The Stanley Law Group, PLLC 13508 Booker T. Washington Hwy
Moneta, VA 24121
Represented By
William M Stanley, Jr.
The Stanley Law Group PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, May 02, 2024
25 25 1 pgs order Order Thu 05/02 1:06 PM
ORDER Granting24 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Jane Doe. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 5/2/2024. (Sbro, )
Related: [-]
24 24 1 pgs misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 05/02 12:37 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice by Jane Doe. (North, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Mon 04/29 4:46 PM
ORDER granting22 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney William M Stanley, Jr and Louis N. Joynes terminated. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 4/29/2024. (Sbro, )
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Withdraw as Attorney Mon 04/29 4:05 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Jane Doe. (Stanley, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/26 9:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin North on behalf of Jane Doe (North, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
20 20 9 pgs respoth Objection Fri 03/22 11:54 AM
Objection Plaintiff Jane Does Objections to Defendants Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents filed by Jane Doe. (Stanley, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
19 19 2 pgs misc Certificate Regarding Discovery Fri 03/01 3:35 PM
Certificate Regarding Discovery by Jane Doe.(Stanley, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 02/21 5:43 PM
ORDERED that defendant's Motion to Reschedule Final Pre-Trial Conference [Dkt. No. 16] be and is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 02/21/2024. (jlan)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Waiver of Wed 02/21 1:25 PM
Waiver of Oral Argument by Loudon County School Board (Corrigan, David)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Miscellaneous Relief (MOTION) Wed 02/21 1:22 PM
MOTION to Reschedule Final Pre-Trial Conference by Loudon County School Board.(Corrigan, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, February 15, 2024
15 15 5 pgs order Order Rule 16b Scheduling Order Fri 02/16 11:48 AM
Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference it is ordered that: Upon consideration of the representations made by the parties in the Proposed Joint Discovery Plan pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) (Joint Discovery Plan) (Dkt. 12) and at the initial pretrial conference held on February 14, 2024 and taking note of the Scheduling Order entered in this case (Dkt. 10), the court makes the following rulings: 1. All discovery shall be concluded by June 14, 2024. 2. The Joint Discovery Plan filed by the parties is approved, as amended herein, and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the Court. 3. All Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) disclosures shall be completed by March 1, 2024. 4. Expert disclosures shall be governed by paragraph IX of the Joint Discovery Plan. To the extent the parties wish to modify expert deadlines, they must seek leave of court. 5. The parties request for expanding the number of non-party, non-expert witness depositions from five (5), as provided by the Courts Scheduling Order, to ten (10) is denied without prejudice. If necessary, the parties may seek permission to take additional depositions by filing an appropriate motion and memorandum. (see Order for complete details) Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick on 2/15/24. (tfitz, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Fri 02/16 10:54 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick: Initial Pretrial Conference held via phone on 2/14/2024. Appearance of counsel. Joint Discovery Plan adopted as amended. (per WEF chambers) (tfitz, )
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 02/12 12:53 PM
It is hereby ORDERED that the Motion (Dkt. 13) is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick on 2/9/2024. (Sbro)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Miscellaneous Relief (MOTION) Fri 02/09 11:48 AM
Joint MOTION to Conduct Rule 16(B) Pretrial Conference Via Telephone Conference by Loudon County School Board. (Corrigan, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
12 12 misc Discovery Plan Thu 02/08 1:22 PM
Amended Joint Proposed Discovery Plan by Loudon County School Board.(Corrigan, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
11 11 misc Report of Rule 26 f Planning Meeting Wed 02/07 4:58 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Loudon County School Board. (Corrigan, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
10 10 order Scheduling Order Thu 01/18 3:11 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/14/2024 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick. Discovery due by 6/14/2024. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/20/2024 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 1/18/2024. (tran)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form,
Att: 2 Pretrial Notice
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/16 4:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Yvonne York on behalf of Loudon County School Board (York, Melissa)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 01/16 12:58 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Loudon County School Board.(Corrigan, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 12/11 4:18 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Loudon County School Board. Loudon County School Board waiver sent on 11/17/2023, answer due 1/16/2024. (York, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
6 6 misc Waiver of Thu 10/19 11:44 AM
Waiver of Oral Argument by Jane Doe (Joynes, Louis)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Fri 10/13 3:28 PM
ORDER that pltf Jane Doe's3 Motion for Leave to Proceed Anonymously be and is GRANTED (see Order for details). Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 10/13/23. (pmil, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
misc Notice of Correction Tue 10/10 10:07 AM
Notice of Correction: Filing user notified to file a Notice of Hearing or Waiver of Oral Argument re3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Anonymously (Sbro)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Tue 10/10 10:14 AM
No service issued at this time. (Sbro)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
4 4 13 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Wed 10/04 6:30 PM
Memorandum in Support re3 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Proceed Anonymously filed by Jane Doe. (Stanley, William)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Leave to File Document Wed 10/04 6:26 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Proceed Anonymously by Jane Doe. (Stanley, William)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Wed 10/04 6:24 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-9157981.), filed by Jane Doe.(Stanley, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit,
Att: 9 Exhibit,
Att: 10 Exhibit,
Att: 11 Exhibit,
Att: 12 Exhibit,
Att: 13 Exhibit
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 10/04 6:19 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-9157969.), filed by Jane Doe.(Stanley, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Initial Case Assignment Tue 10/10 10:04 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick. (Sbro)
Related: [-]