Texas Northern District Court
Judge:David C Godbey
Case #: 3:23-cv-02208
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Oct 05, 2023
Terminated:Jun 25, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 02, 2024 3:49 AM CDT
Defendant
Christopher Whitaker
Represented By
Brent Michael Douglas
Hahn Loeser & Parks LLP
contact info
Defendant
Bright Event Rentals LLC
Represented By
Brent Michael Douglas
Hahn Loeser & Parks LLP
contact info
Craig J. Mariam
Gordon & Rees LLP
contact info
Defendant
Peerless Events & Tents LLC
Represented By
Siobhan Kelley Ray
Mcdowell Hetherington LLP
contact info
Justin Roel Chapa
Mcdowell Hetherington LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Marquee Event Group Inc
Represented By
Scott Warden Weatherford
Jackson Walker LLP
contact info
Ashley Scheer
Jackson Walker
contact info
Karina Conley
Mcdonald Hopkins LLC
contact info
Julia G Ross
Mcdonald Hopkins LLC
contact info
Christopher Mugica
Jackson Walker LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
40 40 order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure Tue 06/25 11:49 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: The Court therefore ORDERS that all claims, counterclaims, and affirmative defenses asserted in this lawsuit between Whitaker, Bright, and Marquee are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Court further ORDERS that Whitaker and Bright are dismissed as parties to this case for all purposes and DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to terminate Whitaker, Bright, and their counsel as participants in this case. It is further ORDERED that Marquee, Whitaker, and Bright shall bear their respective attorneys' fees and costs. (Ordered by Chief District Judge David C Godbey on 6/25/2024) (ykp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
39 39 motion Dismiss Tue 06/18 10:33 AM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by Marquee Event Group Inc (Mugica, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order of Dismissal with Prejudice
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
38 38 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 04/30 12:04 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER finding as moot26 Motion to Dismiss per37 Order of Dismissal. (Ordered by Chief District Judge David C Godbey on 4/30/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
37 37 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 04/26 4:32 PM
ORDER granting36 Motion to Dismiss. Party Peerless Events & Tents LLC terminated. (Ordered by Chief District Judge David C Godbey on 4/26/2024) (agc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
36 36 motion Dismiss Wed 04/24 4:49 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by Peerless Events & Tents LLC (Chapa, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, March 25, 2024
35 35 order Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply Mon 03/25 3:54 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting34 Motion to Extend Time to File Response. Plaintiffs response to Defendant Peerless Events & Tents, LLCs motion to dismiss is due April 25, 2024. (Ordered by Chief District Judge David C Godbey on 3/25/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
34 34 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 03/25 12:34 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Brief in Support filed by Marquee Event Group Inc (Mugica, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, March 07, 2024
33 33 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 03/07 1:08 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,,,, filed by Christopher Whitaker. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Douglas, Brent)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
32 32 order Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply Tue 03/05 3:01 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting31 Motion to Extend Time to File Response. Plaintiff Marquee Event Group, Inc.s response to Plaintiffs Motion to Dismiss is due March 26, 2024. (Ordered by Chief District Judge David C Godbey on 3/5/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
31 31 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 03/05 2:46 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Brief in Support filed by Marquee Event Group Inc (Mugica, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time
Friday, March 01, 2024
30 30 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Set Aside Default Fri 03/01 3:53 PM
ORDER GRANTING28 DEFENDANT CHRISTOPHER WHITAKERS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO SET ASIDE CLERKS ENTRY OF DEFAULT. The Court grants Whitakers Motion and orders the Clerk to vacate the Entry of Default entered against Whitaker. (Ordered by Chief District Judge David C Godbey on 3/1/2024) (kaf)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
29 29 order Scheduling Order Fri 02/23 2:59 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Trial set for one week docket beginning 11/4/2024 before Chief District Judge David C Godbey. (Ordered by Chief District Judge David C Godbey on 2/23/2024) (axm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
28 28 motion Set Aside Default Thu 02/22 2:11 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Christopher Whitaker with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Douglas, Brent)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration(s) of C. Whitaker,
Att: 2 Declaration(s) of B. Douglas,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
27 27 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 02/22 1:47 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brent Michael Douglas on behalf of Christopher Whitaker. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Douglas, Brent)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
26 26 motion Dismiss Tue 02/20 12:11 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Brief in Support filed by Peerless Events & Tents LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Chapa, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) 2,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Friday, February 16, 2024
25 25 misc Status Report Fri 02/16 11:15 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT on Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Marquee Event Group Inc. (Weatherford, Scott)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
24 24 order Status Report Order Mon 01/29 4:34 PM
ORDER REQUIRING STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are directed to confer within 14 days of the date of this Order regarding the following matters, and report to the Court within 14 days after the conference the parties position. (Ordered by Chief District Judge David C Godbey on 1/29/2024) (kaf)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
23 23 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Fri 01/26 2:14 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Peerless Events & Tents LLC. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Ray, Siobhan)
Related: [-]
22 22 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 01/26 1:37 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,,,, filed by Peerless Events & Tents LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Ray, Siobhan)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Set Aside Default Mon 01/15 12:54 PM
ORDER granting20 Motion to Set Aside Default. The Court order the Clerk to vacate the Entry of Default entered against Peerless. (Ordered by Chief District Judge David C Godbey on 1/12/2024) (axm)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
20 20 motion Set Aside Default Mon 01/08 10:51 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Peerless Events & Tents LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Ray, Siobhan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) 2,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Thursday, January 04, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 01/04 12:19 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Siobhan Kelley Ray on behalf of Peerless Events & Tents LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Ray, Siobhan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
18 18 misc Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 01/02 10:34 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Peerless Events & Tents LLC, Christopher Whitaker. (cfk)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 29, 2023
17 17 misc Request for Clerk to Issue Document Fri 12/29 8:47 PM
Request for Clerk to issue Entry of Default filed by Marquee Event Group Inc. (Weatherford, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration(s) of Julia G. Ross,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) B,
Att: 4 Clerk's Entry of Default
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
16 16 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Tue 12/19 5:02 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bright Event Rentals LLC. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Douglas, Brent)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
15 15 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 12/08 1:32 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting13 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brent M. Douglas. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Chief District Judge David C Godbey on 12/8/2023) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 12/06 12:37 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,,,, filed by Bright Event Rentals LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Mariam, Craig)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 12/06 12:33 PM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Brent M. Douglas (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-14221829) filed by Bright Event Rentals LLCAttorney Craig J. Mariam added to party Bright Event Rentals LLC(pty:dft) (Mariam, Craig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, November 02, 2023
12 12 service Affidavit of Service Thu 11/02 12:31 PM
RETURN of Service for Subpoena served on Christopher Whitaker on 10/27/2023. (kaf)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
11 11 service Summons Returned Mon 10/23 10:30 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Bright Event Rentals LLC; served on 10/11/2023. (agc)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
10 10 service Summons Returned Tue 10/17 10:44 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Peerless Events & Tents LLC; served on 10/10/2023. (agc)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
9 9 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 10/13 1:48 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Julia D. Ross. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Chief District Judge David C Godbey on 10/13/2023) (chmb)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 10/13 1:47 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Karina R. Conley. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Chief District Judge David C Godbey on 10/13/2023) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
7 7 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 10/11 3:41 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ashley Scheer on behalf of Marquee Event Group Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Scheer, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
6 6 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 10/06 3:12 PM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-14087329) filed by Marquee Event Group IncAttorney Julia G Ross added to party Marquee Event Group Inc(pty:pla) (Ross, Julia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
5 5 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 10/06 2:26 PM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-14086870) filed by Marquee Event Group IncAttorney Karina Conley added to party Marquee Event Group Inc(pty:pla) (Conley, Karina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Thursday, October 05, 2023
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 10/05 4:20 PM
Summons Issued as to Bright Event Rentals LLC, Peerless Events & Tents LLC, Christopher Whitaker. (ndt)
Related: [-]
3 3 qcref Godbey Thu 10/05 4:17 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Thu 10/05 12:08 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Marquee Event Group, Inc.. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Weatherford, Scott)
Related: [-]
1 1 16 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 10/05 12:01 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Marquee Event Group, Inc.. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number ATXNDC-14083203) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Weatherford, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) 1- Rentals Acquisition Announcement,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) 2-Peerless Events & Tents About Us,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) 3-Employee Non-Compete,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) 4-Termination Letter,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) 5-Peerless Welcome to Our Team,
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) 6-Bell August 18, 2023 E-Mail,
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) 7-Tallman August 7, 2023 Letter