Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:23-bk-40624

Nebraska Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Brian S Kruse
Case #: 4:23-ap-04021
Nature of Suit62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Oct 04, 2023
Terminated:Jul 03, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Philip J. Conradt
4701 Quarry Ledge Rd
Roca, NE 68430
Represented By
Philip J. Conradt
contact info
Plaintiff
Pinnacle Bank, Aurora, NE
1234 L Street PO Box 229
Aurora, NE 68818
Represented By
Craig A. Knickrehm
Walentine, O'Toole, Mcquillan & Gordon
contact info
Andrew R. Biehl
Walentine, O'Toole, Mcquillan & Gordon
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Wed 07/03 10:17 AM
Adversary Case Closed A23-4021 Pinnacle Bank, Aurora, NE v. Conradt CASE DISMISSED on 6/14/2024. (jea)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
16 16 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Fri 06/14 2:54 PM
Order Granting Joint Motion to Dismiss Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Debt Related [+]. The motion is granted. This adversary case is dismissed. The movant must serve notice of this order on all parties in interest affected by the motion or order who did not receive notice via the CM/ECF system, and if any parties were served, the movant must file a certificate of service. ORDERED by Judge Brian S. Kruse. (Text Only Order) (mpm)
Related: [-] 15
15 15 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Fri 06/14 9:50 AM
Joint Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Pinnacle Bank, Aurora, NE (Knickrehm, Craig)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
14 14 court Hearing Set Thu 05/02 10:54 AM
TRIAL Set On Related [+]. Trial date set for one (1) day on 7/15/2024 at 09:00 AM at Lincoln's Courtroom. (See PDF for important deadlines and further instructions) (mpm)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Pinnacle Bank, Aurora, NE
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
13 13 order Administrative Order Text Only Tue 01/16 3:57 PM
Order Related [+]. The court has reviewed the Joint Preliminary Pretrial Statement (Fil. #12 ), and finds that it is binding upon the parties. The Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court will schedule a one (1) day trial to commence after June 3, 2024. Motions for summary judgment, if any, must be filed on or before April 30, 2024. ORDERED by Judge Brian S. Kruse. (Text only order) (dkk)
Related: [-] 12 Amended Joint Preliminary Pretrial Statement filed by Plaintiff Pinnacle Bank, Aurora, NE
Monday, January 15, 2024
12 12 notice Preliminary Pretrial Statement Mon 01/15 2:01 PM
Amended Preliminary Pretrial Statement Filed by Plaintiff Pinnacle Bank, Aurora, NE Related [+] (Knickrehm, Craig)
Related: [-] 11 Administrative Order Text Only
Friday, January 05, 2024
11 11 order Administrative Order Text Only Fri 01/05 3:43 PM
Order Related [+]. The parties are ordered to meet and confer regarding case progression. The joint preliminary pretrial statement does not contain any concrete deadlines. Trial readiness is 30 days after motions for summary judgment. Motions for summary judgment are due 30 days after discovery cutoff. The stated discovery cutoff is.... There is no stated discovery cutoff. By January 15, 2024, and only after the parties meet and confer, they should either a) file a new joint preliminary pretrial statement with actual calendar date deadlines; or b) if the parties cannot agree on the deadlines, set the matter for hearing and the court will set the deadlines for the parties. ORDERED by Judge Brian S. Kruse. (Text only order) (dkk)
Related: [-] 10 Joint Preliminary Pretrial Statement filed by Plaintiff Pinnacle Bank, Aurora, NE
10 10 notice Preliminary Pretrial Statement Fri 01/05 11:26 AM
Joint Preliminary Pretrial Statement Filed by Plaintiff Pinnacle Bank, Aurora, NE Related [+] (Knickrehm, Craig)
Related: [-] 6 Preliminary Pretrial Order
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
9 9 notice Certificate of Service Wed 12/06 3:25 PM
Certificate of Service of Pinnacle Bank's Initial Disclosures Filed by Plaintiff Pinnacle Bank, Aurora, NE (Knickrehm, Craig)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Certificate of Service Wed 12/06 3:23 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant Philip J. Conradt (Lentz, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 11/08 11:15 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+]. Notice Date 11/08/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Preliminary Pretrial Order
Monday, November 06, 2023
6 6 court Preliminary Pretrial Order Mon 11/06 8:46 AM
Preliminary Pretrial Order Related [+] Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 1/5/2024. (jea)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Pinnacle Bank, Aurora, NE
Friday, November 03, 2023
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 11/03 4:34 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Defendant Philip J. Conradt (Lentz, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
4 4 notice Certificate of Service Thu 10/05 11:21 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Pinnacle Bank, Aurora, NE Related [+] (Knickrehm, Craig)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Pinnacle Bank, Aurora, NE,3 Summons Issued
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
3 3 court Summons Issued Wed 10/04 3:13 PM
Summons Issued on Philip J. Conradt Date Issued 10/4/2023, Answer Due 11/3/2023 . (jea)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Wed 10/04 2:01 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 23-04021 BSK] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A9067877, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 10/04 2:00 PM
Adversary case 23-04021 Complaint by Pinnacle Bank, Aurora, NE against Philip J. Conradt. NOS: 62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud). Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Andrew R. Biehl, Craig A. Knickrehm on behalf of Pinnacle Bank, Aurora, NE. Nature of Suit: (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud))(Knickrehm, Craig)
Related: [-]