New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Eric R Komitee
Referred: Robert M Levy
Case #: 1:23-cv-07481
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Oct 05, 2023
Terminated:Sep 06, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 02, 2024 4:27 AM EDT
Defendant
Dynamic Medical Imaging P.C.
Represented By
Wesley Robert Mead
Wesley Robert Mead, Esq.
contact info
Defendant
Hillside 218 Multi Service LLC
Represented By
Robert E. B. Hewitt, III
Schwartz, Conroy & Hack, PC
contact info
Matthew J. Conroy
Schwartz, Conroy & Hack, PC
contact info
Defendant
Thomas Mallilo
Represented By
Benjamin Max Pinczewski
Pinczewski & Shpelfogel, P.C
contact info
Defendant
Pajit Ventures Inc.
Represented By
Benjamin Max Pinczewski
Pinczewski & Shpelfogel, P.C
contact info
Defendant
Paresh K. Rijsinghani, M.D.
Represented By
Wesley Robert Mead
Wesley Robert Mead, Esq.
contact info
Defendant
Thomas K. Dodson
Represented By
Robert E. B. Hewitt, III
Schwartz, Conroy & Hack, PC
contact info
Matthew J. Conroy
Schwartz, Conroy & Hack, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By
Richard D. King, Jr.
King, Tilden, Mcettrick & Brink, P.C.
contact info
Michael W Whitcher
King, Tilden, Mcettrick & Brink, P.C.
contact info
Caitlin Flanagan Keresey
King, Tilden, Mcettrick & Brink, P.C.
contact info
Nathan A. Tilden
King, Tilden, Mcettrick & Brink, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By
Richard D. King, Jr.
King, Tilden, Mcettrick & Brink, P.C.
contact info
Michael W Whitcher
King, Tilden, Mcettrick & Brink, P.C.
contact info
Caitlin Flanagan Keresey
King, Tilden, Mcettrick & Brink, P.C.
contact info
Nathan A. Tilden
King, Tilden, Mcettrick & Brink, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By
Richard D. King, Jr.
King, Tilden, Mcettrick & Brink, P.C.
contact info
Michael W Whitcher
King, Tilden, Mcettrick & Brink, P.C.
contact info
Caitlin Flanagan Keresey
King, Tilden, Mcettrick & Brink, P.C.
contact info
Nathan A. Tilden
King, Tilden, Mcettrick & Brink, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By
Richard D. King, Jr.
King, Tilden, Mcettrick & Brink, P.C.
contact info
Michael W Whitcher
King, Tilden, Mcettrick & Brink, P.C.
contact info
Caitlin Flanagan Keresey
King, Tilden, Mcettrick & Brink, P.C.
contact info
Nathan A. Tilden
King, Tilden, Mcettrick & Brink, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, September 06, 2024
order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Fri 09/06 2:14 PM
Civil case terminated. (APJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
order Order on Motion to Stay Order on Motion for Protective Order Thu 09/05 4:53 PM
ORDER finding as moot28 and30 . Ordered by Judge Eric R. Komitee on 9/5/2024. (APJ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
34 34 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 09/04 2:41 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendants Thomas Mallilo and Pajit Ventures Inc. by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Whitcher, Michael)
Related: [-]
33 33 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 09/04 10:28 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to All Defendants by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Whitcher, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
32 32 motion Adjourn Conference Mon 07/22 5:55 PM
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference Scheduled for July 24, 2024 Due to Settlement with All Defendants by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Whitcher, Michael)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Mon 07/22 6:13 PM
ORDER granting32 Motion to Adjourn Conference. A stipulation of dismissal or status report to be filed by 9/5/2024 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 7/22/2024. (JM)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
order Order(Other) Mon 06/17 1:10 PM
ORDER: The parties are advised that the dial-in and access code for the next telephone conference and any future telephone conferences scheduled before the Hon. Robert M. Levy, USMJ has changed to the following: Dial-In: 571-353-2301, Guest ID #: 623827231. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 6/17/2024. (JM)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
31 31 misc Status Report Fri 05/31 4:37 PM
STATUS REPORT in Accordance with February 29, 2024 Scheduling Order by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Whitcher, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
30 30 motion Protective Order Thu 03/14 3:17 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order [Stipulated Confidentiality Order] by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Whitcher, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
minutes Initial Conference Hearing Thu 02/29 4:52 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy: Michael Whitcher, Wesley Mead, Benjamin Pinczewski, and Robert Hewitt present by telephone. Case management order approved. Initial disclosures to be completed by 3/4/24. Written status report due 5/31/24. Next telephone conference 7/24/24 at 10:30am (same dial-in and access code) (status). Initial Conference Hearing held on 2/29/2024 (AM)
Related: [-]
order Status Report Order Thu 02/29 4:53 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 5/31/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 2/29/2024. (AM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
29 29 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Wed 02/28 8:11 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Whitcher, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
28 28 motion Stay Wed 01/17 9:26 AM
Consent MOTION to Stay Request to So-Order Stipulation to Stay and Enjoin Collection Actions as to Dynamic Medical Imaging, P.C. by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Whitcher, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Stipulation Requested to be So-Ordered
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
27 27 order Scheduling Order Tue 01/16 4:26 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An initial conference by telephone has been scheduled for February 29, 2024 at 4:30 p.m., before the Honorable Robert M. Levy, United States Magistrate Judge at (888) 684-8852; Access Code #: 6223489. All counsel must be available. Plaintiffs' counsel is directed to confirm with defendants' counsel that all necessary participants are aware of this conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 1/16/2024. (JM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Individual Rules,
Att: 2 IC Questionnaire
Thursday, December 28, 2023
26 26 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 12/28 12:59 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, by Thomas Mallilo, Pajit Ventures Inc.. (Pinczewski, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Thu 12/28 1:33 PM
ORDER granting25 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Richard D. King, Jr terminated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 12/28/2023. (JM)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
25 25 motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 12/15 8:42 AM
Letter MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as to Richard D. King, Jr. by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (King, Richard)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
24 24 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 12/11 10:10 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with affirmative defenses and jury demand by Dynamic Medical Imaging P.C., Paresh K. Rijsinghani, M.D.. (Mead, Wesley)
Related: [-]
23 23 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 12/11 9:53 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, by Hillside 218 Multi Service LLC, Thomas K. Dodson. (Conroy, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Wed 11/22 11:06 AM
ORDER granting22 Motion for Leave to File. The court has reviewed Plaintiffs' proposed briefing schedule on their motion for a preliminary injunction and directs the parties instead to submit briefing as follows: Plaintiffs to serve their motion for a preliminary injunction by December 22, 2023; Defendants to serve their opposition by January 22, 2024; and Plaintiffs to serve their reply, if any, by February 1, 2024. Each submission should follow the page limits in Rule III.D of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices and should be made in a single brief. Ordered by Judge Eric R. Komitee on 11/22/2023. (PMC)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
22 22 motion Leave to File Document Mon 11/20 4:52 PM
Letter MOTION for Leave to File Document According to Proposed Briefing Schedule (Motion for Preliminary Injunction as to Dynamic Medical Imaging, P.C.) by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Whitcher, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
21 21 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 11/15 4:00 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Dynamic Medical Imaging P.C., Paresh K. Rijsinghani, M.D.. (Mead, Wesley)
Related: [-]
20 20 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 11/15 10:08 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company. Paresh K. Rijsinghani, M.D. served on 10/25/2023, answer due 11/15/2023. (Whitcher, Michael)
Related: [-]
19 19 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 11/15 10:04 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company. Dynamic Medical Imaging P.C. served on 10/24/2023, answer due 11/14/2023. (Whitcher, Michael)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 11/15 5:03 PM
ORDER granting15 Motion for Extension of Time until December 11, 2023 for Dynamic Medical Imaging P.C. and Paresh K. Rijsinghani, M.D.to answer or otherwise respond to complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 11/15/2023. (JM)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 11/15 5:08 PM
ORDER granting21 Motion for Extension of Time from 12/11/23 to 12/15/23 for Dynamic Medical Imaging P.C.; and Paresh K. Rijsinghani, M.D. to respond to the complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 11/15/2023. (JM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
18 18 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 11/08 11:23 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company. Thomas Mallilo waiver sent on 11/2/2023, answer due 1/1/2024. (Whitcher, Michael)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 11/08 11:22 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company. Pajit Ventures Inc. waiver sent on 11/2/2023, answer due 1/1/2024. (Whitcher, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 11/01 11:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley Robert Mead on behalf of Dynamic Medical Imaging P.C., Paresh K. Rijsinghani, M.D. (notification declined or already on case) (Mead, Wesley)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 11/01 11:21 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Dynamic Medical Imaging P.C., Paresh K. Rijsinghani, M.D.. (Mead, Wesley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
14 14 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 10/24 12:26 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company. Thomas K. Dodson waiver sent on 10/11/2023, answer due 12/11/2023. (Whitcher, Michael)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 10/24 12:22 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company. Hillside 218 Multi Service LLC waiver sent on 10/11/2023, answer due 12/11/2023. (Whitcher, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
12 12 service Summons Issued Thu 10/19 2:51 PM
Summons Issued as to Dynamic Medical Imaging P.C., Hillside 218 Multi Service LLC, Thomas Mallilo, Pajit Ventures Inc., Paresh K. Rijsinghani, M.D., Thomas K. Dodson. (JVC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/11 9:45 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. B. Hewitt, III on behalf of Hillside 218 Multi Service LLC, Thomas K. Dodson (aty to be noticed) (Hewitt, Robert)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/11 9:43 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Conroy on behalf of Hillside 218 Multi Service LLC, Thomas K. Dodson (aty to be noticed) (Conroy, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
9 9 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Tue 10/10 9:38 AM
Proposed Summons. by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Whitcher, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 09, 2023
8 8 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Mon 10/09 11:57 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Mon 10/09 11:57 AM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (KD)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 10/09 11:56 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Eric R. Komitee and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD)
Related: [-]
misc Quality Control Check - Summons Mon 10/09 11:58 AM
Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: The full case caption(All Plaintiffs name and All Defendants) must appear on the summons., Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (KD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/05 5:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Caitlin Flanagan Keresey on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Keresey, Caitlin)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/05 4:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan A. Tilden on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Tilden, Nathan)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/05 4:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Richard D. King, Jr on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (King, Richard)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice(Other) Thu 10/05 4:46 PM
NOTICE by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company Certificate of No Liability Insurance (Whitcher, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 10/05 4:43 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Whitcher, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 83 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 10/05 4:26 PM
COMPLAINT against Dynamic Medical Imaging P.C., Hillside 218 Multi Service LLC, Thomas Mallilo, Pajit Ventures Inc., Paresh K. Rijsinghani, M.D., Thomas K. Dodson filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-17155496 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company. (Whitcher, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3,
Att: 6 Exhibit 4,
Att: 7 Exhibit 5