Utah District Court
Judge:David Barlow
Referred: Dustin B Pead
Case #: 2:23-cv-00707
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:0201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Oct 05, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 02, 2024 2:43 AM MDT
Defendant
doTERRA United States, LLC
389 South 1300 West
Pleasant Grove, UT 84062
Defendant
doTerra
389 South 1300 West
Pleasant Grove, UT 84062
Represented By
Kipp S. Muir
Smith Lc
contact info
Steven C. Smith
Smith Lc
contact info
Stephanie P. Alexander
Smith Lc
contact info
Defendant
doTerra International
389 South 1300 West
Pleasant Grove, UT 84062
Represented By
Kipp S. Muir
Smith Lc
contact info
Stephanie P. Alexander
Smith Lc
contact info
Plaintiff
Dustin Bingham
St. George, UT 84770
Represented By
Russell B. Weekes
Weekes Law LLC
contact info
Jared L. Bramwell
Kelly & Bramwell PC
contact info

GPO May 03 2024
MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER: The court GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART Plaintiffs motion. The court GRANTS conditional certification of the following class for notice purposes: Current and former hourly, non-exempt, employees of doTERRA International, LLC; doTERRA United States, LLC; or doTERRA, Inc. at any facility owned or operated by these companies in Utah at any time from October 6, 2020 to the present who: (1) worked more than forty (40) hours in any workweek; and (2) received a non-discretionary bonus. Further proceedings to determine the form, content, timing, and procedures of the notice to be sent to potential opt-in plaintiffs shall be before the Magistrate Judge. The court DENIES without prejudice Plaintiffs request for discovery and equitable tolling as premature. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 05/03/2024. (kpf)

Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Monday, April 14, 2025
98 98 motion Settlement Mon 04/14 5:16 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Settlement and Memorandum in Support ; Motion for Approval of the Settlement Agreement and for Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Defendants doTerra, doTerra International. (Smith, Steven)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
97 97 utility Remark-Attorney Email Invalid Fri 04/11 2:29 PM
NOTICE: The court received a bounce-back notification indicating that the primary email address salexander@smith-lc.com, for attorney Stephanie P. Alexander is invalid. Under DUCivR 83-1.2(e) and 83-1.3(e), attorneys must maintain valid and current contact information in PACER and with the court. Consistent with the CM/ECF Procedures Manual, the court has inactivated the attorneys efiling privileges. When the attorney updates their contact information in PACER, the court will reactivate their efiling privileges. Instructions for updating an address can be found at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/update-your-address-court. (nl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
96 96 order Order Tue 04/08 9:23 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER. On April 7, 2025, the parties filed 95 Notice of Settlement. Based on the Notice, the parties are ordered to file a status report within thirty days, if no dismissal documents have been filed. No attached document. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 4/8/25. (kbm)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
95 95 notice Notice of Settlement (Atty) Mon 04/07 4:42 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by doTerra, doTerra International (Smith, Steven)
Related: [-]
94 94 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Mon 04/07 4:27 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL of Stephanie P. Alexander filed by Steven C. Smith on behalf of doTerra, doTerra International (Smith, Steven)
Related: [-]