Tennessee Eastern District Court
Case #: 3:23-cr-00102
Case Filed:Oct 04, 2023
Terminated:Apr 16, 2025
Last checked: Friday Oct 06, 2023 3:21 AM EDT
Defendant
Matthew Estes (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jennifer Kolman
U S Department Of Justice (knox Usao)
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/17/2025 1:20 AM EDT
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
1 1 3 pgs INDICTMENT as to Matthew Estes (1) count(s) 1-2, 3-4.(JAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Criminal Cover Sheet
2 2 Sealed Document-Unredacted Indictment (JAN)
Related: [-]