Kentucky Eastern District Court
Case #: 5:23-cr-00110
Case Filed:Oct 05, 2023
Last checked: Friday Oct 13, 2023 3:37 AM EDT
Defendant
Paige V. Graves (2)
Represented By
Bradley D. Clark
Suhre & Associates, Llc - Lexington
contact info
Defendant
Keith Lamont Stallworth (1)
Represented By
Brandi N. Lewis
Baldani Law Group
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Roger West, AUSA
U.S. Attorney'S Office, Edky
contact info
Ron L. Walker Jr., AUSA
U.S. Attorney'S Office, Edky
contact info

GPO Aug 07 2024
ORDER as to Paige V. Graves:The Court hereby ADOPTS the magistrate judge's recommendation 68, accepts Defendant's plea of guilty, and enters a finding of guilty for Defendant as to Counts 6 & 9 of the Superseding Indictment. The Court also orders Defendant's interest in the property listed in the forfeiture allegation of the Superseding Indictment FORFEITED. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 8/7/2024. (KCF)cc: COR,USM,USP

Docket last updated: 10/20/2023 11:17 PM EDT
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
Conflict Check run. (JLM) [5:23-mj-05291-MAS]
Related: [-]
Conflict Check run. (JLM) [5:23-mj-05292-MAS]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Keith Lamont Stallworth (1). (JLM) (JLM). [5:23-mj-05291-MAS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 6 pgs Affidavit of Agent
Att: 2 1 pgs (8/16/2023) Main document
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Paige V. Graves (1). (JLM) (JLM). [5:23-mj-05292-MAS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Agent
Att: 1 6 pgs (8/16/2023) Attachment
Thursday, August 17, 2023
4 4 Arrest WARRANT Returned Executed on 08/14/2023 in case as to Keith Lamont Stallworth. (KCF) [5:23-mj-05291-MAS]
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Roger West, AUSA appearing for USA. (West, Roger) [5:23-mj-05292-MAS]
Related: [-]
5 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Roger West, AUSA appearing for USA. (West, Roger) [5:23-mj-05291-MAS]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 21, 2023
5 5 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum by USA as to Paige V. Graves. (West, Roger) [5:23-mj-05292-MAS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
6 6 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum by USA as to Keith Lamont Stallworth. (West, Roger) [5:23-mj-05291-MAS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, August 22, 2023
*** MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS OF Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett to review re6 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum by USA filed as to Keith Lamont Stallworth (JLM) [5:23-mj-05291-MAS]
Related: [-]
*** MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS OF Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett to review re5 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum by USA filed as to Paige V. Graves (JLM) [5:23-mj-05292-MAS]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER:granting5 Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum as to Paige V. Graves (1). ARRAIGNMENT set for 9/7/2023 at 10:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett. INITIAL APPEARANCE set for 9/7/2023 at 10:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett on 8/22/23. (JLM)cc: COR,USM(3 cert),USP,D (JLM). [5:23-mj-05292-MAS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (8/22/2023) Receipt
7 7 ORDER:granting6 Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum as to Keith Lamont Stallworth (1). ARRAIGNMENT set for 9/19/2023 at 10:30 AM in LEXINGTON before Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett. INITIAL APPEARANCE set for 9/19/2023 at 10:30 AM in LEXINGTON before Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett on 8/22/23. (JLM)cc: COR,USM(3 cert),USP,D (JLM). [5:23-mj-05291-MAS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (8/22/2023) Receipt
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
CJA Case Assignment by Clerk: APPOINTED CJA Attorney Bradley D. Clark for Paige V. Graves. cc: COR, USP, USM (KM) [5:23-mj-05292-MAS]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 07, 2023
ORAL MOTION for PT detention by USA. (JLM) [5:23-mj-05292-MAS]
Related: [-]
CJA Appointment of Attorney for Paige V. Graves. The Clerk ENTERED the representation and appointment in the eVoucher system for Bradley D. Clark. (JLM) [5:23-mj-05292-MAS]
Related: [-]
7 7 MINUTE ENTRY FOR INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Paige V. Graves held on 9/7/23 before Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett: Bradley D. Clark appeared and was APPOINTED CJA counsel of record. Oral motion for PT detention by USA. Defendant, before the Court on a writ, elected to defer her right to a detention hearing in this matter pending resolution of the other charges against her. Clerk administratively term pending detention motion. Substantive relief request remains pending. Upon resolution of the writ, Defendant SHALL file a motion so advising and requesting a detention hearing. The Court will promptly schedule one at that time. The Defendant requests a preliminary hearing. Fin aff filed. PRELIMINARY HEARING set for 9/13/2023 at 01:00 PM in LEXINGTON before Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett. Dft remanded to USMS. USPO to circulate PSR. (Tape #KYED-LEX__5-23-MJ-5292-MAS-1_20230907_094113.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett. (JLM)cc: COR,USM,USP,D [5:23-mj-05292-MAS]
Related: [-]
8 8 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Paige V. Graves (JLM) [5:23-mj-05292-MAS]
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
CJA Case Assignment by Clerk: APPOINTED CJA Attorney Brandi N. Lewis for Keith Lamont Stallworth. cc: COR, USP, USM (KM) [5:23-mj-05291-MAS]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
9 9 MINUTE ENTRY for PRELIMINARY HEARING as to Paige V. Graves held on 9/13/2023 before Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett: Bradley D. Clark appeared as APPOINTED CJA counsel of record. The Court heard testimony of one witness, proffer, and arguments of counsel as to probable cause. The Court FINDS PC to believe that a crime has been committed as detailed in the complaint. This matter is bound over to the GJ. Dft remains in USM custody. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett. (Tape #KYED-LEX__5-23-mj-5292-MAS_20230913_124446.)(SLH)cc: COR,USM,USP [5:23-mj-05292-MAS]
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs WITNESS LIST re9 Preliminary Hearing as to Paige V. Graves (SLH) [5:23-mj-05292-MAS]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
ORAL MOTION for PT detention by USA. (JLM) [5:23-mj-05291-MAS]
Related: [-]
CJA Appointment of Attorney for Keith Lamont Stallworth. The Clerk ENTERED the representation and appointment in the eVoucher system for Brandi Lewis. (JLM) [5:23-mj-05291-MAS]
Related: [-]
8 8 MINUTE ENTRY FOR INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Keith Lamont Stallworth held on 9/19/23 before Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett: Brandi N. Lewis appeared and was APPOINTED CJA counsel of record. USA orally moved for PT detention. Dft, before court on writ, deferred his right to a DH pending resolution of the other charges against him. Clerk term pending DM. Detention determination remains pending. Upon resolution of writ, dft file motion so advising and requesting DH. Fin aff filed. PRELIMINARY HEARING set for 10/2/2023 at 10:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett. Dft remanded to USMS. (Tape #KYED-LEX__5-23-mj-5292-MAS_20230919_103104.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett. (JLM)cc: COR,USM,USP,D [5:23-mj-05291-MAS]
Related: [-]
9 9 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Keith Lamont Stallworth (JLM) [5:23-mj-05291-MAS]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
*** FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS OF Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett to review: re10 Waiver of Preliminary Hearing filed as to Keith Lamont Stallworth (GLD) [5:23-mj-05291-MAS]
Related: [-]
10 10 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Keith Lamont Stallworth (Lewis, Brandi) [5:23-mj-05291-MAS]
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
11 11 ORDER as to Keith Lamont Stallworth: Defendant Keith Lamont Stallworth is scheduled to come before the Court for a preliminary hearing on October 2, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. Stallworth has filed a waiver of the preliminary hearing. [DE10 ]. Accordingly, the Preliminary Hearing scheduled for October 2, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. is SET ASIDE. As previously ordered, upon resolution of the writ, Defendant SHALL file a motion so advising and requesting a detention hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett on 10/2/23. (JLM)cc: COR,USM,USP,D [5:23-mj-05291-MAS]
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
Conflict Check run. (KM)
Related: [-]
*** MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS OF Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett to review re15 MOTION for Arraignment by USA, 16 MOTION for Arraignment by USA filed as to Keith Lamont Stallworth, Paige V. Graves (KM)
Related: [-]
12 12 3 pgs INDICTMENT returned in open court as to Keith Lamont Stallworth (1) count(s) 1-3 and Paige V. Graves (2) count(s) 3. (KM)
Related: [-]
13 13 SEALED UNREDACTED Indictment re12 Indictment by USA as to Keith Lamont Stallworth, Paige V. Graves (KM)
Related: [-]
15 15 1 pgs MOTION for Arraignment by USA as to Keith Lamont Stallworth.Motions referred to Matthew A. Stinnett. (KM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
16 16 1 pgs MOTION for Arraignment by USA as to Paige V. Graves.Motions referred to Matthew A. Stinnett. (KM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order