National Assoc. For Rational Sexual Offense Laws v. Joshua Stein
Original Case: 1:17-cv-00053
Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:23-cv.pr-02040 |
Type | civil private / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Oct 05, 2023 |
Last checked: Friday Oct 13, 2023 6:02 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
ATTORNEY GENERAL JOSHUA STEIN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
DISTRICT ATTORNEY LORRIN FREEMAN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
DISTRICT ATTORNEY SEAN BOONE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
DISTRICT ATTORNEY REECE SAUNDERS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR RATIONAL SEXUAL OFFENSE LAWS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
NC RSOL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
JOHN DOE 1
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
JOHN DOE 2
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/13/2023 4:19 AM EDT |
Thursday, October 05, 2023 | ||
1 | 1 1 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:17-cv-00053-LCB-JLW. Case manager: JeffNeal. [1001451333] 23-2040 JSN [Entered: 10/05/2023 01:39 PM] | |
2 | 2 7 pgs DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case. Originating case number: 1:17-cv-00053-LCB-JLW. [1001451335] 23-2040 JSN [Entered: 10/05/2023 01:41 PM] | |
3 | 3 1 pgs APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Joseph Finarelli for Sean Boone, Lorrin Freeman and Reece Saunders. [1001451363] 23-2040 Joseph Finarelli [Entered: 10/05/2023 02:05 PM] | |
4 | 4 2 pgs DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lorrin Freeman. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001451364] 23-2040 Joseph Finarelli [Entered: 10/05/2023 02:06 PM] | |
5 | 5 2 pgs DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sean Boone. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001451368] 23-2040 Joseph Finarelli [Entered: 10/05/2023 02:06 PM] | |
6 | 6 2 pgs DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Reece Saunders. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001451369] 23-2040 Joseph Finarelli [Entered: 10/05/2023 02:07 PM] |