Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:21-bk-11318

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John T Dorsey
Case #: 1:23-ap-50734
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Oct 06, 2023
Terminated:Feb 06, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Anthology, Inc.
Represented By
Anthology, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Alfred T. Giuliano, solely in his capacity as the Chapter 7 Trustee of Vista Professional Development, LLC, et al.
Represented By
Bryan J Hall
Archer & Greiner P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
10 10 notice Dismissal - Notice Tue 02/06 10:42 AM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano (Hall, Bryan)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Tue 02/06 3:18 PM
Adversary Case 1:23-ap-50734 Closed (SAP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
9 9 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Thu 01/11 1:22 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. Hearing scheduled for 1/17/2024 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Hall, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Tue 01/09 6:04 PM
Certificate of Service Regarding Order Granting First Omnibus Motion of the Chapter 7 Trustee for Entry of any Order Approving Settlements of Causes of Action Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019, Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Hall, Bryan)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 Tue 01/09 10:39 AM
Order Granting First Omnibus Motion of the Chapter 7 Trustee for Entry of an Order Approving Settlements of Causes of Action Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 Related [+] Order Signed on 1/9/2024. (LJH)
Related: [-] 5 ,6
Monday, January 08, 2024
6 6 misc Certificate of No Objection(Adv) Mon 01/08 5:32 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding First Omnibus Motion of the Chapter 7 Trustee for Entry of an Order Approving Settlements of Causes of Action Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 Related [+] Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Hall, Bryan)
Related: [-] 5
Monday, December 18, 2023
5 5 motion Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 - Motion Mon 12/18 4:22 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 // First Omnibus Motion of the Chapter 7 Trustee for Entry of an Order Approving Settlements of Causes of Action Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. Hearing scheduled for 1/17/2024 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 1/5/2024. (Hall, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 6 pgs Exhibit A - Anthology Settlement Agreement
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Lombard Group Settlement Agreement
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Pipit Settlement Agreement
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Quill Settlement Agreement
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Testout Settlement Agreement
Att: 6 Proposed Form of Order
Att: 7 Notice of Motion and Certificate of Service
Thursday, October 12, 2023
4 4 misc Exhibit Thu 10/12 11:05 AM
Exhibit(s) -- Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives -- Related [+] Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Hall, Bryan)
Related: [-] 1
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Thu 10/12 11:01 AM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Anthology, Inc. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 1/17/2024 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Hall, Bryan) Modified on 10/12/2023 as to text (LAM)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, October 06, 2023
2 2 crditcrd none Fri 10/06 2:36 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 23-50734 JTD] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number def, amount $ 350.00. (GM)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs cmp RETIRED - Complaint Fri 10/06 9:35 AM
Adversary case 23-50734 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 548, and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by Alfred T. Giuliano against Anthology, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hall, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Transfers