Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Philip P Simon
Referred: John E Martin
Case #: 3:23-cv-00895
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Oct 06, 2023
Terminated:Jan 18, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, January 18, 2024
12 12 misc Clerks Judgment Thu 01/18 1:23 PM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (jdb)
Related: [-]
11 11 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 01/18 1:20 PM
ORDER: This case is DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915A for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. The clerk is DIRECTED to close the case. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 01/18/2024. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (jdb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
10 10 6 pgs order Opinion and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 11/09 4:40 PM
OPINION AND ORDER: The Court DENIES Dr. Marandet's motions8 ;9 as unnecessary; GRANTS the plaintiff until 12/11/2023, to file an amended complaint; and CAUTIONS him that if he does file an amended complaint by the deadline, this case is subject to dismissal without further notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915A. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 11/09/2023. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (jdb)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
9 9 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 10/13 11:29 AM
MOTION to Screen Complaint by Defendant Marandet. (Rasey, Taylor)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Stay Fri 10/13 11:23 AM
MOTION to Stay Responsive Pleading Deadline and/or for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Defendant Marandet. (Rasey, Taylor)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/13 10:43 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alexis R Jenkins on behalf of Marandet (Jenkins, Alexis)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/13 10:35 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert C Brandt on behalf of Marandet (Brandt, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 10/10 10:29 AM
**NEW CASE** Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (nhc)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/06 1:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph A Panatera on behalf of Noe Marandet (Panatera, Joseph)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/06 1:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor L Rasey on behalf of Noe Marandet (Rasey, Taylor)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 10/06 1:43 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-5376201.) from Miami County Superior Court, Cause No. 52D02-2309-CT-000803, filed by Noe Marandet.(Rasey, Taylor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court Record,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - State Court Complaint,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet Exhibit C - Civil Cover Sheet
Thursday, October 05, 2023
5 5 misc Jury Demand Tue 10/10 10:54 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Marandet. Request for Trial by Jury filed in the Miami County Superior Court, Case No 52D02-2309-CT-000803. (nhc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
4 4 cmp State Court Complaint Tue 10/10 10:47 AM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Kensley, Marandet, Miami Correctional Facility, filed by William D. Wyatt, Jr. Complaint filed in the Miami County Superior Court, Case No 52D02-2309-CT-000803. (nhc)
Related: [-]