California Central District Court
Judge:John A Kronstadt
Referred: Alicia G Rosenberg
Case #: 2:13-cv-06004
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause28:1338 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Aug 15, 2013
Terminated:Dec 02, 2015
Case in other court:9th CCA, 15-56880 9th Circuit, 16-55089 Cross Appeal 9th Circuit, 16-55626
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 31, 2014 10:09 PM PST
Counter Claimant
Frankie Christian Gaye
Represented By
Richard S Busch
King And Ballow
contact info
Paul H Duvall
King And Ballow
contact info
Mark L Block
Wargo And French LLP
contact info
Counter Claimant
Marvin Gaye, III
Represented By
Paul H Duvall
King And Ballow
contact info
Paul N Philips
Paul N Philips Law Offices
contact info
Counter Claimant
Nona Marvisa Gaye
Represented By
Richard S Busch
King And Ballow
contact info
Paul H Duvall
King And Ballow
contact info
Mark L Block
Wargo And French LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Geffen Records
Represented By
Seth A Miller
King Holmes Paterno And Berliner
contact info
Stephen D Rothschild
King Holmes Paterno And Berliner LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
UMG Recordings
Represented By
Seth A Miller
King Holmes Paterno And Berliner
contact info
Stephen D Rothschild
King Holmes Paterno And Berliner LLP
contact info
Howard E King
King Holmes Paterno And Berliner LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Robin Thicke
Represented By
Seth A Miller
King Holmes Paterno And Berliner
contact info
Stephen D Rothschild
King Holmes Paterno And Berliner LLP
contact info
Howard E King
King Holmes Paterno And Berliner LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Star Trek Entertainment
Represented By
Seth A Miller
King Holmes Paterno And Berliner
contact info
Stephen D Rothschild
King Holmes Paterno And Berliner LLP
contact info
Howard E King
King Holmes Paterno And Berliner LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Universal Music Distribution
Represented By
Seth A Miller
King Holmes Paterno And Berliner
contact info
Stephen D Rothschild
King Holmes Paterno And Berliner LLP
contact info
Howard E King
King Holmes Paterno And Berliner LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Paula Maxine Patton
Represented By
Seth A Miller
King Holmes Paterno And Berliner
contact info
Stephen D Rothschild
King Holmes Paterno And Berliner LLP
contact info
Howard E King
King Holmes Paterno And Berliner LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
More Water From Nazareth Publishing Inc
Represented By
Seth A Miller
King Holmes Paterno And Berliner
contact info
Stephen D Rothschild
King Holmes Paterno And Berliner LLP
contact info
Howard E King
King Holmes Paterno And Berliner LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Pharrell Williams
Represented By
Seth A Miller
King Holmes Paterno And Berliner
contact info
Stephen D Rothschild
King Holmes Paterno And Berliner LLP
contact info
Howard E King
King Holmes Paterno And Berliner LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Interscope Records
Represented By
Seth A Miller
King Holmes Paterno And Berliner
contact info
Stephen D Rothschild
King Holmes Paterno And Berliner LLP
contact info
Howard E King
King Holmes Paterno And Berliner LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Clifford Harris, Jr
Represented By
Seth A Miller
King Holmes Paterno And Berliner
contact info
Stephen D Rothschild
King Holmes Paterno And Berliner LLP
contact info
Howard E King
King Holmes Paterno And Berliner LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Pharrelll Williams
Represented By
Seth A Miller
King Holmes Paterno And Berliner
contact info
Stephen D Rothschild
King Holmes Paterno And Berliner LLP
contact info
Howard E King
King Holmes Paterno And Berliner LLP
contact info
Defendant
Nona Marvisa Gaye
Represented By
Richard S Busch
King And Ballow
contact info
Paul H Duvall
King And Ballow
contact info
Mark L Block
Wargo And French LLP
contact info
Defendant
Marvin Gaye, III
Represented By
Paul H Duvall
King And Ballow
contact info
Paul N Philips
Paul N Philips Law Offices
contact info
Defendant
Frankie Christian Gaye
Represented By
Richard S Busch
King And Ballow
contact info
Paul H Duvall
King And Ballow
contact info
Mark L Block
Wargo And French LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Clifford Harris, Jr
Represented By
Seth A Miller
King Holmes Paterno And Berliner
contact info
Stephen D Rothschild
King Holmes Paterno And Berliner LLP
contact info
Howard E King
King Holmes Paterno And Berliner LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Pharrelll Williams
Represented By
Seth A Miller
King Holmes Paterno And Berliner
contact info
Stephen D Rothschild
King Holmes Paterno And Berliner LLP
contact info
Howard E King
King Holmes Paterno And Berliner LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Robin Thicke
Represented By
Seth A Miller
King Holmes Paterno And Berliner
contact info
Stephen D Rothschild
King Holmes Paterno And Berliner LLP
contact info
Howard E King
King Holmes Paterno And Berliner LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Bridgeport Music Inc
Terminated: 03/26/2014
ThirdParty Defendant
Sony/ATV Music Publishing Acquisition, Inc.
Terminated: 01/14/2014
Represented By
Michael J Niborski
Pryor Cashman LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
Jobete Music Co., Inc.
Terminated: 01/14/2014
Represented By
Michael J Niborski
Pryor Cashman LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
EMI April, Inc.
Terminated: 01/14/2014
Represented By
Michael J Niborski
Pryor Cashman LLP
contact info

Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, March 04, 2021
599 599 misc Mail Returned Tue 03/16 12:12 PM
Mail Returned Undeliverable addressed to Matthew Tyler Hale re Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail 597 . (jp)
Related: [-]
598 598 misc Mail Returned Tue 03/16 12:11 PM
Mail Returned Undeliverable addressed to Matthew Tyler Hale re (In Chambers) Order re Motion for Relief596 . (jp)
Related: [-]