New Jersey District Court
Judge:Susan D Wigenton
Referred: Jose R Almonte
Case #: 2:23-cv-20950
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal- Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Oct 06, 2023
Terminated:May 20, 2024
Case in other court:Union County Superior Court, UNN-L-02217-23
Last checked: Saturday Apr 06, 2024 5:46 AM EDT
Defendant
ABC CORPS.
Defendant
CHALLENGER LOGISTICS INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By
ELYSE TORMEY
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP
contact info
Defendant
JOHN DOES
Defendant
THE 1634 COMPANY, LLC
Defendant
BRIAN WATT
Notice Only
arbnwk
Plaintiff
MATHEW TRANSPORT LLC
Represented By
JARRID H. KANTOR
Antonelli Kantor, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, May 20, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Report and Recommendations Mon 05/20 4:20 PM
ORDER adopting9 Report and Recommendations as the conclusion of law of this Court; dismissing this matter. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 5/20/2024. (mxw, )
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Mon 05/20 4:28 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (mxw, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
9 9 motion Report and Recommendations Fri 04/05 4:15 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, re4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CHALLENGER LOGISTICS INTERNATIONAL, INC. Objections, if any, to R&R due by 4/18/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 4/4/2024. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
8 8 respm Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion Mon 11/27 5:57 PM
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by CHALLENGER LOGISTICS INTERNATIONAL, INC. re4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint(TORMEY, ELYSE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of James Peeples
Monday, November 20, 2023
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Mon 11/20 5:10 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by MATHEW TRANSPORT LLC.(KANTOR, JARRID)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Letter,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service Certification of Service
6 6 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Mon 11/20 4:56 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by MATHEW TRANSPORT LLC re4 MOTION to Dismiss (KANTOR, JARRID)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Letter,
Att: 2 Statement Statement of Facts,
Att: 3 Certification Certification of Daniel Jordan,
Att: 4 Certificate of Service Certification of Service
Monday, October 30, 2023
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 10/30 11:24 AM
Set Deadlines as to4 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 12/4/2023 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mxw, )
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
4 4 motion Dismiss Fri 10/27 4:03 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by CHALLENGER LOGISTICS INTERNATIONAL, INC..(TORMEY, ELYSE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law,
Att: 2 Certification of Elyse S. Tormey, Esq.,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 6 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Wed 10/18 3:17 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHALLENGER LOGISTICS INTERNATIONAL, INC. identifying Challenger Investments II, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (TORMEY, ELYSE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Thu 10/12 10:29 AM
Clerk`s Text Order - The2 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by CHALLENGER LOGISTICS INTERNATIONAL, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/27/2023. (mxw, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
2 2 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Wed 10/11 2:43 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Def. Challenger Logistics Int'l Inc.. Attorney ELYSE TORMEY for CHALLENGER LOGISTICS INTERNATIONAL, INC. added. (TORMEY, ELYSE)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 10/06 1:20 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Challenger Logistics International, Inc. from Union County Superior Court, case number UNN-2217-23. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14770096), filed by Challenger Logistics International, Inc..(TORMEY, ELYSE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exh A,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exh B,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exh C
qc QC - Attorney Case Opening Fri 10/06 7:23 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information - Parties are to be entered in all capital letters . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jr)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 10/06 7:25 PM
Case assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte. (jr)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Arbitration Fri 10/06 7:26 PM
CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jr)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Lack of Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 10/06 7:32 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party or intervenor. Please refer to the Court's website at[LINK:www.njd.uscourts.gov] for a form and filing instructions. (jr)
Related: [-]