Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Mark G Mastroianni
Case #: 3:23-cv-30104
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1442 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Oct 06, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Apr 06, 2024 5:37 AM EDT
Defendant
Bayer AG
Defendant
General Electric Company
Represented By
Michelle M. Byers
Campbell, Conroy & O'Neil PC
contact info
James M. Campbell
Campbell Conroy & O'Neil, P.C.
contact info
Christopher B. Parkerson
Campbell Conroy & O'Neil, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Monsanto Company
Defendant
Pharmacia LLC
Represented By
Brandon L. Arber
Shook, Hardy & Bacon, LLP
contact info
Stephen I. Hansen
Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP
contact info
Richard L. Campbell
Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP
contact info
Defendant
SABIC Innovative Plastics US LLC
Defendant
Sabic Innovative Plastics Global Technologies L.P.
Represented By
Michelle M. Byers
Campbell, Conroy & O'Neil PC
contact info
James M. Campbell
Campbell Conroy & O'Neil, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Sabic Innovative Plastics Technologies, Inc.
Defendant
Saudi Basic Industries Corp. (SABIC)
Defendant
Solutia Inc.
Represented By
Brandon L. Arber
Shook, Hardy & Bacon, LLP
contact info
Stephen I. Hansen
Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP
contact info
Richard L. Campbell
Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP
contact info
Defendant
GE Plastics
Plaintiff
Diane Romero
Represented By
Thomas Bosworth
Bosworth Law
contact info
John B. Stewart
John B. Stewart, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
46 46 order Order on Motion to Substitute Party Wed 03/05 2:40 PM
Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting44 Motion to Substitute Party. (TRL)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
45 45 respm Response to Motion Fri 02/28 4:08 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re44 MOTION to Substitute Party RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF PARTY BY DEFENDANTS GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, SABIC INNOVATIVE PLASTICS GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES LP, SOLUTIA INC., AND PHARMACIA LLC filed by Sabic Innovative Plastics Global Technologies L.P., General Electric Company, Solutia Inc., Pharmacia LLC.(Byers, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 January 24, 2025 Email from S. Hansen to T. Bosworth and J. Stewart
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
44 44 motion Substitute Party Tue 02/25 3:04 PM
MOTION to Substitute Party by Diane Romero.(Bosworth, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
43 43 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Wed 02/12 2:29 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Brandon L. Arber (Arber, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
42 42 misc Suggestion of Death Fri 01/31 12:43 PM
SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Plaintiff, Diane Romero by Diane Romero. (Bosworth, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
41 41 order Order Thu 01/16 3:59 PM
Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: Electronic order entered. The court is in receipt of a letter from Plaintiff's counsel (Dkt. No. 40) reporting that the Estate of Diane Romero has been opened and approved by the probate court and substitution of the Estate for Plaintiff in this action will occur as soon as practicable. Accordingly, the court lifts the stay for the limited purpose of permitting the substitution of the named plaintiff. However, the stay otherwise remains in effect pending the court's ruling on the motion to remand in Czerno v. General Electric Co., 23-cv-30099.(TF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
40 40 misc Letter/request - non-motion Wed 01/15 5:18 PM
Letter/request (non-motion) from Thomas Bosworth, Esquire . (Bosworth, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
39 39 misc Status Report Tue 10/01 3:34 PM
STATUS REPORT re Estate by Diane Romero. (Bosworth, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
38 38 order Order Thu 09/26 11:13 AM
Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. On June 6, 2024, Plaintiff's counsel filed a status report stating that "[t]he family members of plaintiff, Diane Romero, who has died, have retained an estate lawyer who they are currently working [with] to finalize the probate of Diane Romero's estate," and "[i]t is expected, within approximately thirty... days, there will be a personal representative of the Estate of Diane Romero formally appointed." (Dkt. No. 37.) However, no further updates or action have occurred. The court will therefore stay this action, as it has the other 7 related actions (23-cv-30102, 23-cv-30103, 23-cv-30105, 23-cv-30106, 23-cv-30107, 23-cv-30108, and 23-cv-30109), which are awaiting a ruling on a motion to remand in Czerno v. General Electric Co., 23-cv-30099. Plaintiff's counsel shall file another status report by October 10, 2024, updating the court as to Plaintiff's estate and whether a personal representative has been appointed. (TF)
Related: [-]
order ~Util - Case Stayed Thu 09/26 11:16 AM
Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ORDER entered. Case stayed. (TF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
37 37 misc Status Report Thu 06/06 9:40 AM
STATUS REPORT by Diane Romero. (Bosworth, Thomas)
Related: [-]
36 36 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/06 9:36 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Edward Bosworth on behalf of Diane Romero (Bosworth, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
35 35 misc Status Report Wed 06/05 4:37 PM
STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT OF DEFENDANTS GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, SABIC INNOVATIVE PLASTICS GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES, LP, SOLUTIA INC., AND PHARMACIA LLC by General Electric Company, Pharmacia LLC, Sabic Innovative Plastics Global Technologies L.P., Solutia Inc..(Byers, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Email
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
34 34 order Order Wed 05/22 1:56 PM
Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. On February 12, 2024, Defendant SABIC filed a motion to stay the time period for it to respond to Plaintiff's complaint until the resolution of the plaintiff's motion to remand in Czerno v. General Electric Co., 23-cv-30099. SABIC represented in the motion to stay that Plaintiff, Ms. Romero, passed away in December of 2023 and that "a personal representative, on whose behalf plaintiff's counsel would have authority to act, has not yet been appointed." (Dkt. No. 32 at 2; see also King v. General Electric Co., 23-cv-30102, Dkt. No. 33 at 2 n.1 (explaining the parties would have preferred to include the Romero action in the joint motion to stay seven related cases but could not do so because a personal representative has not yet been appointed).) No further updates have been provided to the court regarding the appointment of a personal representative. Accordingly, the parties shall investigate this matter, confer, and file a joint status report, by no later than June 5, 2024, updating the court as to whether a personal representative has been appointed; if not, when that can be expected; and providing any other information pertinent this issue. (Lendon, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
33 33 order Order on Motion to Stay Tue 02/13 4:00 PM
Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting32 MOTION to Stay Time to Respond to Complaint by Sabic Innovative Plastics Global Technologies L.P.. (Figueroa, Tamara)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
32 32 motion Stay Mon 02/12 12:58 PM
MOTION to Stay Time to Respond to Complaint by Sabic Innovative Plastics Global Technologies L.P..(Byers, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
31 31 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Fri 01/19 1:37 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Richard L. Campbell (Campbell, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
30 30 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 12/28 4:02 PM
Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting27 Motion for Extension of Time to February 10, 2024. (Figueroa, Tamara)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
29 29 notice Notice of Filing of Official Transcript Wed 12/27 3:54 PM
NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at[LINK:https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/transcripts.htm] Associated Cases: 3:23-cv-30099-MGM et al.(McDonagh, Christina)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Transcript Wed 12/27 3:53 PM
Transcript of Motion Hearing held on December 15, 2023, before Judge Mark G. Mastroianni. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Leigh Gershowitz at Leigh_Gershowitz@mad.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 1/17/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/29/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/26/2024. Associated Cases: 3:23-cv-30099-MGM et al.(McDonagh, Christina)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Extension of Time Wed 12/27 3:00 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to February 10, 2024 to Respond to Complaint Third Assented-to Motion to Enlarge Time to Respond to Complaint by Sabic Innovative Plastics Global Technologies L.P..(Byers, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
26 26 minutes Motion Hearing Fri 12/15 4:37 PM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: Counsel appear for Motion Hearing held on 12/15/2023 re MOTIONS for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Thomas Bosworth (29 in 3:23-cv-30099-MGM, 21 in 3:23-cv-30102-MGM, 20 in 3:23-cv-30109-MGM, 20 in 3:23-cv-30107-MGM, 21 in 3:23-cv-30108-MGM, 18 in 3:23-cv-30103-MGM, 20 in 3:23-cv-30104-MGM, 19 in 3:23-cv-30106-MGM, 20 in 3:23-cv-30105-MGM). Colloquy re: pending motions. Defendants indicate they take no position on the motions. Court takes matter under advisement with order to issue. (Court Reporter: Leigh Gershowitz at Leigh_Gershowitz@mad.uscourts.gov.)(Attorneys present: Stewart, Bosworth, Hanson, Byers) Associated Cases: 3:23-cv-30099-MGM et al.(Healy, Bethaney)
Related: [-]
25 25 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Fri 12/15 3:34 PM
Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Thomas Bosworth. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number under ADDITIONAL FILER INFORMATION on your form when registering or it will be rejected. Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions [LINK:https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm] . A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Figueroa, Tamara)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
24 24 notice Notice Setting or Resetting Hearing on Motion Mon 12/11 12:45 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion:20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Thomas Bosworth Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10145374 : Motion Hearing set for 12/15/2023 at 12:00 PM in Hampden Courtroom (In person only) before Judge Mark G. Mastroianni. ***Only Attorney Stewart is required to attend the hearing, but opposing Counsel may attend the hearing if they desire*** (Rivera, Christina)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
23 23 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 12/05 11:05 AM
Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting19 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document; granting21 Motion for Extension of Time to December 27, 2023 to File Responsive Pleading. (Figueroa, Tamara)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
22 22 notice Notice of Reassignment Thu 11/30 4:29 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment pursuant to Local Rule 40.1. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni added. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman no longer assigned to case. (Healy, Bethaney)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
21 21 motion Extension of Time Wed 11/22 4:33 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to December 27, 2023 to File Responsive Pleading SECOND ASSENTED-TO MOTION OF DEFENDANT SABIC INNOVATIVE PLASTICS GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES LP TO ENLARGE TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Sabic Innovative Plastics Global Technologies L.P..(Campbell, James)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 11/22 3:08 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Thomas Bosworth Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10145374 by Diane Romero.(Stewart, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Certification of Thos. Bosworth
19 19 motion File Excess Pages Wed 11/22 10:08 AM
Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Motion to Remand Memorandum by Diane Romero.(Stewart, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
18 18 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 11/06 7:28 AM
District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting16 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 14 days or Ruling on Pltff's Motion to Remand to File Response/Reply as to8 Memorandum in Support of Motion,7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to Counts II, III, IV, V, VII. (Burgos, Sandra)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 11/06 7:27 AM
District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting15 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to November 27, 2023 to File Answer. Sabic Innovative Plastics Global Technologies L.P. answer due 11/27/2023. (Burgos, Sandra)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
16 16 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 11/03 3:15 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 14 days or Ruling on Pltff's Motion to Remand to File Response/Reply as to8 Memorandum in Support of Motion,7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to Counts II, III, IV, V, VIII, XII, XIII, and XV by Diane Romero.(Stewart, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 10/27 6:13 AM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to November 27, 2023 to File Answer ASSENTED-TO MOTION OF DEFENDANT SABIC INNOVATIVE PLASTICS GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES LP TO ENLARGE TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Sabic Innovative Plastics Global Technologies L.P..(Campbell, James)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/27 6:11 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Campbell on behalf of Sabic Innovative Plastics Global Technologies L.P. (Campbell, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
13 13 misc State Court Record - no answer filed in state court Wed 10/18 3:22 PM
STATE COURT Record. (Campbell, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/13 4:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon L. Arber on behalf of Pharmacia LLC, Solutia Inc. (Arber, Brandon)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/13 4:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Richard L. Campbell on behalf of Pharmacia LLC, Solutia Inc. (Campbell, Richard)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 10/13 3:23 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Solutia Inc.. (Hansen, Stephen)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 10/13 3:22 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pharmacia LLC. (Hansen, Stephen)
Related: [-]
8 8 18 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 10/13 3:21 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to Counts II, III, IV, V, VIII, XII, XIII, and XV filed by Pharmacia LLC, Solutia Inc.. (Hansen, Stephen)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 10/13 3:19 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to Counts II, III, IV, V, VIII, XII, XIII, and XV by Pharmacia LLC, Solutia Inc..(Hansen, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
6 6 notice Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel Tue 10/10 5:01 PM
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Barrows, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Case Assignment Tue 10/10 10:32 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Cook, Savannah)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/06 3:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle M. Byers on behalf of General Electric Company (Byers, Michelle)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/06 3:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher B. Parkerson on behalf of General Electric Company (Parkerson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 10/06 3:31 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by General Electric Company. (Campbell, James)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 10/06 3:28 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by General Electric Company ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-10074374 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid)(Campbell, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Consent Decree,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Romero Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - 1972.04.18 GE Memo re Sole Supplier of Pyranol,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - 1972.05.00 - Report of Interdepartmental Task Force on PCBs,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Monsanto Request to The Secretary of War May 1941,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - 1994 General Accounting Office Report,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - Navy Letter to GE 3 26-1974
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - The Role of PCBs in Electrical Equipment,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 - Cleanup Agreements for the GE-Pittsfield_Housatonic River Site _ US EPA,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 - State Court NOR,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11 - Ltr with req from Maj. Washburn 03.08.1940,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12 - Teletype dated 11.17.1942,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13 - Req from Cpt. Byrnes re Three Pyranol Transformers,
Att: 14 Exhibit 14 - NAD Hawthorne to BuOrd re Transformer Procurement,
Att: 15 Exhibit 15 - Authorizations of War Manu Facilities Authorized thru Dec 1944 Vol. 1,
Att: 16 Exhibit 16 - List of Major War Supply Contracts,
Att: 17 Exhibit 17 - 1942 09 01 Application for Certificate of Necessity WD-N-12184,
Att: 18 Exhibit 18 - 1943 07 09 Application for Certificate of Necessity WD-N-24058,
Att: 19 Exhibit 19 - 2016.00.00 - Joint Base Myer PCB Action Plan,
Att: 20 Exhibit 20 - Memo from Dobson to JAG 06-26-87,
Att: 21 Exhibit 21 - 1976.08.26 - Monsanto memo re GE askarels are called Pyranol,
Att: 22 Exhibit 22 - 1973.09.10 - Monsanto Bulletin re GE Pyranol,
Att: 23 Exhibit 23 - 1952.10.00 - GE Pyranol Instructions,
Att: 24 Exhibit 24 - 1972.01.12 - Sales Report re Pyranol Customers incl. U.S. Government,
Att: 25 Exhibit 25 - 1971.12.17 - Monsanto Invoice to Navy for GE Pyranol,
Att: 26 Exhibit 26 - 1972.02.07 - Navy Purchase Order for GE Pyranol,
Att: 27 Exhibit 27 - LF Gossage to Peltosalo 02 08-1972
Att: 28 Exhibit 28 - Final Summary Report,
Att: 29 Exhibit 29 - PCBs in Transit System,
Att: 30 Exhibit 30 - Industry Views on the Use of PCBs,
Att: 31 Exhibit 31 - 1971-NEC-National Electrical Code,
Att: 32 Exhibit 32 - Excerpt of Hrg Transc - Statement of G. Scheweitzer,
Att: 33 Exhibit 33 - LF Barney to Sommer,
Att: 34 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 35 Category Form Category Form