Maryland District Court
Judge:James K Bredar
Case #: 1:23-cv-02716
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Oct 06, 2023
Terminated:Mar 24, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 07, 2024 2:45 PM EDT
Defendant
Solar Energy World LLC
Represented By
Gabriel Pinilla
Adams And Reese, LLP
contact info
Andrew Charles Wilson
Adams And Reese LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sherry Goode
on behalf of herself and others similarly situated 2160 Batten Road
Brooksville, FL 34602
Represented By
John Thomas McGowan, Jr
Kinner & Mcgowan PLLC
contact info
Anthony I Paronich
Paronich Law PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
49 49 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 05/06 2:08 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Sherry Goode(Paronich, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
48 48 order Settlement Order Mon 03/24 10:37 AM
ORDER DISMISSING case with each party to bear its own costs unless otherwise agreed without prejudice to the right of a party to move for good cause to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Judge James K Bredar on 3/21/2025. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
47 47 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 03/17 9:50 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Sherry Goode (Paronich, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
46 46 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 02/28 8:49 AM
Marginal ORDER GRANTING45 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re44 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Signed by Judge James K Bredar on 2/27/2025. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
45 45 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 02/26 10:31 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to44 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Sherry Goode(Paronich, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
44 44 motion Summary Judgment Tue 02/25 6:20 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Solar Energy World LLC(Pinilla, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support Solar Energy World, LLC's Memorandum of Law In Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment,
Att: 2 Exhibit Solar Energy World, LLC's Memorandum of Law In Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment - Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit Declaration of Peter Belman In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment - Composite Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit Declaration of Peter Belman In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment - Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Exhibit Declaration of Peter Belman In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment - Exhibit C,
Att: 6 Exhibit Declaration of Peter Belman In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment - Exhibit D,
Att: 7 Exhibit Solar Energy World, LLC's Memorandum of Law In Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment - Exhibit 2,
Att: 8 Exhibit Solar Energy World, LLC's Memorandum of Law In Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment - Exhibit 3,
Att: 9 Text of Proposed Order Summary Final Judgment of Dismissal With Prejudice
Thursday, February 13, 2025
43 43 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 02/13 2:14 PM
ORDER GRANTING40 Motion for Extension of Dispositive Motions Deadline. Signed by Judge James K Bredar on 2/13/2025. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
42 42 notice Notice (Other) Wed 02/12 5:56 PM
NOTICE by Solar Energy World LLC re40 MOTION for Extension of Time of Dispositive Motions Deadline Proposed Order (Pinilla, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
41 41 notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Wed 02/12 4:44 PM
QC NOTICE:40 Motion for Extension of Time filed by Solar Energy World LLC was filed incorrectly. **Pursuant to Local Rule 105.1, a proposed order should accompany any motion. Please file the proposed order under the "Notices" category, select the "Notice (Other)" event, and link filing to 40 Motion. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
40 40 motion Extension of Time Wed 02/12 3:20 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time of Dispositive Motions Deadline by Solar Energy World LLC(Pinilla, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
39 39 2 pgs order Order Wed 11/13 9:17 AM
Marginal ORDER GRANTING38 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge James K Bredar on 11/12/2024. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
38 38 misc Status Report Fri 11/08 3:27 PM
STATUS REPORT and Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Solar Energy World LLC(Pinilla, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
37 37 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 10/08 11:34 AM
Marginal ORDER GRANTING36 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge James K Bredar on 10/8/2024. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
36 36 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 10/04 4:20 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Joint Status Report by Solar Energy World LLC(Pinilla, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
35 35 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 08/13 2:30 PM
Marginal ORDER APPROVING34 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; Status Report due 10/4/2024. Signed by Senior District Judge James K Bredar on 8/13/2024. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
34 34 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 08/13 10:41 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Solar Energy World LLC(Pinilla, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
order Order on Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/23 2:22 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting32 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Dana J. Oliver. Directing attorney Dana J. Oliver to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 5/23/2024. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
32 32 motion Pro Hac Vice - Corrected Wed 05/22 10:18 AM
CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Dana Oliver by Sherry Goode. The fee has already been paid.(McGowan, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
31 31 notice QC Notice - Pro Hac - Signatures Wed 05/15 1:56 PM
QC NOTICE:30 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Sherry Goode needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
30 30 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 05/15 12:41 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Dana Oliver (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11263101.) by Sherry Goode(McGowan, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Cert. of Good Standing
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
29 29 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 04/18 9:00 AM
MARGINAL ORDER granting28 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 4/17/2024. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 04/17 10:17 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Sherry Goode(Paronich, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
27 27 order Protective/Confidentiality Order Mon 03/18 2:25 PM
PROTECTIVE/CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 3/18/2024. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
26 26 misc Stipulation Mon 03/11 1:30 PM
STIPULATION Order Regarding Confidentiality of Discovery Material Pursuant to Local Rule 104.14 by Solar Energy World LLC(Pinilla, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
25 25 order Scheduling Order Fri 01/26 3:18 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 5/16/2024. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 1/26/2024. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
minutes Scheduling Conference Fri 01/26 12:51 PM
Telephone Conference re:Scheduling held on 1/26/2024 before Chief Judge James K. Bredar. (jks, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 1/26/2024 (jks, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
order Order Tue 01/16 9:38 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER. The TELEPHONE CONFERENCE scheduled for today, January 16, is RESCHEDULED to January 26, 2024 at 11:00am. Counsel for the Plaintiff is directed to arrange for and distribute conference call information to the parties and Judge Bredar's chambers. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 1/16/2024. (lags, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
23 23 corresp Status Report Submitted Thu 01/11 11:42 AM
Status Report Submitted Letter Regarding Scheduling Report by Sherry Goode (Paronich, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
22 22 corresp Miscellaneous Thu 12/21 3:40 PM
Correspondence re: Proposed Scheduling Order(vdcs, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Scheduling Order
21 21 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 12/21 12:30 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Solar Energy World LLC.(Pinilla, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 12/08 10:55 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Andrew Wilson. Directing attorney Andrew Wilson to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 12/8/2023. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
19 19 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 12/06 6:59 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Andrew Wilson (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10971386.) by Solar Energy World LLC(Pinilla, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 11/13 3:47 PM
ORDER granting17 MOTION for Extension of Time. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 11/13/2023. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
17 17 motion Extension of Time Thu 11/09 6:58 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time by Solar Energy World LLC(Pinilla, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Order
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
16 16 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Wed 11/08 6:38 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Solar Energy World LLC (Pinilla, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 11/08 5:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Gabriel Pinilla on behalf of Solar Energy World LLC (Pinilla, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
12 12 order 25 Pct Mag - Order to Show Cause Wed 10/25 8:29 AM
ORDER directing Sherry Goode to show cause for failure to comply with[LINK:Standing Order 2019-07] . Show Cause Hearing set for 12/1/2023 02:00 PM in (proceed to the Clerk's Office to determine the location of the hearing) before the Chambers Judge. This Order shall be vacated if Sherry Goode files a consent or declination prior to the show cause hearing date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Adam B. Abelson on 10/25/2023. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
order 25 Pct Mag - Order Cancelling Show Cause Hearing Wed 10/25 9:24 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER CANCELLING Show Cause Hearing re:12 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Adam B. Abelson on 10/25/2023. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 10/25 9:37 AM
Case Reassigned to Chief Judge James K. Bredar. Magistrate Judge Adam B. Abelson no longer assigned to the case. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
order Order on Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 10/24 11:11 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting10 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Anthony I Paronich. Directing attorney Anthony I Paronich to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 10/24/2023. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
10 10 motion Pro Hac Vice - Corrected Mon 10/23 2:28 PM
CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Anthony Paronich by Sherry Goode. The fee has already been paid.(McGowan, John)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 10/23 2:17 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sherry Goode. Solar Energy World LLC served on 10/20/2023, answer due 11/13/2023.(Paronich, Anthony)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice QC Notice - Pro Hac - Missing/Incomplete Info Mon 10/23 11:29 AM
QC NOTICE:7 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Sherry Goode needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding missing or incomplete information. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
7 7 motion Pro Hac Vice - Corrected Wed 10/18 5:22 PM
CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Anthony Paronich by Sherry Goode. The fee has already been paid.(McGowan, John)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice QC Notice - Pro Hac - Signatures Wed 10/18 10:06 AM
QC NOTICE:5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Sherry Goode needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 14, 2023
5 5 motion Pro Hac Vice Sat 10/14 1:03 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Anthony Paronich (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10868384.) by Sherry Goode(McGowan, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 10/10 12:39 PM
Summons Issued 21 days as to Sherry Goode. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
3 3 order 25 Pct Mag - Case Management Order Tue 10/10 11:07 AM
Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Adam B. Abelson on 10/10/2023. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
notice 25 Pct Mag - Notice of Case Assignment to a Magistrate Judge Tue 10/10 11:06 AM
NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Adam B. Abelson. Sherry Goode or counsel for Sherry Goode are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Procedures which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] , counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 10/24/2023. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 10/06 2:54 PM
COMPLAINT against Sherry Goode ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BMDDC-10857863.), filed by Sherry Goode.(McGowan, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Proposed Summons
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 10/06 3:35 PM
Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Adam B. Abelson. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]