District Of Columbia District Court
Case #: 1:23-cv-02865
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 25, 2023
Terminated:Nov 17, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Mar 23, 2024 4:29 AM EDT
Defendant
UNKNOWN MEDICAL PERSONEL
Defendant
KATHY TORRES-STAHL
Defendant
U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE
Defendant
UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Defendant
UNITED STATES MARSHAL SERVICE
Defendant
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant
UNKNOWN DEPUTY U.S. MARSHAL
Defendant
UNKNOWN DETECTIVE
Defendant
UNKNOWN DOCTOR
Defendant
UNKNOWN FACILITY ADMINISTRATOR
Defendant
UNKNOWN GANG INTELLIGENCE OFFICER
Defendant
UNKNOWN JUDICIAL DISTRICT JUDGE
Defendant
UNKNOWN MAGISTRATE JUDGE
Defendant
IVY TAYLOR
Defendant
UNKNOWN PRIVATE JAIL EMPLOYEE
Defendant
UNKNOWN PROBATION SUPERVISOR
Defendant
UNKNOWN PROSECUTER
Defendant
UNKNOWN S.A.P.D. OFFICER
Defendant
UNKNOWN S.R.P.D. OFFICER
Defendant
UNKNOWN S.R.P.D. SUPERVISOR
Defendant
UNKNOWN SUPERVISOR
Defendant
UNKNOWN SWAT OFFICER
Defendant
UNKNOWN SWAT SUPERVISOR
Defendant
UNKNOWN TEXAS ATTORNEY GENERAL EMPLOYEE
Defendant
UNKNOWN WARDEN
Defendant
GARZA
Defendant
ROBERT ALMONTE
Defendant
BEXAR COUNTY ADULT PROBATION OFFICE
Defendant
BEXAR COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE
Defendant
BEXAR COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE
Defendant
BIDEN ADMINISTRATION
Defendant
BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES
Defendant
JULIAN CASTRO
Defendant
DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION
950 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20530
Defendant
WILLIE DRUMMER
Defendant
FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Defendant
MANUEL FERNANDEZ
Defendant
GARCIA
Defendant
J. ALLEN
Defendant
ARMANDO HERNANDEZ
Defendant
TERRY JONES
Defendant
WILLIAM MCMANESS
Defendant
AMADEO ORTIZ
Defendant
CHARLIE PARKER
Defendant
CRISANTO PEREZ
Defendant
ROBERT PITMAN
Defendant
SUSAN REED
Defendant
SAN ANTONIO POLICE DEPARTMENT GANG UNIT
Defendant
NICK STROMBOE
Plaintiff
EMMANUEL ANTIONE HEMPHILL
R#793342 BEXAR COUNTY ADULT DETENTION CENTER 200 N. Comal St.
San Antonio, TX 78207

GPO Nov 17 2023
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 11/17/2023. (zrtw)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.