Maryland District Court
Judge:Lydia Kay Griggsby
Case #: 1:23-cv-02711
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983bv Bivens Non-Prisoner
Case Filed:Oct 06, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Apr 07, 2024 2:46 PM EDT
Defendant
Board of Elections Supervisors
Represented By
Kerry Berger
City Of Annapolis
contact info
Defendant
Robert Jones Jr.
Represented By
John Coleman Karpinski
Karpinski, Cornbrooks, & Karp, P.A.
contact info
Kevin Bock Karpinski
Karpinski, Cornbrooks & Karp, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Robert Joseph Ray
Represented By
Philip E Culpepper
Anne Arundel County Office Of Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Terance Albert Tracy
180 Woods Drive
Annapolis, MD 21403


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
22 22 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 02/14 9:40 AM
REPLY to Response (Petitioner's Response to Defendant's Opposition to Request for Default) filed by Terance Albert Tracy.(mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
notice EDSS Consent to Receive Electronic Notice Wed 02/14 9:42 AM
Documents submitted via EDSS. Terance Albert Tracy consents to receive notice and service electronically. The Court recommends that all documents received electronically be printed or saved for future reference. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
21 21 respm Response Fri 01/26 1:08 PM
RESPONSE re20 Miscellaneous Correspondence Opposition to Request for Default filed by Board of Elections Supervisors, Robert Jones Jr., Robert Joseph Ray.(Culpepper, Philip)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
20 20 corresp Miscellaneous Thu 01/25 12:21 PM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Terance A Tracy(mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Letter,
Att: 2 Envelope
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/09 8:10 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by John Coleman Karpinski on behalf of Robert Jones Jr. (Karpinski, John)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/09 8:08 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Bock Karpinski on behalf of Robert Jones Jr. (Karpinski, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Mon 11/20 12:26 PM
NOTICE by Board of Elections Supervisors re1 Complaint, and 7 Case Management Order (Berger, Kerry)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/20 12:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kerry Berger on behalf of Board of Elections Supervisors (Berger, Kerry)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Mon 11/20 9:23 AM
NOTICE by Robert Jones Jr., Robert Joseph Ray re1 Complaint,7 Case Management Order Notice of Intent to File Motions (Culpepper, Philip)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/20 9:18 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Philip E Culpepper on behalf of Robert Joseph Ray (Culpepper, Philip)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 10, 2023
13 13 service Certificate of Service Mon 11/13 9:33 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Case Management Order to City of Annapolis Board of Elections Supervisors by Terance Albert Tracy. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Certificate of Service Mon 11/13 9:31 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Case Management Order to Robert Jones Jr. by Terance Albert Tracy. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Certificate of Service Mon 11/13 9:30 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Case Management Order to Robert Joseph Ray by Terance Albert Tracy. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Certificate of Service Mon 11/13 9:28 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Case Management Order to AA County Board of Elections Supervisors by Terance Albert Tracy. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 11/08 2:01 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Robert Joseph Ray served on 10/31/2023, answer due 11/21/2023.(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 11/07 4:03 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
7 7 order Case Management Order Fri 10/20 3:54 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 10/20/2023. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Fri 10/20 11:41 AM
Summons Issued 21 days as to Board of Elections Supervisors, Robert Jones Jr., Robert Joseph Ray.(c/em USMS 10/20/2023 - mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
5 5 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 10/19 2:53 PM
ORDER granting3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting Plaintiff 21 days from the date of this Order to complete U.S. Marshal forms and return them to the Clerk; upon receipt the Clerk shall issue summons and forward to USMS to effectuate service. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 10/18/2023. (c/m as directed 10/19/2023 - mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
4 4 misc New Case Notification Letter Fri 10/06 4:44 PM
New Case Notification Letter sent to Terance Albert Tracy. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 10/06 4:42 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Terance Albert Tracy(mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Consent to Receive Electronic Notice Fri 10/06 4:42 PM
Consent to receive notice and service electronically by Terance Albert Tracy. The Court recommends that all documents received electronically be printed or saved for future reference.(mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 10/06 4:41 PM
COMPLAINT against Board of Elections Supervisors, Robert Jones Jr., Robert Joseph Ray, filed by Terance Albert Tracy.(mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3,
Att: 6 Exhibit 4,
Att: 7 Exhibit 5,
Att: 8 Exhibit 6,
Att: 9 Exhibit 7,
Att: 10 Exhibit 8,
Att: 11 Exhibit 9