North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:Terrence W Boyle
Referred: Robert T Numbers, II
Case #: 5:23-cv-00562
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Oct 09, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Apr 06, 2024 6:06 AM EDT
Defendant
Speedway (North Carolina) LLC
Represented By
Kevin Michael Ceglowski
Smith Anderson Law Firm
contact info
David Ransom Ortiz
Smith, Anderson, Blount, Dorsett, Mitchell & Jernigan, LLP
contact info
Mediator
Kenneth P. Carlson, Jr.
100 N. Cherry Street, Suite 300 Suite 300
Winston-Salem, NC 27101
Plaintiff
William Ronnie Adams, II
Represented By
David J. Martin
David J. Martin PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
18 18 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 10/02 5:41 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by William Ronnie Adams, II (Martin, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Thu 04/18 2:14 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney David Ransom Ortiz terminated. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 4/18/2024. (Stouch, L.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
16 16 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 04/17 12:15 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Speedway (North Carolina) LLC. (Ortiz, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
utility Motion Submitted Wed 04/17 3:49 PM
Motion Submitted to District Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding16 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. (Stouch, L.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order Appointing Mediator Wed 02/21 12:17 PM
ORDER Appointing Mediator Kenneth P. Carlson, Jr. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 2/21/2024. Sent to Kenneth P. Carlson, Jr. at Constangy, Brooks, Smith, & Prophete, LLP One West Street, Suite 850 Winston-Salem, NC 27101 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
14 14 misc Amended Document (NOT Motion) Tue 02/20 4:11 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Speedway (North Carolina) LLC. Amendment to13 Selection of Mediator (Ceglowski, Kevin)
Related: [-]
13 13 adr Selection of Mediator Tue 02/20 10:27 AM
Selection of Kenneth P. Carlson, Jr. as mediator filed by Speedway (North Carolina) LLC. (Ceglowski, Kevin)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Counsel Tue 02/20 3:52 PM
Notice to Counsel regarding:13 Selection of Mediator. The Selection of Mediator does not indicate that the mediator has been served with the document as required by Local Civil Rule 101.1c(a). Counsel is directed to file an Amended Selection of Mediator that complies with the rule. (Stouch, L.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
12 12 order Scheduling Order Tue 01/30 12:55 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER : Discovery due by 7/5/2024. Motions due by 8/5/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 1/29/2024. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. (Stouch, L.)
Related: [-]
adr Notice to Counsel - Selection of Mediator Tue 01/30 12:57 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL - Pursuant to Local ADR Rule 101.1c(a), counsel is reminded that the parties must file a written statement identifying an agreed upon mediator within twenty one (21) days of the entry of the Scheduling Order. If a statement is not timely filed, the Clerk of Court will appoint a mediator from the list of court certified mediators. Selection of Mediator must be electronically filed on or before 2/20/2024. (Stouch, L.)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
utility Remark Fri 01/26 10:01 AM
Remark -11 Rule 26(f) Report referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II for the entry of a scheduling order. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
11 11 discov Rule 26(f) Report (joint) Mon 01/22 3:29 PM
Rule 26(f) Report (joint) filed by Speedway (North Carolina) LLC. (Ceglowski, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
10 10 1 pgs discov Order for Discovery Plan Mon 12/11 8:54 AM
ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 12/11/2023. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
utility Case Selected for Mediation Mon 12/11 8:52 AM
Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/05 8:11 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by David Ransom Ortiz on behalf of Speedway (North Carolina) LLC. (Ortiz, David)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Tue 12/05 8:10 AM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Speedway (North Carolina) LLC identifying Corporate Parent 7-Eleven, Inc., Corporate Parent SEJ Asset Management & Investment Company, Corporate Parent Seven-Eleven Japan Co., Ltd., Corporate Parent Seven & i Holdings Co., Ltd. for Speedway (North Carolina) LLC. (Ceglowski, Kevin)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 12/05 8:07 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Speedway (North Carolina) LLC. (Ceglowski, Kevin)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/05 8:05 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Kevin Michael Ceglowski on behalf of Speedway (North Carolina) LLC. (Ceglowski, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 10/16 9:07 AM
Summons Issued as to Speedway (North Carolina) LLC. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
4 4 notice Notice-other Thu 10/12 3:22 PM
Notice filed by William Ronnie Adams, II . (Martin, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
notice Notice of Deficiency Wed 10/11 2:27 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding [1-2] Proposed Summons. Counsel has failed to complete the proposed summons. Counsel should complete the summons and refile using the event "Notice-Other". (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Counsel Wed 10/11 2:29 PM
Notice to Counsel regarding:2 Notice of Appearance,3 Financial Disclosure Statement. Counsel is reminded that the filing user must lock or flatten the PDF document. Failure to flatten documents may result in the clerks office issuing a notice of deficiency. Counsel should "flatten" ( the notice of appearance and the financial disclosure statement ) prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No further action is needed. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 09, 2023
3 3 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Mon 10/09 1:35 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement by William Ronnie Adams, II (Martin, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/09 1:34 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by David J. Martin on behalf of William Ronnie Adams, II. (Martin, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 10/09 1:28 PM
COMPLAINT against Speedway (North Carolina) LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCEDC-7302825.), filed by William Ronnie Adams, II. (Martin, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons