Iowa Southern District Court
Judge:Stephen H Locher
Referred: William P Kelly
Case #: 4:23-cv-00399
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e-2ra Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Oct 09, 2023
Terminated:Oct 08, 2024
Case in other court:IOWA DISTRICT COURT FOR POLK COUNTY, LACL 156195
Last checked: Saturday Apr 06, 2024 4:17 AM CDT
Defendant
Bob's Discount Furniture, LLC
Represented By
Nicholas B. McGrath
Jackson Lewis P.C. (ne)
contact info
Catherine A. Cano
Jackson Lewis P.C. (ne)
contact info
Plaintiff
Adonis Ross
Represented By
Benjamin Winston Roberson
Community Law Office
contact info
Haley N. Bryan
Community Law Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 10/08 8:27 AM
***Civil Case Terminated. (nla)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
22 22 notice Notice of Stipulated Dismissal Mon 10/07 1:56 PM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal by Adonis Ross. (Roberson, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
21 21 misc Sealed Document Mon 07/15 10:31 AM
Sealed Document. Email correspondence from the parties. (djs)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Order Mon 07/15 10:25 AM
TEXT ORDER CANCELING STATUS CONFERENCE. Per the parties' correspondence, the parties have no issues to discuss and are on track to meet their deadlines. The Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/16/2024 is canceled. Signed by Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly on 7/15/2024. (djs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
19 19 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 04/04 4:53 PM
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 7/16/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly. Counsel shall call 1-877-411-9748 and enter code 1376500 to be connected to the call. See Order for particulars. Signed by Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly on 4/4/2024. (djs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 04/03 10:46 AM
Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly added. Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr no longer assigned to case. (kjw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
18 18 answer Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal Thu 01/18 2:56 PM
DEFENDANTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Bob's Discount Furniture, LLC.(McGrath, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
17 17 order Dismiss Thu 01/04 11:31 AM
ORDER granting5 Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss. See Order for particulars. Signed by Judge Stephen H. Locher on 1/4/2024. (Banta, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
16 16 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Tue 12/12 1:45 PM
Withdrawal of Attorney by Haley N. Bryan. (Bryan, Haley)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/12 1:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Winston Roberson on behalf of Adonis Ross (Roberson, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
14 14 2 pgs order Order Mon 11/27 2:38 PM
ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See order for deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 11/27/2023. (jeb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Final Pretrial Order Form
13 13 order Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan Mon 11/27 2:29 PM
SCHEDULING AND TRIAL SETTING ORDER. Initial Disclosures due by 12/22/2023. Motions to Add Parties due by 1/19/2024. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 1/19/2024. Plaintiff Expert Witness Disclosures due by 2/16/2024. Defendant Expert Witness Disclosures due by 4/19/2024. Plaintiff Rebuttal Expert Witness Disclosures due by 5/17/2024. Discovery Deadline 8/16/2024. Dispositive Motion Deadline 9/20/2024. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/14/2025 11:00 AM in Des Moines Courthouse Room 265 before Judge Stephen H. Locher. Jury Trial set to begin 3/31/2025 9:00 AM in Des Moines Courthouse Room 265 before Judge Stephen H. Locher. Estimated length 4 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 11/27/2023. (jeb)
Related: [-]
12 12 minutes Scheduling Conference Mon 11/27 12:12 PM
TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr.: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 11/27/2023. Attorney Haley Bryan appeared for plaintiff. Attorney Nicholas McGrath appeared for defendant. Scheduling order to be entered. Court Time: 10 minutes. (jeb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
11 11 motion Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan Tue 11/21 3:46 PM
PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (McGrath, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
10 10 respm Reply Mon 11/20 2:35 PM
REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PARTIAL DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT re5 MOTION to Dismiss Partial filed by Bob's Discount Furniture, LLC.(McGrath, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
9 9 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 11/14 10:55 AM
TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference will be held November 27, 2023 at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. The parties shall confer and file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by November 21, 2023. To join the conference, counsel shall call 866-590-5055 and utilize access code 8811585. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 11/14/2023. (jeb)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
8 8 respm Response/Resistance to Motion Mon 11/13 3:43 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re5 MOTION to Dismiss Partial filed by Adonis Ross. Replies due by 11/20/2023.(Bryan, Haley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit Attachment A,
Att: 3 Exhibit Attachment B,
Att: 4 Exhibit Attachment C
7 7 notice Notice - Other Mon 11/13 3:37 PM
NOTICE by Adonis Ross . (Bryan, Haley)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
6 6 misc Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT Fri 11/03 3:33 PM
Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Bob's Discount Furniture, LLC. (McGrath, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
5 5 motion Dismiss Mon 10/30 5:09 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Partial by Bob's Discount Furniture, LLC. Responses due by 11/13/2023.(Cano, Catherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
4 4 order Extension of Time to Answer Tue 10/17 9:59 AM
TEXT ORDER granting3 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension to Responsive Pleading Deadline. Defendant has until October 30, 2023, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 10/17/2023. (jeb)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
3 3 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 10/16 3:23 PM
Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Notice of Removal, by Bob's Discount Furniture, LLC.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. (McGrath, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
2 2 notice Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Tue 10/10 11:40 AM
Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet, in compliance with Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 10/31/2023. (nla)
Related: [-]
misc Filing Fee Received Tue 10/10 11:52 AM
Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number #26606 by Bobs Discount Furniture, LLC. (kjw)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 09, 2023
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 10/09 5:24 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BOBS DISCOUNT FURNITURE, LLC from Iowa District Court for Polk County, case number LACL 156195., filed by BOBS DISCOUNT FURNITURE, LLC. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 1/8/2024.(McGrath, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit state court pleadings,
Att: 2 Exhibit Declaration of Ryan Schaffer